Mobilemedia Ideas LLC v. Samsung Electronics Co., LTD. et al
Plaintiff: MobileMedia Ideas LLC and Ironworks Patents LLC
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2017cv01958
Filed: April 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER Granting 197 STIPULATION of Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41(A)(1)(A)(ii) filed DISMISSING CASE. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 6/10/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 194 Motion to Stay All Deadlines. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 187 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. OF FINAL DECISION RE Docket No. 177 . (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Order Granting 170 Stipulation and Motion for Entry of Final Judgment and Judgment. ***Civil Case Terminated.***Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 11/15/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER RE 145 . Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/14/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/26/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 164 to Stay Discovery.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 162 Joint Motion to Stay.(terminating 158 and 161 Joint Motion to Stay as moot). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2018)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. ON ADMINISTRATIVE ( 72 , 78 ) MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (Docket Nos. 72 and 78 are GRANTED). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 101 MOTION TO DISMISS NON-INFRINGEMENT COUNTERCLAIMS 1-3. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S 120 MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIM REGARDING 125 PATENT.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2017)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 128 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STIRKE DEFENDANTS' INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/12/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 96 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Berten, David. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IRONWORKS PATENTS LLCS 66 MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTIES AND COUNSEL. MobileMedia Ideas LLC terminated. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 88 Stipulation selecting Private ADR. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 80 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Richards, Alison. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2017)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 63 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Allan Soobert. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mobilemedia Ideas LLC v. Samsung Electronics Co., LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MobileMedia Ideas LLC
Represented By: Christina Bredahl Gierke
Represented By: John D. Holden
Represented By: Eric A Lerner
Represented By: Craig P. Murphy
Represented By: Edward S. Polk
Represented By: Delton L. Vandever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ironworks Patents LLC
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Elizabeth Brann
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Brann
Represented By: Allan M. Soobert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Brann
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Brann
Represented By: Allan M. Soobert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?