Wahl v. Yahoo ! Inc.

Plaintiff: Andrew Wahl and Yuan Guo
Defendant: Yahoo ! Inc.
Case Number: 5:2017cv02745
Filed: May 12, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
0 Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
1 Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
2 Judge: Howard R Lloyd
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 59 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Settlement Agreement)(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING #52 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; AND GRANTING #48 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, EXPENSES, AND INCENTIVE AWARD. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/15/2018. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 56 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment by Yuan Guo. (Kronawitter, Joseph) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 55 EXHIBITS re #52 MOTION Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Exhibit 2 - Corrected filed byYuan Guo. (Related document(s) #52 ) (Kronawitter, Joseph) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 57 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman:Motion Hearing held on 11/8/2018 re #52 MOTION Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Yuan Guo, #48 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses and Class Representative Incentive Award filed by Yuan Guo.Written Order to be Issued as Stated on the Record.Total Time in Court: 18 Minutes. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Joe Kronawitter. Defendant Attorney: Timothy Loose. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/8/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE by Yuan Guo re #52 MOTION Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Class Action Settlement Agreement (Kronawitter, Joseph) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 53 EXHIBITS re #52 MOTION Final Approval of Class Action Settlement Exhibit 2 filed byYuan Guo. (Related document(s) #52 ) (Kronawitter, Joseph) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 52 MOTION Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Yuan Guo. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2018 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 11/15/2018. Replies due by 11/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kronawitter, Joseph) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
October 12, 2018 Reset Hearing as to #48 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses and Class Representative Incentive Award.Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2018 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER CHANGING TIME OF HEARING FROM 1:30 PM TO 1:00 PM ON NOVEMBER 8, 2018. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2018 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/12/2018. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER RESETTING HEARING ON #48 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2018 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/26/2018. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 26, 2018 Filing 49 EXHIBITS re #48 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses and Class Representative Incentive Award Exhibits 6 and 7 filed byYuan Guo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) #48 ) (Kronawitter, Joseph) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 24, 2018 Filing 48 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses and Class Representative Incentive Award filed by Yuan Guo. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2018 03:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 10/9/2018. Replies due by 10/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Kronawitter, Joseph) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 24, 2018 Filing 47 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Yuan Guo. (Kronawitter, Joseph) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING #45 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/2/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
August 2, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12562986.) filed by Yuan Guo, Andrew Wahl. (Horn, Robert) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
July 30, 2018 Set Hearing re #44 Order on Motion for Settlement. Fairness Hearing set for 11/8/2018 01:30 PM. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING #38 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, PROVISIONALLY CERTIFYING A CALIFORNIA SETTLEMENT CLASS, APPROVING PROPOSED NOTICE, AND SCHEDULING FINAL FAIRNESS HEARING FOR NOVEMBER 8, 2018 AT 1:30 P.M. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/27/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 25, 2018 Filing 43 Supplemental Brief re #38 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval filed byYuan Guo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Related document(s) #38 ) (Kronawitter, Joseph) (Filed on 7/25/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 7/16/2018 re #38 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval filed by Andrew Wahl, Yuan Guo. Total Time in Court: 15 Minutes. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Joseph Kronawitter, Micah Nash. Defendant Attorney: Timohty Loose, Christina Fujita. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/16/2018)
July 13, 2018 Set Continuance of Motion Hearing in re #38 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval. Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2018 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 12, 2018 Filing 41 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 7/12/2018 re #38 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval filed by Andrew Wahl, Yuan Guo. Motion Hearing Continued to 7/16/2018 09:30 AM.Total Time in Court: 15 Minutes. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Micha Nash. Defendant Attorney: Timothy Loose. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/12/2018)
June 14, 2018 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins for discovery proceedings. Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi no longer assigned to the case. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi for all further discovery proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/7/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
May 21, 2018 Reset Hearings as to #38 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval, #39 Order Resetting Hearing. Motion for Preliminary Approval and Case Management Conference reset for 7/12/2018 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER RESETTING HEARING ON #38 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT TO JULY 12, 2018 AT 1:30 P.M. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/21/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 38 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval filed by Yuan Guo, Andrew Wahl. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2018 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 5/31/2018. Replies due by 6/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Settlement Agreement)(Kronawitter, Joseph) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 37 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Yahoo ! Inc.. Filed byAndrew Wahl, Yuan Guo. (Kronawitter, Joseph) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 11, 2018 Filing 36 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2018 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING #34 STIPULATION EXTENDING PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Plaintiff's deadline to file an amended complaint and briefs related to class settlement approval is continued to May 17, 2018. The Case Management Conference is hereby continued to July 12, 2018 at 11:00 A.M. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/3/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 34 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Pretrial Deadlines and Continuing CMC filed by Andrew Wahl. (Kronawitter, Joseph) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
