Jha v. Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Anjani Kumar Jha, Chaile Steinberg and Elizabeth Chuakay
Defendant: Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Lloyd A. Carney, David L. House, Judy Bruner, Renato A. Dipentima, Alan L. Earhart, John W. Gerdelman, Kim C. Goodman, L. William Krause, David E. Roberson and Sanjay Vaswani
Case Number: 5:2016cv07270
Filed: December 21, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 3, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/3/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2017)
February 9, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 41 Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Renato A. Dipentima, Alan L. Earhart, Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., David E. Roberson, David L. House, Kim C. Goodman, Sanjay Vaswani, John W. Gerdelman, L. William Krause, Judy Bruner, Lloyd A. Carney. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/9/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
December 27, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Gideon A. Schor. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jha v. Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anjani Kumar Jha
Represented By: Joel E Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chaile Steinberg
Represented By: Evan Jason Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Chuakay
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brocade Communications Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Jedidiah Benjamin
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Gideon A. Schor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd A. Carney
Represented By: Aaron Jedidiah Benjamin
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Gideon A. Schor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. House
Represented By: Aaron Jedidiah Benjamin
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Gideon A. Schor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Bruner
Represented By: Aaron Jedidiah Benjamin
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Gideon A. Schor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renato A. Dipentima
Represented By: Aaron Jedidiah Benjamin
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Gideon A. Schor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan L. Earhart
Represented By: Aaron Jedidiah Benjamin
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Gideon A. Schor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Gerdelman
Represented By: Aaron Jedidiah Benjamin
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Gideon A. Schor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim C. Goodman
Represented By: Aaron Jedidiah Benjamin
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Gideon A. Schor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. William Krause
Represented By: Aaron Jedidiah Benjamin
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Gideon A. Schor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David E. Roberson
Represented By: Aaron Jedidiah Benjamin
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Gideon A. Schor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanjay Vaswani
Represented By: Aaron Jedidiah Benjamin
Represented By: Boris Feldman
Represented By: Gideon A. Schor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?