Maxim Integrated Products, Inc. et al v. Silicon Mitus Technology, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Volterra Semiconductor LLC and Maxim Integrated Products, Inc.
Defendant: Silicon Mitus Technology, Inc. and Silicon Mitus, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2017cv03507
Filed: June 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/22/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 22, 2018 Filing 97 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (with Proposed Order) filed by Maxim Integrated Products, Inc.. Responses due by 9/5/2018. Replies due by 9/12/2018. (Barkan, David) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 2, 2018 Filing 96 Transcript of Electronically Recorded Proceedings held on June 6, 2018, before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Transcriber Raynee H. Mercado, telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com. Tape Number: 10:11 am-12:05 pm 1:09-2:46 pm, 2:53-3:02 pm. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #92 Transcript Order, #91 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/3/2018. (Related document(s) #92 , #91 ) (rhm) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL. Re: Dkt. No. #63 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/3/2018. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2018)
June 29, 2018 Filing 93 STIPULATION Regarding a Person of Ordinary Skill in the Art filed by Maxim Integrated Products, Inc., Volterra Semiconductor LLC. (Barkan, David) (Filed on 6/29/2018)
June 28, 2018 Filing 92 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/06/2018 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Silicon Mitus Technology, Inc., Silicon Mitus, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Hernandez, Monica) (Filed on 6/28/2018) (TRANSCRIBER: RAYNEE MERCADO) Modified on 6/28/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2018 Filing 91 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/06/2018 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Maxim Integrated Products, Inc., Volterra Semiconductor LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Barkan, David) (Filed on 6/25/2018) (TRANSCRIBER: RAYNEE MERCADO) Modified on 6/26/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER REQUIRING STIPULATION REGARDING "PERSON OF ORDINARY SKILL IN THE ART". This stipulation must be filed with the Court by 6/29/2018. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/25/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
June 25, 2018 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer McGuone Lantz AND GARY J. EDWARDS (Lantz, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION Regarding Parties' Agreed Constructions for "Unitary Gate Structures" and "Electrode" #87 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
June 13, 2018 Filing 87 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Parties' Agreed Constructions for "Unitary Gate Structures" and "Electrode" filed by Maxim Integrated Products, Inc., Volterra Semiconductor LLC. (Barkan, David) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
June 6, 2018 Filing 86 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/6/2018 2:53:11 PM ]. File Size [ 4464 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:09:18 ]. (courtspeak).
June 6, 2018 Filing 85 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/6/2018 2:10:54 PM ]. File Size [ 17216 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:35:52 ]. (courtspeak).
June 6, 2018 Filing 84 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/6/2018 1:09:16 PM ]. File Size [ 28800 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:00:00 ]. (courtspeak).
June 6, 2018 Filing 83 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/6/2018 10:11:58 AM ]. File Size [ 54376 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:53:17 ]. (courtspeak).
June 6, 2018 Filing 82 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Claims Construction Hearing held on 6/6/2018: Court to issue written order. Plaintiffs' Attorneys: David Barkan, Chris Marchese, James Huguenin-Love. Representative of Maxim Integrated Products: Greg Warder. Defendants' Attorneys: David Jakopin, Matt Hindman, Diane Sweeney, Monica Hernandez. Representative of Silicon Mitus Technology: Harold Chang. (FTR Time: 1:09pm -.2:46pm/2:53pm - 3:02pm) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/6/2018)
June 6, 2018 Filing 81 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Tutorial Hearing held on 6/6/2018. Plaintiffs' Attorneys: David Barkan, Chris Marchese, James Huguenin-Love. Representative of Maxim Integrated Products: Greg Warder. Defendants' Attorneys: David Jakopin, Matt Hindman, Diane Sweeney, Monica Hernandez. Representative of Silicon Mitus Technology: Harold Chang. FTR Time: 10:11am - 12:05pm. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/6/2018)
June 2, 2018 Filing 80 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING the Tutorial Hearing for 10:00 AM on 6/6/2018 in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2018)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER REGARDING TECHNOLOGY TUTORIAL AND CLAIM CONSTRUCTION. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/1/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING Joint Motion for Entry of Equipment into the Court for Technology Tutorial & Claim Construction Hrg #77 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Filing 77 Joint MOTION re Entry of Equipment into the Court for Technology Tutorial & Claim Construction Hrg filed by Maxim Integrated Products, Inc., Volterra Semiconductor LLC. Responses due by 6/14/2018. Replies due by 6/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barkan, David) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 29, 2018 Filing 76 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT -REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Maxim Integrated Products, Inc., Volterra Semiconductor LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Barkan, David) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
