Theodore Broomfield, et al v. Craft Brew Alliance, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cilloni, Sara Cilloni, Simone Zimmer and Theodore Broomfield
Defendant: Craft Brew Alliance, Inc., Craft Brew Alliance, Inc. doing business as Kona Brewing Co., Kona Brewing Co., LLC, Kona Brew Enterprises, LLC and Kona Brewery, LLC
Not Classified By Court: Mr. Eric Michael Lindberg
Case Number: 5:2017cv01027
Filed: February 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
2 Judge: Howard R Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 188 AFFIDAVIT re #187 Order Declaration of Julie N. Green with Respect to Final Disbursement of Settlement Funds by Theodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. (Wand, Aubry) (Filed on 12/21/2021)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER APPROVING DISBURSEMENT OF UNCLAIMED SETTLEMENT PAYMENTS AND FRAUDULENT CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/19/2021. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2021)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Proposed Order re #184 Notice (Other), [Proposed] Amended Order Re: Disbursement of Unclaimed Settlement Payments and Fraudulent Claims by Craft Brew Alliance, Inc.. (Webb, Tammy) (Filed on 11/19/2021)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER REGARDING #184 CY PRES RECIPIENTS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/1/2021. (blflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2021)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Joint Report Re: Disbursement and Accounting Settlement Fund by Theodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer re #183 Notice (Other), (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Julie N. Green, #2 Proposed Order) (Wand, Aubry) (Filed on 10/29/2021) Modified on 10/31/2021 (gba, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 183 NOTICE by Theodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer re #182 Order Joint Report Re: Proposed Cy Pres Recipient(s) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of F. Paul Bland Jr., #2 Declaration of Laura Brett, #3 Proposed Order)(Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/18/2021)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO SUBMIT PROPOSED CY PRES RECIPIENT BY JUNE 18, 2021. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on June 1, 2021. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2021)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 181 NOTICE by Theodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer re #180 Order Plaintiffs' Notice of Further Post-Distribution Accounting (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Julie N. Green on Behalf of CPT Group, Inc.)(Wand, Aubry) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER REQUESTING FURTHER POST-DISTRIBUTION ACCOUNTING BY MAY 31, 2021. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/2/2021. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2021)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 179 NOTICE by Theodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer re #178 Order Plaintiffs' Supplemental Notice of Post-Distribution Accounting (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ani S. Sarich on Behalf of CPT Group, Inc. with Respect to Disbursement and Accounting of Settlement Fund)(Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/1/2021)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER REQUESTING FURTHER POST-DISTRIBUTION ACCOUNTING BY MARCH 1, 2021. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/30/2020. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2020)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 177 NOTICE by Theodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer Plaintiff's Notice of Post-Distribution Accounting (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ani S. Sarich on Behalf of CPT Group, Inc. with Respect to Disbursement and Accounting of Settlement Fund)(Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/29/2020)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER GRANTING #175 UNOPPOSED MOTION TO MODIFY DISMISSAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on September 3, 2020. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2020)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MOTION to Amend/Correct #174 Order on Stipulation filed by Eric Michael Lindberg. Responses due by 9/16/2020. Replies due by 9/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sam A. Miorelli, E.I., Esq.)(Miorelli, Sam) (Filed on 9/2/2020)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 174 #170 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: DISMISSAL OF MR. LINDBERGS APPEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/30/2020. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 NOTICE by Eric Michael Lindberg re #172 Order Directing Counsel for Objector Eric Michael Lindberg to File a Declaration RE Lodestar Calculation of Attorneys' Fees (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sam Miorelli, E.I., Esq., #2 Declaration of David Makman, Esq.)(Miorelli, Sam) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER DIRECTING COUNSEL FOR OBJECTOR ERIC MICHAEL LINDBERG TO FILE A DECLARATION RE LODESTAR CALCULATION OF ATTORNEYS FEES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/22/2020. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER of USCA. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, this appeal is dismissed without prejudice to its reinstatement in the event the District Court declines to approve the parties settlement by denying a Motion to Approve Settlement. Reinstatement shall be by notice filed by any party in this court and served on the other parties and the Circuit Mediator within 28 days of an order by the District Court denying a Motion to Approve the parties Settlement. