Grace v. Apple, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christina Grace
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2017cv00551
Filed: February 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 306 Order Denying 278 Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 8/21/2019. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 174 Motion to Certify Class; denying 233 Motion to Strike. (lhklc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 38 Apple's Motion to Dismiss.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grace v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Grace
Represented By: Bradley Wayne Caldwell
Represented By: Jason Dodd Cassady
Represented By: John Austin Curry
Represented By: Donald Scott Macrae
Represented By: Jill Michelle Manning
Represented By: Alexander Lee Simon
Represented By: Bruce Lee Simon
Represented By: Christopher S Stewart
Represented By: Allan Steyer
Represented By: John Summers
Represented By: David F.E. Tejtel
Represented By: Daniel L. Warshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Kristin I Sheffield-Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?