May 29, 2018 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Monica A Hernandez For Defendants (Hernandez, Monica) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 74 Declaration of Monica A. Hernandez in Support of #73 Claim Construction Statement - Defendants' Opposition to Claim Construction Brief filed bySilicon Mitus Technology, Inc., Silicon Mitus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) #73 ) (Jakopin, David) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 73 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT - Defendants' Opposition to Claim Construction Brief filed by Silicon Mitus Technology, Inc., Silicon Mitus, Inc.. (Jakopin, David) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION CONTINUING the Filing Deadlines for Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief and Plaintiffs' Reply Claim Construction Brief #70 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION for Leave to File to File Addendum to Parties' Joint Claim Construction & Prehearing Statement #69 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
May 16, 2018 Filing 70 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Continuing the Filing Deadlines for Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief and Plaintiffs' Reply Claim Construction Brief filed by Silicon Mitus Technology, Inc., Silicon Mitus, Inc.. (Sweeney, Dianne) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
May 14, 2018 Filing 69 Joint MOTION for Leave to File to File Addendum to Parties' Joint Claim Construction & Prehearing Statement filed by Maxim Integrated Products, Inc., Volterra Semiconductor LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Addendum)(Barkan, David) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
May 8, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Wade Hindman for Defendants (Hindman, Matthew) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 4, 2018 Filing 67 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT -OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Maxim Integrated Products, Inc., Volterra Semiconductor LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Barkan, David) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
April 13, 2018 Filing 66 Certification of ADR Session by Evaluator Stephen C. Durant: I hereby certify that the parties in this matter held an ENE session on 4/12/2018. The case did not settle. Further facilitated discussions are not expected. ENE is complete. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2018)
April 3, 2018 Set/Reset Hearing ENE Hearing set for 4/12/2018 09:30 AM., the law offices of Schwegman Lundberg Woessner, 150 Almaden Boulevard, Suite 750, San Jose, CA 95113. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION Allowing Service of Amended Pat. L.R. 3-1 Infringement Contentions #62 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
April 2, 2018 Filing 64 EXHIBITS re #61 Claim Construction Statement (JOINT SUBMISSION) filed byMaxim Integrated Products, Inc., Volterra Semiconductor LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (REDACTED VERSION), #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3 (REDACTED VERSION), #6 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) #61 ) (Barkan, David) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
April 2, 2018 Filing 63 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits in Support of #61 Parties' Jt Claim Construction & Prehearing Statement filed by Maxim Integrated Products, Inc., Volterra Semiconductor LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David M. Barkan, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED VERSION of Ex. A to Parties' Jt Claim Construction & Prehearing Statement, #4 UNREDACTED VERSION of Ex. A to Parties' Jt Claim Construction & Prehearing Statement, #5 REDACTED VERSION of Ex. 3 to Parties' Jt Claim Construction & Prehearing Statement, #6 UNREDACTED VERSION of Ex. 3 to Parties' Jt Claim Construction & Prehearing Statement)(Barkan, David) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
April 2, 2018 Filing 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Allowing Service of Amended Pat. L.R. 3-1 Infringement Contentions filed by Maxim Integrated Products, Inc., Volterra Semiconductor LLC. (Barkan, David) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
March 28, 2018 Filing 61 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT and Prehearing Statement (JOINT) filed by Maxim Integrated Products, Inc., Volterra Semiconductor LLC. (Barkan, David) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION Continuing the Filing Deadline for the Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement (Patent LR 4-3) #59 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
March 26, 2018 Filing 59 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Continuing the Filing Deadline for the Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement (Patent LR 4-3) filed by Silicon Mitus Technology, Inc., Silicon Mitus, Inc.. (Jakopin, David) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 FIRST AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/22/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION for Entry of Amended Stipulated Protective Order #55 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
March 21, 2018 Filing 56 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Further Case Management Conference held on 3/21/2018: Tutorial Hearing set for 6/6/2018 10:30 AM; Parties to meet and confer and submit scheduling proposal for Markman Hearing. Plaintiffs' Attorney: David Barkan. Defendants' Attorneys: David Jakopin, Diane Sweeney. (FTR Time: 10:30am - 10:40am.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/21/2018)
March 21, 2018 Filing 55 Joint MOTION for Entry of Amended Stipulated Protective Order filed by Maxim Integrated Products, Inc., Volterra Semiconductor LLC. Responses due by 4/4/2018. Replies due by 4/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Redlined (Proposed) Amended Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B-(Proposed) Amended Stipulated Protective Order)(Barkan, David) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 20, 2018 Filing 54 CLERK'S NOTICE: Counsel may participate by telephone at the Case Management Conference set for 10:00 AM on 3/21/2018 and must contact the Courtroom Deputy at Lili_Harrell@cand.uscourts.gov to provide a direct dial number for their appearance. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2018)
