Christian Wellisch v. Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency et al

Plaintiff: Christian Wellisch
Defendant: Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency and James L Preston
Case Number: 5:2017cv00213
Filed: January 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON 68 70 SCHEDULED FOR JUNE 7, 2018 AT 9:00 A.M.; ORDER GRANTING IN PART WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND 68 PHEAA'S MOTION TO DISMISS; GRANTING WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND 70 PRESTON'S MOTION TO DISMISS; REMANDING STATE LAW CLAIMS AGAINST PHEAA TO STATE COURT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/1/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING 57 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2017)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DENYING 55 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/5/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING 9 , 10 DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/21/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2017)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING 9 , 10 DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/2/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER (1) GRANTING 34 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION, (2) SEVERING AND REMANDING MIL 010 PETITION, AND (3) STAYING CLAIM UNDER CAL. MIL. & VET. CODE § 409.3. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/24/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DENYING 16 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/21/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 18 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/16/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christian Wellisch v. Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Wellisch
Represented By: Christian Wellisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency
Represented By: Donald E. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L Preston
Represented By: Donald E. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?