Connelly v. St. Jude Medical, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Richard Connelly
Defendant: St. Jude Medical, Inc., Abbott Laboratories and Pacesetter, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2017cv02006
Filed: April 11, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/12/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2017)
July 5, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 31 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/5/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
June 23, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 26 STIPULATION SELECTING PRIVATE ADR. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/23/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Connelly v. St. Jude Medical, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Jude Medical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacesetter, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Connelly
Represented By: Jose Camilo Artiga-Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?