March 14, 2018 Filing 53 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (SUPPLEMENTAL) filed by Maxim Integrated Products, Inc., Volterra Semiconductor LLC. (Barkan, David) (Filed on 3/14/2018)
March 6, 2018 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by James L. Huguenin-Love (Huguenin-Love, James) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER EXTENDING Deadline to complete ENE to 4/30/2018 by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2018)
February 22, 2018 Filing 50 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING Further Case Management Conference to 3/21/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 3/14/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2018)
February 21, 2018 Filing 49 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Silicon Mitus Technology, Inc., Silicon Mitus, Inc.. (Jakopin, David) (Filed on 2/21/2018)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION Regarding the Discovery of Electronically Stored Information #47 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
February 13, 2018 Filing 47 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding the Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by Silicon Mitus Technology, Inc., Silicon Mitus, Inc.. (Sweeney, Dianne) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Aaron Pirouznia Pro Hac Vice #45 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
February 1, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12076319.) filed by Maxim Integrated Products, Inc., Volterra Semiconductor LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing)(Pirouznia, Aaron) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION Rescheduling Case Management Conference to 2/28/2018 at 10:00 AM #43 . Case Management Statement due by 2/21/2018. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/26/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 26, 2018 Filing 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Rescheduling Case Mgmt Conference filed by Maxim Integrated Products, Inc., Volterra Semiconductor LLC. (Barkan, David) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Sooho Lee (Lee, Sooho) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 10, 2018 Filing 41 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Stephen C. Durant as ENE Evaluator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 9, 2018 Filing 40 STIPULATION of Parties Re Correct Dates for Negotiating ESI Order filed by Maxim Integrated Products, Inc., Volterra Semiconductor LLC. (Barkan, David) (Filed on 1/9/2018)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/18/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 15, 2017 Filing 38 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Silicon Mitus Technology, Inc., Silicon Mitus, Inc.. (Jakopin, David) (Filed on 12/15/2017)
December 7, 2017 Filing 37 NOTICE by Silicon Mitus Technology, Inc., Silicon Mitus, Inc. [NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF TAE H. KIM OF LEE & KO] (Sweeney, Dianne) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATED AND INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/5/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
December 5, 2017 Filing 35 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #34 Order on Stipulation [STIPULATION AND PROPOSED INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER] filed by Silicon Mitus Technology, Inc., Silicon Mitus, Inc.. (Sweeney, Dianne) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION to extend deadline to file a proposed protective order to 12/15/2017 #33 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2017)
November 30, 2017 Filing 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #32 Case Management Scheduling Order,,, filed by Silicon Mitus Technology, Inc., Silicon Mitus, Inc.. (Sweeney, Dianne) (Filed on 11/30/2017)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2017 is VACATED; Deadline to amend pleadings and add parties is 11/29/2017; Further Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2018 10:00 AM, with updated CMC statement due by 2/7/2018; Markman Hearing will be held on 6/6/2018 01:00 PM; Non-expert discovery must be completed by 10/19/2018; All discovery of expert witnesses must be completed by 11/30/2018; Parties must file and serve all dispositive and Daubert motions by 12/21/2018; Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2019 02:00 PM; Jury Trial set for 4/8/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/30/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 25, 2017 Filing 31 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by Silicon Mitus Technology, Inc., Silicon Mitus, Inc.. (Jakopin, David) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Early Neutral Evaluation re #29 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/18/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2017)
October 17, 2017 Filing 29 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Early Neutral Evaluation by Maxim Integrated Products, Inc. filed by Maxim Integrated Products, Inc.. (Barkan, David) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 16, 2017 Filing 28 ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
October 11, 2017 Filing 27 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Silicon Mitus Technology, Inc. (Sweeney, Dianne) (Filed on 10/11/2017)
October 11, 2017 Filing 26 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Silicon Mitus, Inc. (Sweeney, Dianne) (Filed on 10/11/2017)
October 9, 2017 Filing 25 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options with Volterra Semiconductor LLC (Barkan, David) (Filed on 10/9/2017)
October 9, 2017 Filing 24 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options with Maxim Integrated Products, Inc. (Barkan, David) (Filed on 10/9/2017)
October 9, 2017 Filing 23 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM #20 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, of Silicon Mitus Technology, Inc. byMaxim Integrated Products, Inc., Volterra Semiconductor LLC. (Barkan, David) (Filed on 10/9/2017)
October 9, 2017 Filing 22 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM #21 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, byMaxim Integrated Products, Inc., Volterra Semiconductor LLC. (Barkan, David) (Filed on 10/9/2017)
