Kwong v. Santa Clara County Sheriff's Office et al

Plaintiff: Suzanne Duyen Kwong
Defendant: Santa Clara County Sheriff's Office, Laura Smith, NDEX, LLP and Wells Fargo N.A. LLC, et al
Case Number: 5:2017cv02127
Filed: April 17, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 19 MOTION FOR EMERGENCY LEAVE TO OBTAIN ATTORNEY REPRESENTATION OR PER AMICI CURIAE REPRESENTATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/5/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
May 1, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 13 REQUEST FOR NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/1/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
April 17, 2017 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 2 PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO RECORD A LIS PENDENS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/17/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kwong v. Santa Clara County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Duyen Kwong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Clara County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: David Michael Rollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Smith
Represented By: David Michael Rollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDEX, LLP
Represented By: James T. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo N.A. LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?