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 170 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: Dismissal of Mr. Lindberg's Appeal filed by Eric Michael Lindberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Conditional Dismissal Order)(Miorelli, Sam) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL by Eric Michael Lindberg as to #151 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,, Order on Motion for Settlement, #164 Order on Motion for Bond, #154 Order . Appeal Record due by 6/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 9th Circuit Form 6 Representation Statement)(Miorelli, Sam) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Receipt in the amount of $3,000 from Law Office of Sam Miorelli PA FBO Eric Michael Lindberg; Date receipt issued on 04/27/2020 with #34611148710(rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 167 NOTICE by Eric Michael Lindberg re #166 Order, #164 Order on Motion for Bond of Satisfaction of Appeal Costs Bond Order (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sam A. Miorelli, E.I., Esq. of Satisfaction of Appeal Costs Bond Order)(Miorelli, Sam) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER AMENDING #164 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR APPEAL BOND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/24/2020. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 13, 2019, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 925-899-2812, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #161 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2020. (Related documents(s) #161 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER GRANTING #158 PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR APPEAL BOND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/13/2020. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2020)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 REPLY (re #158 MOTION for Bond Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Appeal Bond; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byTheodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #158 MOTION for Bond Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Appeal Bond; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byEric Michael Lindberg. (Miorelli, Sam) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/19/2019 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Eric Michael Lindberg, for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Miorelli, Sam) (Filed on 3/30/2020)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 8/3/2017, 9/6/2018, 6/19/2019, 12/19/2019 before Judge BLF, (Miorelli, Sam) (Filed on 3/30/2020)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Statement of Non-Opposition re #158 MOTION for Bond Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Appeal Bond; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byCraft Brew Alliance, Inc.. (Related document(s) #158 ) (Webb, Tammy) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MOTION for Bond Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Appeal Bond; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Theodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. Responses due by 4/3/2020. Replies due by 4/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin Heikali, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Declaration of Ani S. Sarich, #4 Proposed Order)(Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 157 USCA No. 20-15416. USCA Scheduling Order schedule is set as follows: Appellant Eric Michael Lindberg Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/17/2020. Transcript ordered by 04/09/2020. Transcript due 05/08/2020. Appellant Eric Michael Lindberg opening brief due 06/17/2020. Appellees Theodore Broomfield and Craft Brew Alliance, Inc. answering brief due 07/17/2020. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2020)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 156 EXHIBITS re #155 Notice of Appeal, USCA Form 6 Representation Statement filed byEric Michael Lindberg. (Related document(s) #155 ) (Miorelli, Sam) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Eric Michael Lindberg. Appeal of Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,, Order on Motion for Settlement, #151 , Order #154 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-14242469 paid.) (Miorelli, Sam) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/11/2020. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Proposed Order re #152 Order to file [PROPOSED] FINAL JUDGMENT by Theodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER REQUESTING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/5/2020. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2020)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER (1) GRANTING #121 PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AND CLASS REPRESENTATIVE SERVICE AWARDS AND (2) GRANTING #136 PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/5/2020. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2020)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Declaration of Benjamin Heikali in Support of #145 Order SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN HEIKALI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES filed byTheodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. (Related document(s) #145 ) (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Declaration of Timothy J. Peter in Support of #145 Order SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY J. PETER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES filed byTheodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. (Related document(s) #145 ) (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Declaration of Aubry Wand in Support of #145 Order SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF AUBRY WAND IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES filed byTheodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. (Related document(s) #145 ) (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/19/2019, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #146 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2020. (Related documents(s) #146 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 TRANSCRIPT ORDER before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Theodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer,. