Pawlik v. Yahoo!, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff alleged that Defendant Yahoo! Incorporated recklessly and negligently disregarded its obligations to protect Yahoo users' personal identifying information which resulted in a massive data breach in late 2014.

Plaintiff: David Pawlik
Defendant: Yahoo!, Incorporated
Case Number: 5:2016cv07229
Filed: December 21, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2016 9 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE RE-ASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case re-assignment to Judge Lucy Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for 3/2/2017 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7-days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The Parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2016)
December 21, 2016 8 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:16-cv-09011. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 21, 2016 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Northern District of California. (sjo)
December 21, 2016 7 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Northern District of California. (Signed by MDL Panel on 12/16/2016) (sjo)
December 6, 2016 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Yahoo!, Incorporated. (rch)
December 5, 2016 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Yahoo!, Incorporated, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by David Pawlik. (Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah)
November 29, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; Amended summons can only be issued to parties that were previously issued. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
November 21, 2016 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED IS NOT AN AMENDED SUMMONS - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Yahoo!, Incorporated, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by David Pawlik. (Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) Modified on 11/29/2016 (pc).
November 21, 2016 Case Designated ECF. (dgo)
November 21, 2016 Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. (dgo)
November 21, 2016 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dgo)
November 21, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Filed against error. Party must be fully entered on ECF and Summons caption, Yahoo!, Incorporated;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dgo)
November 21, 2016 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeremiah Lee Frei-Pearson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Yahoo!, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (dgo)
November 18, 2016 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERRORREQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Yahoo!, Inc., re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by David Pawlik. (Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah) Modified on 11/21/2016 (dgo).
November 18, 2016 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah)
November 18, 2016 1 COMPLAINT against Yahoo!, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13007077)Document filed by David Pawlik.(Frei-Pearson, Jeremiah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pawlik v. Yahoo!, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Pawlik
Represented By: Jeremiah Lee Frei-Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo!, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?