Sanchez v. American Para Professional Systems Inc et al

Plaintiff: Shannon Sanchez
Defendant: American Para Professional Systems Inc and A.P.P.S OF CALIFORNIA
Case Number: 5:2017cv01835
Filed: March 31, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 12 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/22/2017. The 8/24/2017 hearing is vacated. No appearance necessary. The Clerk shall remand this case to Santa Clara County Superior Court and close the file. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2017)
August 21, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 24 MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/21/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
June 26, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 21 STIPULATION SELECTING PRIVATE ADR. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/26/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. American Para Professional Systems Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Sanchez
Represented By: Larry W Lee
Represented By: William Lucas Marder
Represented By: Nicholas Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Para Professional Systems Inc
Represented By: Alan Victor Friedman
Represented By: Marja-Liisa Overbeck
Represented By: Terry Edward Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.P.P.S OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By: Alan Victor Friedman
Represented By: Marja-Liisa Overbeck
Represented By: Terry Edward Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?