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER REQUESTING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/20/2019. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 12/19/2019 re #121 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Awards filed by Simone Zimmer, Theodore Broomfield, #136 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT filed by Simone Zimmer, Theodore Broomfield.A forthcoming Order will memorialize all relevant information, deadlines, and/or rulings from the hearing. Total Time in Court: 1:05. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Timothy Peter, Ben Heikali, Aubry Wand. Defendant Attorney: Tammy Webb, Matthew Williams. Objectors: Sam Miorelli and David Makman for Lindberg, Edward Orr via Courtcall. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/19/2019)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Letter from Edward W. Orr. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Declaration in Support of #138 Declaration in Support, SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ANI S. SARICH ON BEHALF OF CPT GROUP, INC. WITH RESPECT TO CLAIMS VALIDATION filed byTheodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. (Related document(s) #138 ) (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 RESPONSE re #134 Received Document PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO ORR OBJECTION by Theodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Timothy J. Peter, #2 Declaration Ani Sarich)(Peter, Timothy) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 RESPONSE re #130 Objection PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO LINDBERG OBJECTION by Theodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Timothy J. Peter, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Declaration Ani Sarich, #11 Declaration Michael Jaques-OGorman)(Peter, Timothy) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Declaration of TAMMY B. WEBB REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH THE CLASS ACTION FAIRNESS ACT filed byTheodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Peter, Timothy) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Declaration of ANI S. SARICH in Support of #136 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT filed byTheodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) #136 ) (Peter, Timothy) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Declaration in Support of #136 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY J. PETER filed byTheodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #136 ) (Peter, Timothy) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT filed by Theodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 11/12/2019. Replies due by 11/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Peter, Timothy) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 RESPONSE TO ORDER RE. LETTERS FROM NON-PARTIES AT ECF 126 AND 127 by Theodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration An Sarich ISO)(Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER GRANTING #132 PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE RESPONSE TOLINDBERG OBJECTION THAT EXCEEDS THE PAGE LIMIT IMPOSED BY THIS COURTS STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/17/2019. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE RESPONSE TO LINDBERG OBJECTION THAT EXCEEDS THE PAGE LIMIT IMPOSED BY THIS COURTS STANDING ORDER filed by Theodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. Responses due by 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Received Document. Objection to Class Settlement from Edward Orr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, 1 Thumb Drive submitted)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER GRANTING #129 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/7/2019. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 OBJECTIONS to re #120 Order on Motion for Settlement by Eric Michael Lindberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Makman, David) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13771737.) filed by Eric Michael Lindberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Florida Bar Certificate of Good Standing)(Miorelli, Sam) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER RE LETTERS FROM NON-PARTIES AT ECF 126 AND 127. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/25/2019. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Letter from Frederick C. Ferguson, Jr. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Letter from Miguel F. Valenzuela. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Statement of Non-Opposition re #121 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Awards filed byCraft Brew Alliance, Inc.. (Related document(s) #121 ) (Webb, Tammy) (Filed on 9/17/2019)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER GRANTING #122 PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF DECLARATION OF STEFAN BOEDEKER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/9/2019.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Declaration of Tammy B. Webb in Support of #122 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Declaration of Stefan Boedeker filed byCraft Brew Alliance, Inc.. (Related document(s) #122 ) (Webb, Tammy) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
September 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Declaration of Stefan Boedeker filed by Theodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin Heikali, #2 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Stefan Boedeker, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Stefan Boedeker, #4 Redacted Version of Declaration of Stefan Boedeker, #5 Exhibit A to Declaration of Stefan Boedeker, #6 Proposed Order)(Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/2/2019)
