Flores v. Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Benito A. Flores |
Defendant: |
Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc., HSBC Bank USA, N.A. As Trustee for Securitized Trust Deutsche Alt-A Securities, Inc. Mortgage Loan Trust, Series 2006-AFI, DB Structured Products, Inc., Deutsche Alt-A Securities, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Mortgage Electronic Registration System, and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC |
Case Number: |
5:2017cv00055 |
Filed: |
January 5, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of California |
Office: |
San Jose Office |
County: |
Monterey |
Presiding Judge: |
Nathanael M. Cousins |
Nature of Suit: |
Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 28, 2017 |
Filing
93
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING FLORES' FAILURE TO OPPOSE DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Re: Dkt. Nos. 89 , 90 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/28/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2017)
|
April 7, 2017 |
Filing
59
ORDER GRANTING IN PART, AND DENYING IN PART WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Re: Dkt. Nos. 11 , 27 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Flores v. Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Benito A. Flores |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Greenpoint Mortgage Funding, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Evelina Manukyan |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A. As Trustee for Securitized Trust Deutsche Alt-A Securities, Inc. Mortgage Loan Trust, Series 2006-AFI |
Represented By: |
Kevin S. Kim |
Represented By: |
Brian Andrew Paino |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: DB Structured Products, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Deutsche Alt-A Securities, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. |
Represented By: |
Kevin S. Kim |
Represented By: |
Brian Andrew Paino |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System, |
Represented By: |
Andrea McDonald Hicks |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC |
Represented By: |
Kevin S. Kim |
Represented By: |
Brian Andrew Paino |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?