Halter v. D. Scott Carruthers, A Professional Law Corporation

Plaintiff: Sherry Halter
Defendant: D. Scott Carruthers
Case Number: 5:2017cv01395
Filed: March 15, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 18, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/18/2017. The Clerk shall close this file. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2017)
July 5, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 18 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/5/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
June 2, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/13/2017 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 7/6/2017. All other pretrial and trial deadlines and hearing dates, including the Case Management Conference, are VACATED and any pending motions are TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/2/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halter v. D. Scott Carruthers, A Professional Law Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Halter
Represented By: Trinette Gragirena Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Scott Carruthers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?