Google Inc. v. Equustek Solutions Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Google Inc. is seeking to prevent enforcement in the United States of a Canadian court order that prohibits Google from publishing within the United States search result information related to Datalink.

Plaintiff: Google Inc.
Defendant: Equustek Solutions Inc., Clarma Enterprises Inc. and Robert Angus
Amicus: Electronic Frontier Foundation
Case Number: 5:2017cv04207
Filed: July 24, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2017 53 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants Equustek Solutions Inc., Clarma Enterprises Inc., and Robert Angus, for Permanent Injunctive Relief filed by Google LLC. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 11/30/2017. Replies due by 12/7/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 11/16/2017)
November 6, 2017 52 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google LLC re 51 Clerk's Notice of Entry of Default (Homer, Carolyn) (Filed on 11/6/2017)
November 3, 2017 51 Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to EQUUSTEK SOLUTIONS, INC, CLARMA ENTERPRISES INC., and ROBERT ANGUS (Related documents(s) 45 )(pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
November 3, 2017 50 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING and TERMINATING MOTION ECF 48 AS MOOT. Please take NOTICE that the Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/9/2017 is hereby VACATED. Plaintiff's Motion ECF 48 to Appear via Telephone is terminated as MOOT. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
November 3, 2017 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google LLC re 47 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Homer, Carolyn) (Filed on 11/3/2017)
November 2, 2017 48 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for November 9, 2017 Case Management Conference filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 47 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 16 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/2/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2017)
November 2, 2017 46 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward J. Davila: Motion Hearing re 16 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Prohibiting U.S. Enforcement of Plaintiffs Delisting Order Obtained In Canada filed by Google LLC held on 11/2/2017. The Court heard oral argument and took the matter under submission. The Court will address the upcoming Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/9/2017 in the Court order when issues re motion. Plaintiff Attorney: Melissa Caruso. Defendant Attorney: No appearance. Total Time in Court:9:01-9:30AM(29 Mins.) Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/2/2017)
October 31, 2017 45 MOTION for Entry of Default of All Defendants filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service of Google's Request for Entry of Default and Case Management Statement)(Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 31, 2017 44 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Google LLC. (Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 12, 2017 43 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 41 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REFLECT CHANGE OF NAME FROM GOOGLE INC. TO GOOGLE LLC. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/12/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2017)
October 6, 2017 42 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google LLC identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc., Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc. for Google LLC. re 6 Certificate of Interested Entities (Amended) (Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
October 6, 2017 41 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to change caption from Google Inc. to Google LLC filed by Google LLC. Responses due by 10/10/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of M. Caruso with Exhibits, # 2 Proposed Order)(Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
October 6, 2017 40 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 32 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/6/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
October 4, 2017 39 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING. Please take NOTICE that the motion hearing scheduled for 10/18/2017 as to 16 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Prohibiting U.S. Enforcement of Plaintiffs Delisting Order Obtained In Canada is RESET to 11/2/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Judge Edward J. Davila. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
October 4, 2017 38 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING MOTION HEARING. Please take NOTICE that the motion hearing date as to 16 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Prohibiting U.S. Enforcement of Plaintiffs Delisting Order Obtained In Canada scheduled for 10/26/2017 is ADVANCED for hearing to 10/18/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Judge Edward J. Davila. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
September 21, 2017 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 36 Reply to Opposition/Response in support of Google's Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief (Homer, Carolyn) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 21, 2017 36 REPLY (re 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Prohibiting U.S. Enforcement of Plaintiffs Delisting Order Obtained In Canada ) filed byGoogle Inc.. (Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 18, 2017 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Electronic Frontier Foundation re 27 Order on Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation, Computer & Communications Industry Association, Center for Democracy & Technology, and Public Knowledge (McSherry, Corynne) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
September 18, 2017 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wikimedia Foundation re 32 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief and Declaration of Jacob Rogers, 33 Certificate of Interested Entities, 31 Notice of Appearance (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
September 15, 2017 33 Certificate of Interested Entities by Wikimedia Foundation (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 15, 2017 32 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief and Declaration of Jacob Rogers filed by Wikimedia Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Amicus Curiae Brief of the Wikimedia Foundation, # 2 Declaration of Jacob Rogers, # 3 Proposed Order)(Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 15, 2017 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia Clare Hofmann as counsel for the Wikimedia Foundation (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
September 15, 2017 30 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. Please take NOTICE that the Motion hearing as to 16 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Prohibiting U.S. Enforcement of Plaintiffs Delisting Order Obtained In Canada scheduled for 10/5/2017 is hereby CONTINUED to 10/26/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2017)
August 25, 2017 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Electronic Frontier Foundation re 27 Order on Motion for Leave to File, 28 Brief, of Amici Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation, Computer & Communications Industry Association, Center for Democracy & Technology, and Public Knowledge (McSherry, Corynne) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 25, 2017 28 Brief re 27 Order on Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief of Electronic Frontier Foundation, The Computer & Communications Industry Association, The Center for Democracy & Technology, and Public Knowledge in Support of Plaintiff Google's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Related document(s) 27 ) (McSherry, Corynne) (Filed on 8/25/2017)
