Asia Vital Components Co., Ltd. v. Asetek Danmark A/S

Plaintiff: Asia Vital Components Co., Ltd.
Defendant: Asetek Danmark A/S
Case Number: 5:2016cv07160
Filed: December 16, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2017 90 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 89 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Claim Construction Deadlines filed by Asia Vital Components Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 5, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
September 22, 2017 85 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 84 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 81 MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions Joint Stipulation to Extend Deadlines Regarding Motion to Amend Invalidity Contentions; Proposed Order filed by Asetek Danmark A/S. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 21, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
August 28, 2017 80 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 79 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation to Extend the Deadline regarding Submission of Damages Contentions filed by Asetek Danmark A/S. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 28, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2017)
July 14, 2017 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING ASETEK'S AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS re 71 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation regarding Asetek's Amended Answer and Counterclaims filed by Asetek Danmark A/S. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 14, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
June 12, 2017 70 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 68 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Disclose Invalidity Contentions and Subsequent Due Dates filed by Asia Vital Components Co., Ltd. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 12, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asia Vital Components Co., Ltd. v. Asetek Danmark A/S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asia Vital Components Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Andrew C. Aitken
Represented By: Raymond J. Ho
Represented By: Cameron Hajaran Tousi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asetek Danmark A/S
Represented By: Charles Brandon Rash
Represented By: Jacob Adam Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?