September 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Awards filed by Theodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 9/16/2019. Replies due by 9/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy J. Peter, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Timothy J. Peter, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Timothy J. Peter, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Timothy J. Peter, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Timothy J. Peter, #6 Declaration of Aubry Wand, #7 Declaration of Theodore Broomfield, #8 Declaration of Simone Zimmer, #9 Declaration of Stefan Boedeker, #10 Exhibit A to Declaration of Stefan Boedeker, #11 Proposed Order)(Peter, Timothy) (Filed on 9/2/2019)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED #115 PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/14/2019.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Proposed Order re #115 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Theodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 6/13/2019 re 112 #115 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT filed by Simone Zimmer, Theodore Broomfield. Final Approval Hearing set for 12/19/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman.Total Time in Court: 1:30 - 2:00 (30 Minutes). Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. Plaintiff Attorney: Timothy Peter, Ben Heikali. Defendant Attorney: Tammy Webb, Matthew Williams. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/13/2019)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTICE by Theodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Declaration of Timothy J. Peter in Support of #115 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT filed byTheodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. (Related document(s) #115 ) (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT filed by Theodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 6/6/2019. Replies due by 6/13/2019. (Attachments: * #1 Filing Error See dkt #116 for Correction of this attachment, #2 Declaration Aubry Wand, #3 Declaration Bruce A. Edwards, #4 Declaration Julie N. Green)(Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/23/2019) Modified on 5/24/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/24/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER GRANTING #113 JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND PAGE LIMIT ON PLAINTIFFS' FORTHCOMING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/3/2019.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND PAGE LIMIT ON PLAINTIFFS FORTHCOMING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT filed by Theodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Corrected Time of Hearing Set and Vacate Hearing Dates as to #111 . Preliminary Approval Hearing set for 6/13/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman.(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Set and Vacate Hearing Dates as to #111 . Preliminary Approval Hearing set for 6/13/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE OF JUNE 13, 2019 FOR MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL; VACATING CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/25/2019. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT RE: SETTLEMENT by Theodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 4/24/2019)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER APPROVING #108 JOINT STATEMENT RE: MEDIATION AND CLASS NOTICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/3/2019. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Statement Joint Statement Regarding Mediation and Class Notice by Craft Brew Alliance, Inc., Kona Brew Enterprises, LLC, Kona Brewery, LLC, Kona Brewing Co., LLC. (Sherk, John) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER REQUESTING STATUS REPORT RE MEDIATION OR JOINT STATEMENT RE NOTICE ON OR BEFORE APRIL 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/25/2019. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Statement JOINT STATEMENT RE: MEDIATION AND CLASS NOTICE by Theodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 NOTICE of Change of Address by Tammy Beth Webb (Webb, Tammy) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER of USCA. The court, in its discretion, denies the petition for permission to appeal the district courts September 25, 2018 order granting class action certification. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(f); Chamberlan v. Ford Motor Co., 402 F.3d 952 (9th Cir. 2005). Judge Gould respectfully dissents and would grant the petition for the reasons that (1) certification may cause the defendant unduly to feel pressed to reach a settlement without regard to merits because of the size of the California market for beer; (2) certification could resolve important unsettled legal questions presented in the petition where the Supreme Courts position may be uncertain, and thus certification could contribute to the development of the law; and (3) as for whether there is manifest error, that is less clear because of my view that the law is somewhat unsettled, but the importance of the issues to me favor review. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 USCA Case Number 18-80145 U.S. Court of Appeals. FILED ON 10/22/2018 PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO APPEAL PURSUANT TO RULE 23(f). SERVED ON 10/22/2018. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE by Craft Brew Alliance, Inc. of Petition to Appeal (Webb, Tammy) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER APPROVING #99 JOINT STATEMENT RE: MEET AND CONFER ON CLASS NOTICE. Joint report re class notice due 21 days after resolution of forthcoming 26(f) petition. