Zorrilla et al v. Bank of America, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Maria Zorrilla and Hugo Zorrilla
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.,, TIAA, FSB and MTGLQ Investors
Case Number: 5:2017cv03865
Filed: July 7, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The parties are ordered to appear at 9:00 a.m. on 12/14/2017 to show cause why the court should not impose any and all appropriate sanctions, including monetary sanctions or dismissal of this action, on the parties, or any of them, for willful disobedience of a court order. Show Cause Response due by 12/8/2017. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/8/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2017)
October 17, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 30 STIPULATION TO ATTEND MEDIATION AND FURTHER EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/17/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
August 22, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 21 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/22/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zorrilla et al v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Zorrilla
Represented By: Nikhil Bhatnagar
Represented By: Vikas Bhatnagar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugo Zorrilla
Represented By: Nikhil Bhatnagar
Represented By: Vikas Bhatnagar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.,
Represented By: Ethan Schatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIAA, FSB
Represented By: Christopher David Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTGLQ Investors
Represented By: Jodi Krystyn Swick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?