Gens v. Kaelin

Appellant: Laura A. Gens
Appellee: Doris Kaelin
Case Number: 5:2017cv03601
Filed: June 22, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2017 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 8 DEBTOR'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER DENYING STAY PENDING APPEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/19/2017.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2017)
July 18, 2017 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 4 DEBTOR'S MOTION FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/18/2017.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2017)
June 23, 2017 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 1 APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/23/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gens v. Kaelin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Laura A. Gens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Doris Kaelin
Represented By: Gregg Steven Kleiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?