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/17/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER DENYING #97 DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SEEK RECONSIDERATION OF COURT'S ORDER GRANTING CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/16/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Statement JOINT STATEMENT RE: MEET AND CONFER ON CLASS NOTICE by Theodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #97 MOTION for Reconsideration Craft Brew Alliance, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Seek Reconsideration of Court's Order Granting Class Certification ) filed byTheodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MOTION for Reconsideration Craft Brew Alliance, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Seek Reconsideration of Court's Order Granting Class Certification filed by Craft Brew Alliance, Inc.. (Webb, Tammy) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/06/2018, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #92 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/31/2018. (Related documents(s) #92 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER RE REDACTION OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/26/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2018) Modified on 10/9/2018 - ORDER UNSEALED; No Response Received in re: ( #95 ) ORDER RE REDACTION OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CERTIFY CLASS (tshS, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order ***Motions terminated: #83 MOTION to Certify Class (UNREDACTED Pursuant to Court Order) filed by Simone Zimmer, Theodore Broomfield. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 TRANSCRIPT ORDER before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Theodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/06/2018 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Craft Brew Alliance, Inc., for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Webb, Tammy) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE of Change of Address by Benjamin Heikali for attorney Timothy J. Peter (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 9/6/2018 re #83 MOTION to Certify Class (UNREDACTED Pursuant to Court Order) filed by Simone Zimmer, Theodore Broomfield.Oral Argument Heard; Written Order to be issued.Total Time in Court: 1:03. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Aubry Wand, Joshua Nassir, Ben Heikali. Defendant Attorney: Tammy Web, John Sherk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/6/2018)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 REPLY (re #83 MOTION to Certify Class (UNREDACTED Pursuant to Court Order) ) filed byTheodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aubry Wand in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER GRANTING #87 DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/22/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Craft Brew Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tammy B. Webb, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - Redacted, #4 Exhibit A - Unredacted, #5 Exhibit B - Redacted, #6 Exhibit B - Unredacted, #7 Exhibit C - Redacted, #8 Exhibit C - Unredacted)(Webb, Tammy) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER DENYING #84 DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/16/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #83 MOTION to Certify Class (UNREDACTED Pursuant to Court Order) ) filed byCraft Brew Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tammy B. Webb ISO Opposition, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C - REDACTED, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O - REDACTED, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q - REDACTED, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Proposed Order)(Webb, Tammy) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Craft Brew Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit A, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit B, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit C, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C)(Webb, Tammy) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION to Certify Class (UNREDACTED Pursuant to Court Order) filed by Theodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2018 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 8/10/2018. Replies due by 8/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin Heikali ISO Motion for Class Certification (UNREDACTED Pursuant to Court Order), #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4-24 (UNREDACTED Pursuant to Court Order), #6 Exhibit 25, #7 Exhibit 26-31 (UNREDACTED Pursuant to Court Order), #8 Exhibit 32, #9 Exhibit 33, #10 Exhibit 34-42 (UNREDACTED Pursuant to Court Order), #11 Exhibit 43, #12 Exhibit 44, #13 Declaration of Aubry Wand ISO Motion for Class Certification, #14 Declaration of Stefan Boedeker ISO Motion for Class Certification (UNREDACTED Pursuant to Court Order), #15 Declaration of Stefan Boedeker ISO Motion for Class Certification [Rebuttal] (UNREDACTED Pursuant to Court Order), #16 Declaration of Stefan Boedeker ISO Motion for Class Certification [Supplemental], #17 Declaration of John Palmer, #18 Declaration of Simone Zimmer ISO Motion for Class Certification, #19 Declaration of Theodore Broomfield ISO Motion for Class Certification, #20 Declaration of J. Michael Dennis ISO Motion for Class Certification (UNREDACTED Pursuant to Court Order), #21 Proposed Order)(Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER DENYING #78 PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/23/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2018)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ERRATA re #79 MOTION to Certify Class NOTICE OF ERRATA RE. PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Theodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A [ Proposed Order Granting Mtn for Class Cert (Corrected)])(Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/17/2018)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Nassir (Nassir, Joshua) (Filed on 7/17/2018)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Theodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2018 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 8/10/2018. Replies due by 8/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin Heikali ISO Motion for Class Certification, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4-24, #6 Exhibit 25, #7 Exhibit 26-31, #8 Exhibit 32, #9 Exhibit 33, #10 Exhibit 34-42, #11 Exhibit 43, #12 Exhibit 44, #13 Declaration of Aubry Wand ISO Motion for Class Certification, #14 Declaration of Stefan Boedeker ISO