Razavi v. Coti et al

Plaintiff: Melina Razavi
Defendant: Carlos Coti, Geico Insurance, Progressive Insurance, Tony Soria, John Sgalio and Stephanie Church
Case Number: 5:2017cv04341
Filed: July 31, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Amended Pleading due by 1/5/2018. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/6/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
November 9, 2017 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 12/1/2017. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/9/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2017)
August 22, 2017 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; AND DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Amended Pleading due by 9/21/2017. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/22/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2017)
August 2, 2017 4 Opinion or Order of the Court Order that Case be Reassigned to a District Judge, Order Granting Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Report and Recommendation signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/2/2017. Objections due by 8/16/2017. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Razavi v. Coti et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melina Razavi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Coti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Soria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Sgalio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?