March 21, 2018 Filing 33 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE as to Case Management Statement due by 6/7/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/14/2018 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING #31 STIPULATION EXTENDING PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/20/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Andrew Wahl. (Kronawitter, Joseph) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
January 26, 2018 Reset Case Management Conference re #30 Order on Stipulation, Case Management Statement due 5/3/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2018 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING #29 STIPULATION EXTENDING PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. The Case Management Conference is continued to May 10, 2018 at 11:00 A.M. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/26/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 26, 2018 Filing 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Pretrial Deadlines and Continuing CMC filed by Andrew Wahl. (Kronawitter, Joseph) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING #27 STIPULATION EXTENDING PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO MARCH 1, 2018. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/12/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
December 12, 2017 Filing 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Pretrial Deadlines and Continuing CMC filed by Andrew Wahl. (Kronawitter, Joseph) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING #25 STIPULATION EXTENDING PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/5/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
October 5, 2017 Filing 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Pretrial Deadlines and Continuing CMC filed by Andrew Wahl. (Ogloza, Darius) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
September 15, 2017 Filing 24 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/14/2017 before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman by Yahoo ! Inc., for Court Reporter Georgina Colin. (Loose, Timothy) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #10 MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/15/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 14, 2017 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 9/14/2017 re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Yahoo ! Inc. The Court GRANTS motion with leave to amend. Amended complaint due within 30 days. The Court further orders the case management conference currently set for 10/05/2017 is continued to 11/09/2017.Case Management Statement due by 11/2/2017. Initial Case Management Conference reset to 11/9/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose.Total Time in Court: 22 Minutes. Court Reporter Name: Gina Colin. Plaintiff Attorney: Micah Nash, Joe Kronawitter. Defendant Attorney: Time Loose. This is a text-only Minute Entry (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/14/2017)
September 5, 2017 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2017)
July 24, 2017 Filing 20 REPLY (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) Amended filed byYahoo ! Inc.. (Loose, Timothy) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE #18 DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/20/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
July 19, 2017 Filing 18 REPLY (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) filed byYahoo ! Inc.. (Loose, Timothy) (Filed on 7/19/2017)
July 12, 2017 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by Yahoo ! Inc. (Supplemental Disclosure of Non-Party Interested Entities) (Loose, Timothy) (Filed on 7/12/2017)
June 19, 2017 Filing 16 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) filed byAndrew Wahl. (Ogloza, Darius) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 STIPULATION TO REVISE BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/24/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2017)
May 24, 2017 Filing 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Revise Briefing Schedule filed by Yahoo ! Inc. and Andrew Wahl. (Loose, Timothy) (Filed on 5/24/2017) Modified on 5/25/2017 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (as to Joseph A. Kronawitter). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/22/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
May 22, 2017 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11411560.) filed by Andrew Wahl. (Kronawitter, Joseph) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
May 19, 2017 Filing 11 Request for Judicial Notice re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed byYahoo ! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Request for Judicial Notice)(Related document(s) #10 ) (Loose, Timothy) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
May 19, 2017 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Yahoo ! Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 6/2/2017. Replies due by 6/9/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Talman in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss)(Loose, Timothy) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
May 18, 2017 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2017. Case Management Conference set for 10/05/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. All other deadlines associated with the initial case management conference are adjusted accordingly. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains as referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 5/17/2017. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2017)
May 16, 2017 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
May 16, 2017 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Yahoo ! Inc... (Loose, Timothy) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
May 16, 2017 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Yahoo ! Inc. re #3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines , Notice of Assignment of Case to a Magistrate Judge, Hon. Howard R. Lloyd's Standing Order re: Initial Case Management, Standing Order re: Case Management in Civil Cases, Standing Order for all Judges of the Northern District of California, Consenting to a Magistrate Judge's Jurisdiction (Loose, Timothy) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
May 12, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE by Yahoo ! Inc. Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal of Class Action with Superior Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Loose, Timothy) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
May 12, 2017 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/8/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
May 12, 2017 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/26/2017. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
May 12, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF CLASS ACTION BY DEFENDANT YAHOO! INC. from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 17CV308083. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-11389325). Filed byYahoo ! Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Loose, Timothy) (Filed on 5/12/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wahl v. Yahoo ! Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Wahl
Represented By: David Christopher Fortney
Represented By: Micah David Nash
Represented By: Darius C. Ogloza
Represented By: Joseph Kronawitter
Represented By: Robert Allen Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yuan Guo
Represented By: Robert Allen Horn
Represented By: Joseph Kronawitter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo ! Inc.
Represented By: Peter C. Squeri
Represented By: Matthew Stewart Kahn
Represented By: Timothy William Loose
Represented By: Perlette Michele Jura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?