Motion for Class Certification, #15 Declaration of Stefan Boedeker ISO Motion for Class Certification [Rebuttal], #16 Declaration of Stefan Boedeker ISO Motion for Class Certification [Supplemental], #17 Declaration of John Palmer, #18 Declaration of Simone Zimmer ISO Motion for Class Certification, #19 Declaration of Theodore Broomfield ISO Motion for Class Certification, #20 Declaration of J. Michael Dennis ISO Motion for Class Certification, #21 Proposed Order)(Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Theodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin Heikali ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Exhibit A (Redacted), #3 Exhibit A (Unredacted), #4 Exhibit B (Redacted), #5 Exhibit 4-24, 26-31, and 34-42 of Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit B (Unredacted), #7 Exhibit 4-21 of Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit 22-24, 26-31, and 34-42 of Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit C (Redacted), #10 Exhibit C (Unredacted), #11 Exhibit D (Redacted), #12 Exhibit D (Unredacted), #13 Exhibit E (Redacted), #14 Exhibit E (Unredacted), #15 Proposed Order)(Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER STRIKING #76 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE BOEDEKER DECLARATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/11/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2018)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MOTION to Strike the June 29, 2018 Declaration of Dr. Stefan Boedeker filed by Craft Brew Alliance, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2018 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 7/24/2018. Replies due by 7/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John K. Sherk, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Sherk, John) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING #73 STIPULATION REGARDING FURTHER AMENDMENT TO CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/8/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2018)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER regarding Further Amendment to Case Management Schedule filed by Craft Brew Alliance, Inc.. (Webb, Tammy) (Filed on 6/8/2018)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi for all further discovery proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on 6/7/2018. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2018) Modified on 6/8/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order SET HEARING Last Day to Hear Class Certification set for 9/6/2018 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING #71 STIPULATION RE: AMENDMENT TO CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/9/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE. AMENDMENT TO CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE filed by Craft Brew Alliance, Inc.. (Webb, Tammy) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING #69 STIPULATION RE: AMENDMENT TO CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/26/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re. Amendment to Case Management Schedule filed by Theodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING #67 STIPULATION REGARDING AMENDMENT TO CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/4/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE. AMENDMENT TO CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE filed by Theodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ANSWER to Amended Complaint re #66 by Craft Brew Alliance, Inc.. (Webb, Tammy) (Filed on 12/29/2017) Modified on 1/2/2018 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Craft Brew Alliance, Inc., Kona Brew Enterprises, LLC, Kona Brewery, LLC, Kona Brewing Co., LLC. Filed byTheodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF CILLONIS INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Sara Cilloni. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING #61 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/27/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #59 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/27/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
November 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11901982.) filed by Craft Brew Alliance, Inc.. (Dwerlkotte, David) (Filed on 11/25/2017)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #59 MOTION for Reconsideration PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT ) filed byCraft Brew Alliance, Inc.. (Webb, Tammy) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION for Reconsideration PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT filed by Theodore Broomfield, Sara Cilloni, Simone Zimmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING #57 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/30/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION for Reconsideration PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT filed by Theodore Broomfield, Sara Cilloni, Simone Zimmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney Barbara Rohr filed by Theodore Broomfield, Sara Cilloni, Simone Zimmer. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/24/2017) Modified on 10/24/2017 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/24/2017 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #56 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Barbara Rohr filed by Simone Zimmer, Theodore Broomfield, Sara Cilloni (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Order granting #52 Stipulation Re: Discovery of ESI and Hard-Copy Documents, as modified by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd 10/18/2017. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Order granting #51 Stipulation Re: Disclosure of Privileged Information, as modified by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/18/2017. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Order granting #50 Stipulated Protective Order, as modified by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/18/2017. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Governing Discovery of Electronically-Stored Information and Hard-Copy Documents filed by Craft Brew Alliance, Inc.. (Webb, Tammy) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Disclosure of Privileged Information filed by Craft Brew Alliance, Inc.. (Webb, Tammy) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER - Proposed Protective Order filed by Craft Brew Alliance, Inc.. (Webb, Tammy) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Defendant Craft Brew Alliance, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint byCraft Brew Alliance, Inc.. (Webb, Tammy) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING #47 STIPULATION RE: DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/28/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Craft Brew Alliance, Inc.. (Webb, Tammy) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING #45 STIPULATION REGARDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/11/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint filed by Craft Brew Alliance, Inc.. (Webb, Tammy) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #16 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/1/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2017)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING #42 STIPULATION REGARDING REVISION TO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/18/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2017)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Revision to Case Management Order filed by Craft Brew Alliance, Inc.. (Webb, Tammy) (Filed on 8/17/2017)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ADR Remark: Counsel have complied with the requirement to contact the ADR Unit. Counsel may stipulate to ADR at any time, and any party may contact the ADR Program to request a further ADR phone conference if needed. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/03/2017, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #39 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2017. (Related documents(s) #39 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/03/2017 before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman by Craft Brew Alliance, Inc., for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Sherk, John) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 36 Motion Hearing, Last Day to Hear Class Certification set for 08/09/2018 09:00 AM. Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motions set for 4/23/2020 09:00 AM. Daubert Hearings set for 6/25/2020 at 1:30 PM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2020 at 1:30 PM. Jury Selection set for 8/28/2020, 8/31/2020 09:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 8/31/2020, 9/1/2020, 9/2/2020, 9/3/2020, 9/4/2020, 9/7/2020, 9/08/2020, 9/9/2020, 9/10/2020 and 9/11/2020 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman.Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 08/03/2017. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ***DUPLICATE ENTRY - PLEASE DISREGARD*** Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 8/3/2017 re 16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Craft Brew Alliance, Inc. The Court takes the matter under submission.Total Time in Court: 9:02 - 9:50. Court Reporter Name: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Ben Heikali, Aubry Wand. Defendant Attorney: Tammy Webb, John Sherk. This is a text-only Minute Entry (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/3/2017) Presiding Judge: Freeman , Beth Labson Referral Judge : Lloyd , Howard R. Modified on 8/3/2017 (tshS, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 8/3/2017 re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Craft Brew Alliance, Inc. The Court takes the matter under submission.Total Time in Court: 9:02 - 9:50. Court Reporter Name: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Ben Heikali, Aubry Wand. Defendant Attorney: Tammy Webb, John Sherk. This is a text-only Minute Entry (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/3/2017)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Tamara Lange on July 31, 2017. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Craft Brew Alliance, Inc.. (Webb, Tammy) (Filed on 7/26/2017)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING #32 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/25/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Timothy J. Peter ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11571570.) filed by Theodore Broomfield, Sara Cilloni, Simone Zimmer. (Rohr, Barbara) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Monday, July 31, 2017, at 2:00 PM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Webb, Tammy) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Webb, Tammy) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Wand, Aubry) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Wand, Aubry) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Wand, Aubry) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byCraft Brew Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - 6/19/17 Bristol-Myers Squibb decision)(Related document(s) #23 , #16 ) (Webb, Tammy) (Filed on 6/21/2017)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE to re #22 Opposition/Response to Motion, Reply in Support of Defendant Craft Brew Alliance, Inc.'s Request for Judicial Notice in support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Craft Brew Alliance, Inc.. (Webb, Tammy) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY (re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint ) filed byCraft Brew Alliance, Inc.. (Webb, Tammy) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint ) PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed byTheodore Broomfield, Sara Cilloni, Simone Zimmer. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint ) PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed byTheodore Broomfield, Sara Cilloni, Simone Zimmer. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order RESET MOTION HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint set for 8/3/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Case Management Statement due by 7/27/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/3/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #19 STIPULATION TO RESCHEDULE HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/18/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/3/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION WITH (PROPOSED) ORDER to Reschedule Hearing Date for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Craft Brew Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Naoki S. Kaneko)(Kaneko, Naoki) (Filed on 5/16/2017) Modified on 5/17/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Entities by Craft Brew Alliance, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC, Other Affiliate Anheuser-Busch InBEV SA/NV for Craft Brew Alliance, Inc.. (Webb, Tammy) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CRAFT BREW ALLIANCE, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT re #16 MOTION to Dismiss laintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Craft Brew Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Webb, Tammy) (Filed on 4/28/2017) Modified on 5/1/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT re #15 ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIE filed by Craft Brew Alliance, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 5/26/2017. Replies due by 6/9/2017. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Order)(Webb, Tammy) (Filed on 4/28/2017) Linkage added on 5/1/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Amended CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT: 1. Violation of California Consumer Legal Remedies Act; 2. Violation of California Unfair Competition Law; 3. Violation of California False Advertising Law; 4. Breach of Express Warranty; 5. Breach of Implied Warranty; 6. Common Law Fraud; 7. Intentional Misrepresentation; 8. Negligent Misrepresentation; 9. Unjust Enrichment and Common Law Restitution; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Craft Brew Alliance, Inc.. Filed byS ara Cilloni, Theodore Broomfield, Simone Zimmer. (Rohr, Barbara) (Filed on 4/7/2017) Modified on 4/10/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES AND TO SET A BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/30/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2017)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE RELATED CASES AND TO SET A BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Theodore Broomfield. (Rohr, Barbara) (Filed on 3/30/2017)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/13/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2017)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order DOCKETED IN ERROR; PLEASE DISREGARD. Electronic filing error. Re: #11 MOTION to Relate Case NOTICE OF RELATED CASE PURSUANT TO CIV. L.R. 3-12; ADMINSTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO CIV. L.R. 3-12(b) and 7-11 filed by Theodore Broomfield. Modified on 3/9/2017 (srnS, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Relate Case NOTICE OF RELATED CASE PURSUANT TO CIV. L.R. 3-12; ADMINSTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO CIV. L.R. 3-12(b) and 7-11 filed by Theodore Broomfield. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Barbara A. Rohr, #2 Proposed Order)(Rohr, Barbara) (Filed on 3/8/2017)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS by Sara Cilloni, Simone Zimmer (Wand, Aubry) (Filed on 3/6/2017) Modified on 3/7/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/13/2017. Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. All other deadlines associated with the initial case management conference are adjusted accordingly. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 3/2/2017. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2017)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sara Cilloni, Simone Zimmer.. (Wand, Aubry) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Craft Brew Alliance, Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/23/2017. Case Management Conference set for 5/30/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/14/2017. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2017)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Wand, Aubry) (Filed on 2/28/2017)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Craft Brew Alliance, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11191198.). Filed bySara Cilloni, Simone Zimmer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wand, Aubry) (Filed on 2/28/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Theodore Broomfield, et al v. Craft Brew Alliance, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craft Brew Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craft Brew Alliance, Inc. doing business as Kona Brewing Co.
Represented By: Tammy Beth Webb
Represented By: David Brenton Dwerlkotte
Represented By: John K. Sherk, III
Represented By: Naoki Stephen Kaneko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kona Brewing Co., LLC
Represented By: John K. Sherk, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kona Brew Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: John K. Sherk, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kona Brewery, LLC
Represented By: John K. Sherk, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cilloni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Cilloni
Represented By: Benjamin Heikali
Represented By: Aubry Wand
Represented By: Barbara Ann Rohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simone Zimmer
Represented By: Benjamin Heikali
Represented By: Joshua Nassir
Represented By: Timothy John Peter
Represented By: Aubry Wand
Represented By: Barbara Ann Rohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Broomfield
Represented By: Benjamin Heikali
Represented By: Timothy John Peter
Represented By: Aubry Wand
Represented By: Barbara Ann Rohr
Represented By: Joshua Nassir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Mr. Eric Michael Lindberg
Represented By: David Alan Makman
Represented By: Sam Andrew Miorelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?