August 23, 2017 27 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 23 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/23/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2017)
August 11, 2017 ***Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearing pursuant to ECF 26 as to 16 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Prohibiting U.S. Enforcement of Plaintiffs Delisting Order Obtained In Canada. Responses due by 9/7/2017. Replies due by 9/21/2017. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 11, 2017 26 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 25 STIPULATION TO ENLARGE TIME. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/11/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
August 10, 2017 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Prohibiting U.S. Enforcement of Plaintiffs Delisting Order Obtained In Canada stipulation to enlarge briefing and hearing dates filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 8/10/2017)
August 7, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 23 MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief of Electronic Frontier Foundation, Computer & Communications Industry Association, Center For Democracy & Technology, and Public Knowledge in Support of Plaintiff Google's Motion For Prelim. Responses due by 8/21/2017. Replies due by 8/28/2017. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 7, 2017 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Electronic Frontier Foundation re 22 Notice of Appearance, 21 Notice of Appearance, 20 Certificate of Interested Entities, 23 MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief of Electronic Frontier Foundation, Computer & Communications Industry Association, Center For Democracy & Technology, and Public Knowledge in Support of Plaintiff Google's Motion For Prelim inary Injunction (McSherry, Corynne) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 7, 2017 23 MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief of Electronic Frontier Foundation, Computer & Communications Industry Association, Center For Democracy & Technology, and Public Knowledge in Support of Plaintiff Google's Motion For Preliminary Injunction filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Brief of Amicus Curiae, # 2 Proposed Order)(McSherry, Corynne) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 7, 2017 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Vera Ranieri as counsel for Electronic Frontier Foundation, Computer & Communications Industry Association, Center For Democracy & Technology, and Public Knowledge (Ranieri, Vera) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 7, 2017 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron David Mackey as counsel for Electronic Frontier Foundation, Computer & Communications Industry Association, Center for Democracy & Technology, and Public Knowledge (Mackey, Aaron) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
August 7, 2017 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Electronic Frontier Foundation , Computer & Communications Industry Association, Center for Democracy & Technology, and Public Knowledge (McSherry, Corynne) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
July 28, 2017 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 10 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint, 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Prohibiting U.S. Enforcement of Plaintiffs Delisting Order Obtained In Canada ; Service accomplished as to Defendant Robert Angus (Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 7/28/2017)
July 28, 2017 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 1 Complaint, 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Prohibiting U.S. Enforcement of Plaintiffs Delisting Order Obtained In Canada, 11 Summons Issued ; Service accomplished as to Defendant Clarma Enterprises Inc. (Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 7/28/2017)
July 28, 2017 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc. re 12 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint, 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Prohibiting U.S. Enforcement of Plaintiffs Delisting Order Obtained In Canada ; Service accomplished as to Defendant Equustek Solutions Inc. (Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 7/28/2017)
July 27, 2017 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunctive Relief Prohibiting U.S. Enforcement of Plaintiffs Delisting Order Obtained In Canada filed by Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/14/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 8/10/2017. Replies due by 8/17/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew Strait with Exhibits, # 2 Declaration of Stephen Schachter with Exhibits 1-21, # 3 Exhibit s 22-26 to the Declaration of Stephen Schachter, # 4 Declaration of Margret Caruso with Exhibits, # 5 Proposed Order)(Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 7/27/2017) Modified on 7/28/2017 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2017 15 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/2/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2017)
July 25, 2017 14 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 7/25/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
July 25, 2017 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
July 25, 2017 12 Summons Issued as to Equustek Solutions Inc.. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
July 25, 2017 11 Summons Issued as to Clarma Enterprises Inc.. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
July 25, 2017 10 Summons Issued as to Robert Angus. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
July 25, 2017 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/18/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/25/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
July 25, 2017 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Google Inc... (Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
July 25, 2017 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/8/2017. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
July 24, 2017 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Google Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc. for Google Inc.. (Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 24, 2017 5 Proposed Summons. (Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 24, 2017 4 Proposed Summons. (Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 24, 2017 3 Proposed Summons. (Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 24, 2017 2 ***Filed In Error. See Document No. 5 ***Proposed Summons. (Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 7/24/2017) Modified on 7/25/2017 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2017 1 COMPLAINT for declaratory and injunctive relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11571971.). Filed byGoogle Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Caruso, Margret) (Filed on 7/24/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Google Inc. v. Equustek Solutions Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Google Inc.
Represented By: Margret Mary Caruso
Represented By: Carolyn Myrle Homer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equustek Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarma Enterprises Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Angus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Electronic Frontier Foundation
Represented By: Aaron David Mackey
Represented By: Corynne McSherry
Represented By: Vera Ranieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?