Perdomo v. Plumber
Plaintiff: Carlos Perdomo
Defendant: Plumber
Case Number: 5:2017cv06962
Filed: December 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: PSLC CLA
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT; REOPENING CASE; GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Beth Labson Freeman.Granting 19 Motion for Leave to File. Amended Complaint due by 12/7/2018. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/25/2018: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 JUDGMENT Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/22/2018. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT.Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/11/2018. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2018: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perdomo v. Plumber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Perdomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plumber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?