United States of America v. Hernandez

Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Jose Hernandez
Case Number: 5:2017cv00040
Filed: January 5, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT **AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT**. Show Cause Response due by 12/21/2017. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/2/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2017)
July 27, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING 22 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/27/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2017)
June 7, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/27/2017 09:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 7/6/2017. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/7/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
April 10, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE TO GRANT PETITION TO ENFORCE INTERNAL REVENUE SUMMONSES; GRANTING 1 PETITION; AND DIRECTING PETITIONER TO SUBMIT PROPOSED ORDER REQUIRING RESPONDENT TO APPEAR BEFORE REVENUE OFFICER TO GIVE TESTIMONY AND PROVIDE ITEMS DESCRIBED IN SUMMONSES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/10/2017.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
March 21, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER For Reassignment to a District Judge; REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summonses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/21/2017. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
January 30, 2017 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Enforcement of Internal Revenue Service Summonses. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/21/2017 10:00 AM, Courtroom 2, Fifth Floor, United States District Court, 280 South First Street, San Jose, California. Show Cause Response due by 2/28/2017. Reply due by 3/7/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/30/2017. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jose Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?