United States of America v. Hiramanek

Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Adil Hiramanek
Case Number: 5:2017cv03392
Filed: June 12, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2017 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 59 RESPONDENT'S OBJECTIONS TO PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF OSC. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/22/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2017)
August 11, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 23 29 RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/11/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
July 26, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 26 , 28 RESPONDENT'S MOTIONS TO SEAL DOCUMENTS WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/26/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Hiramanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Adil Hiramanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?