OOO Brunswick Rail Management et al v. Sultanov et al
Plaintiff: OOO Brunswick Rail Management and Brunswick Rail Group Limited
Defendant: Richard Sultanov and Paul Ostling
Case Number: 5:2017cv00017
Filed: January 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER GRANTING 86 DEFENDANT RICHARD SULTANOV'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/6/2017. The Clerk shall close this file. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2017)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DENYING 3 PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND 23 MOTION FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/20/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2017)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3 PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR SEIZURE AND PRESERVATION ORDERS, EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 1/20/2017 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/6/2017 at 11:02 a.m. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OOO Brunswick Rail Management et al v. Sultanov et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OOO Brunswick Rail Management
Represented By: Jacob Marcus Heath
Represented By: Gabriel M. Ramsey
Represented By: Michael Carl Tu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brunswick Rail Group Limited
Represented By: Jacob Marcus Heath
Represented By: Gabriel M. Ramsey
Represented By: Michael Carl Tu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Sultanov
Represented By: Thomas Edward Wallerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Ostling
Represented By: Thomas Edward Wallerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?