July 16, 2019 |
Filing
195
ORDER GRANTING LOOKSMART'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF LOOKSMART'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS STRIKING MICROSOFT'S BELATEDLY DISCLOSED NON-INFRINGEMENT DEFENSES AND EXHIBITS THERETO by Judge Jon S. Tigar. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
|
April 29, 2019 |
Filing
111
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 110 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Abbreviate Briefing and Argument Schedule for Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Strike filed by Microsoft Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 29, 2019. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
|
February 26, 2019 |
Filing
105
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 104 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER re Request for Order Changing Time filed by Looksmart Group, Inc. Provide Rule 26 opening expert report on issues for which they carry the burden of proof 3/15/2019. Pro vide rebuttal expert reports 4/15/2019. Close of expert discovery 5/1/2019. Parties must file dispositive and Daubert motions 5/14/2019. Responses to dispositive and Daubert motions 6/4/2019. Replies to dispositive and Daubert< /i> motions 6/13/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 1:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Jury Trial set for 12/2/2019 at 8:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 26, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
|
February 6, 2019 |
Filing
103
ORDER RE: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 95 Motion to Amend/Correct. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
|
December 5, 2018 |
Filing
91
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL MAY APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 90 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order That Plaintiffs Lead Trial Counsel May Appear By Te lephone At Further Case Management Conference filed by Looksmart Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 5, 2018. Please email to the Courtroom Deputy Clerk jstcrd@cand.uscourts.gov a direct dial number where the attorney appearing by telephone can be reached at the time of the hearing. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
|
October 29, 2018 |
Filing
87
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 86 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Microsoft Corporation. Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 29, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
|
September 26, 2018 |
Filing
79
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 78 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Amend Microsoft's Answer filed by Microsoft Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 26, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
|
May 22, 2018 |
Filing
59
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 58 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request for Order Changing Time filed by Looksmart Group, Inc. Parties' document production on damages issues to be substantially complete 5/8/2018. Excha nge of Preliminary Claim Constructions and Extrinsic Evidence 5/11/2018. Disclosure of Initial Damages Contentions 5/22/2018. Joint claim Construction and Prehearing Statement 6/1/2018. Disclosure of Responsive Damages Contentions 6/21/2018. Clai m construction discovery cut-off 6/18/2018. Claim construction opening brief 7/2/2018. Claim construction responsive brief 7/16/2018. Claim construction reply brief 7/23/2018. Tutorial Hearing set for 8/14/2018 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. Claim Construction Hearing set for 8/28/2018 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 22, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2018)
|
May 17, 2018 |
Filing
57
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 55 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Granting the Parties' Request to Amend Contentions Pursuant to Patent L.R. 3-6 filed by Looksmart Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 17, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
|
January 26, 2018 |
Filing
45
ORDER CHANGING TIME re 43 Joint MOTION Stipulated Request for Order Changing Time filed by Looksmart Group, Inc. Tutorial Hearing set for 8/7/2018 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. Claim Construction Hearing set for 8/21/2018 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 26, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
|
November 16, 2017 |
Filing
33
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Looksmart Group, Inc. filed by Looksmart Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 16, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2017)
|