September 25, 2017 Filing 21 Defendant Silicon Mitus, Inc.'s Answer and Counterclaims to Complaint for Patent Infringement ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs bySilicon Mitus, Inc.. (Jakopin, David) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 25, 2017 Filing 20 Defendant Silicon Mitus Technology, Inc.'s Answer and Counterclaims to Complaint for Patent Infringement ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Counter COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs bySilicon Mitus Technology, Inc.. (Jakopin, David) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION #18 . Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose.Case Management Statement due by 10/25/2017. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/22/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2017)
August 21, 2017 Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue the Initial Case Management Conference filed by Silicon Mitus Technology, Inc., Silicon Mitus, Inc.. (Sweeney, Dianne) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
August 17, 2017 Filing 17 Statement Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by Silicon Mitus Technology, Inc., Silicon Mitus, Inc.. (Sweeney, Dianne) (Filed on 8/17/2017)
August 17, 2017 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Silicon Mitus Technology, Inc., Silicon Mitus, Inc... (Sweeney, Dianne) (Filed on 8/17/2017)
August 3, 2017 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/17/2017. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
July 10, 2017 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Silicon Mitus Technology, Inc., Silicon Mitus, Inc.. (Jakopin, David) (Filed on 7/10/2017)
July 3, 2017 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Maxim Integrated Products, Inc., Volterra Semiconductor LLC.. (Sobolev, Michael) (Filed on 7/3/2017)
June 20, 2017 Filing 12 Civil Cover Sheet by Maxim Integrated Products, Inc., Volterra Semiconductor LLC (Corrected Version). (Barkan, David) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
June 19, 2017 Filing 11 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patents (cc: form mailed to register). (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
June 19, 2017 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Silicon Mitus Technology, Inc., Silicon Mitus, Inc.. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
June 19, 2017 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/13/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
June 19, 2017 Filing 8 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/3/2017. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
June 19, 2017 Electronic filing error. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Maxim Integrated Products, Inc., Volterra Semiconductor LLC. Please re-file Civil Cover Sheet using the latest version (6/1/17) available on our website. Use the docketing event Civil Cover Sheet found under other filings - other documents. Thank you. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
June 16, 2017 Filing 7 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint, (Exhibits G, H, & J) filed byMaxim Integrated Products, Inc., Volterra Semiconductor LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G, #2 Exhibit H, #3 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Barkan, David) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
June 16, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE by Maxim Integrated Products, Inc., Volterra Semiconductor LLC of Prior Terminated Litigation Involving Two of the Patents in This Action (Barkan, David) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
June 16, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE by Maxim Integrated Products, Inc., Volterra Semiconductor LLC -Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent (Barkan, David) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
June 16, 2017 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Volterra Semiconductor LLC identifying Corporate Parent Maxim Integrated Products, Inc. for Volterra Semiconductor LLC. (Barkan, David) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
June 16, 2017 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Maxim Integrated Products, Inc. (Barkan, David) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
June 16, 2017 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Barkan, David) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
June 16, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Silicon Mitus Technology, Inc., Silicon Mitus, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11479636.). Filed byMaxim Integrated Products, Inc., Volterra Semiconductor LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barkan, David) (Filed on 6/16/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxim Integrated Products, Inc. et al v. Silicon Mitus Technology, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Volterra Semiconductor LLC
Represented By: David M. Barkan
Represented By: Aaron Potter Pirouznia
Represented By: James L. Huguenin-Love
Represented By: Michael Sobolev
Represented By: Christopher Scott Marchese
Represented By: Jennifer McGuone Lantz
Represented By: Gary J Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maxim Integrated Products, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Barkan
Represented By: Aaron Potter Pirouznia
Represented By: James L. Huguenin-Love
Represented By: Michael Sobolev
Represented By: Christopher Scott Marchese
Represented By: Jennifer McGuone Lantz
Represented By: Gary J Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silicon Mitus Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Sooho Lee
Represented By: Matthew Wade Hindman
Represented By: Tae H. Kim
Represented By: Monica A Hernandez
Represented By: David A. Jakopin
Represented By: Dianne L. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silicon Mitus, Inc.
Represented By: Sooho Lee
Represented By: Matthew Wade Hindman
Represented By: Tae H. Kim
Represented By: Monica A Hernandez
Represented By: David A. Jakopin
Represented By: Dianne L. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?