Wilson v. Red Robin International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ronny-marie Wilson
Defendant: Red Robin International, Inc. and RMV Holdings, L.P.
Case Number: 5:2017cv00685
Filed: February 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 WRIT of of Execution issued against Red Robin International, Inc., in the amount of $37,624.95 for Attorneys' fees and Litigation Expenses. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 68 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/14/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER VACATING OCTOBER 11, 2018 HEARING ON 68 MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/27/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/31/2018. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING 56 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/24/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Red Robin International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronny-marie Wilson
Represented By: Zachary Manning Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Robin International, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine P. Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMV Holdings, L.P.
Represented By: Katherine P. Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?