Foster v. EquityKey Real Estate Investments L.P.

Plaintiff: Aaron Foster
Defendant: EquityKey Real Estate Investments L.P.
Case Number: 5:2017cv00067
Filed: January 6, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion for Attorney Fees signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/25/2017. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
July 12, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court Order of Dismissal signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 7/12/2017. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2017)
June 14, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court Order to Show Cause signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/14/2017. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/18/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Fifth Floor, San Jose. Show Cause Response due by 7/11/2017. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
May 9, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 8 Motion to Dismiss. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. EquityKey Real Estate Investments L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Foster
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Mulligan
Represented By: William Joseph Purdy, III
Represented By: Pamela Dawn Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EquityKey Real Estate Investments L.P.
Represented By: Christopher Lynn Frost
Represented By: Sarah Fleisig Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?