Yan Mei Zheng-Lawson et al v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Yan Mei Zheng-Lawson, Yuanteng Pei and Joanne E. Ferrara
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota North America, Inc. and Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 5:2017cv06591
Filed: November 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER RE 84 , 87 , 89 , 92 , 95 PENDING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/29/2019. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 67 MOTION TO DISMISS AND STRIKE PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Amended Pleading due by 1/4/2019. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/13/2018. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING 33 MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND IN PART AND WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND IN PART; AND DENYING 33 MOTION TO STRIKE. Amended Pleading due by 6/20/2018. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/21/2018.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yan Mei Zheng-Lawson et al v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yan Mei Zheng-Lawson
Represented By: Robert S. Green
Represented By: James Robert Noblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yuanteng Pei
Represented By: Robert S. Green
Represented By: James Robert Noblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne E. Ferrara
Represented By: Robert S. Green
Represented By: James Robert Noblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Brian Margulies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?