Looksmart Group, Inc. v. Microsoft Corporation

Plaintiff: Looksmart Group, Inc.
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Case Number: 5:2017cv04709
Filed: August 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 110 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Abbreviate Briefing and Argument Schedule for Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Strike filed by Microsoft Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 29, 2019. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 104 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER re Request for Order Changing Time filed by Looksmart Group, Inc. Provide Rule 26 opening expert report on issues for which they carry the burden of proof 3/15/2019. Pro vide rebuttal expert reports 4/15/2019. Close of expert discovery 5/1/2019. Parties must file dispositive and Daubert motions 5/14/2019. Responses to dispositive and Daubert motions 6/4/2019. Replies to dispositive and Daubert< /i> motions 6/13/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 1:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Jury Trial set for 12/2/2019 at 8:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 26, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER RE: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 95 Motion to Amend/Correct. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL MAY APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 90 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order That Plaintiffs Lead Trial Counsel May Appear By Te lephone At Further Case Management Conference filed by Looksmart Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 5, 2018. Please email to the Courtroom Deputy Clerk jstcrd@cand.uscourts.gov a direct dial number where the attorney appearing by telephone can be reached at the time of the hearing. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 86 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Microsoft Corporation. Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 29, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 78 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Amend Microsoft's Answer filed by Microsoft Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 26, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 58 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request for Order Changing Time filed by Looksmart Group, Inc. Parties' document production on damages issues to be substantially complete 5/8/2018. Excha nge of Preliminary Claim Constructions and Extrinsic Evidence 5/11/2018. Disclosure of Initial Damages Contentions 5/22/2018. Joint claim Construction and Prehearing Statement 6/1/2018. Disclosure of Responsive Damages Contentions 6/21/2018. Clai m construction discovery cut-off 6/18/2018. Claim construction opening brief 7/2/2018. Claim construction responsive brief 7/16/2018. Claim construction reply brief 7/23/2018. Tutorial Hearing set for 8/14/2018 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. Claim Construction Hearing set for 8/28/2018 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 22, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2018)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 55 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Granting the Parties' Request to Amend Contentions Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-6 filed by Looksmart Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 17, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER CHANGING TIME re 43 Joint MOTION Stipulated Request for Order Changing Time filed by Looksmart Group, Inc. Tutorial Hearing set for 8/7/2018 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. Claim Construction Hearing set for 8/21/2018 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 26, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Looksmart Group, Inc. filed by Looksmart Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 16, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Looksmart Group, Inc. v. Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Looksmart Group, Inc.
Represented By: Darrell Rae Atkinson
Represented By: Robert Allan Bullwinkel
Represented By: Eric James Enger
Represented By: Lyndsey C. Heaton
Represented By: Spencer Hosie
Represented By: Christopher L Limbacher
Represented By: Leslie V. Payne
Represented By: Diane Sue Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: David E. Killough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?