Robin Berman et al v. Microchip Technology Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Robin Berman, Bo Kang, Khashayar Mirfakhraei, Thang Van Vu, Donna Vierra-Castillo, Girish Ramesh, Patrick Hanley, Ilana Shternshain and Mandy Schwarz
Defendant: Microchip Technology Incorporated, Atmel Corporation and Atmel Corporation U.S. Severance Guarantee Benefit Program
Case Number: 5:2017cv01864
Filed: April 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER DENYING ( 145 and 163 ) CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/25/2022 01:30 PM. The August 25th proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. Th e parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public heari ng by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808- 6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For c all clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at l ength.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/29/2022. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2022)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 159 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and to Respond to and Reply in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2021)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 120 Motion to Stay Execution of the Judgment Pending Appeal and to Approve Supersedeas Bond Re Docket No. 119 . (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 129 Stipulation Holding in Abeyance Further Briefing On, and Adjudication Of, Plaintiffs' 122 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Litigation Costs. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2019)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 124 Stipulation To Extend Deadline for Response and Replies Re 122 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Litigation Costs. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 JUDGMENT. ***Civil Case Terminated.***Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/18/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2019)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying Plaintiffs' 99 Motion for Summary Judgment.Statement due by 9/13/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 54 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING RULE 56(D) MOTION. Status Report due by 4/19/2019 and Further Case Management Conference set for 4/30/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 86 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Schmidtke, Mark. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 80 Motion for Pro Hac Vice By Kristina N. Holmstrom. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 70 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to and Reply in Support of 54 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2018)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendants' 9 Motion to Dismiss. (hsglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 27 Motion Requesting a Case Management or Status Conference. Case Management Statement due by 5:00 p.m. on 12/15/2017; Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2017 02:00 PM.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 17 Stipulation Enlarging Plaintiffs Time to Respond re 9 MOTION to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robin Berman et al v. Microchip Technology Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Berman
Represented By: Connie K. Chan
Represented By: Keith A. Ehrman
Represented By: Cliff Michael Palefsky
Represented By: Raphael N. Rajendra
Represented By: Michael Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bo Kang
Represented By: Connie K. Chan
Represented By: Keith A. Ehrman
Represented By: Cliff Michael Palefsky
Represented By: Raphael N. Rajendra
Represented By: Michael Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khashayar Mirfakhraei
Represented By: Connie K. Chan
Represented By: Keith A. Ehrman
Represented By: Cliff Michael Palefsky
Represented By: Raphael N. Rajendra
Represented By: Michael Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thang Van Vu
Represented By: Connie K. Chan
Represented By: Keith A. Ehrman
Represented By: Cliff Michael Palefsky
Represented By: Raphael N. Rajendra
Represented By: Michael Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Vierra-Castillo
Represented By: Connie K. Chan
Represented By: Keith A. Ehrman
Represented By: Cliff Michael Palefsky
Represented By: Raphael N. Rajendra
Represented By: Michael Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Girish Ramesh
Represented By: Connie K. Chan
Represented By: Keith A. Ehrman
Represented By: Cliff Michael Palefsky
Represented By: Raphael N. Rajendra
Represented By: Michael Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Hanley
Represented By: Connie K. Chan
Represented By: Keith A. Ehrman
Represented By: Cliff Michael Palefsky
Represented By: Raphael N. Rajendra
Represented By: Michael Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ilana Shternshain
Represented By: Connie K. Chan
Represented By: Keith A. Ehrman
Represented By: Cliff Michael Palefsky
Represented By: Raphael N. Rajendra
Represented By: Michael Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mandy Schwarz
Represented By: Connie K. Chan
Represented By: Keith A. Ehrman
Represented By: Cliff Michael Palefsky
Represented By: Raphael N. Rajendra
Represented By: Michael Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microchip Technology Incorporated
Represented By: Mark Gerard Kisicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atmel Corporation
Represented By: Mark Gerard Kisicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atmel Corporation U.S. Severance Guarantee Benefit Program
Represented By: Mark Gerard Kisicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?