AdTrader, Inc. v. Google LLC
Plaintiff: AdTrader, Inc.
Defendant: Google LLC
Case Number: 5:2017cv07082
Filed: December 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 363 FURTHER ORDER re 311 , 362 Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Evidence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 11/19/2021. (vkdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2021)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 325 CIVIL MINUTE ORDER RE MID-DEPOSITION DISPUTE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 7/19/2021. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2021)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER GRANTING 305 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF CLASS NOTICE PLAN FOR ADWORDS ADVERTISER CLASS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/23/2021. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 306 March 8, 2021 Discovery Dispute Letter. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2021)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 297 August 3, 2020 Discovery Dispute Letter. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2020)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 187 , 197 August 27, 2019 Discovery Dispute re Privilege Claim and Google's Motion for Protective Order. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 INTERIM ORDER re 197 Discovery Letter Brief re Privilege Dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 8/28/2019. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2019)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 162 Discovery Dispute re Privileged Information withheld by Google. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 157 Discovery Dispute re Plaintiffs' Interrogatories. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER DENYING SEALING MOTIONS AT ECF 132 AND 142 . Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/8/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER GRANTING WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 76 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS SAC. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/22/2019.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL AT ECF 119 . Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/5/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER DENYING 121 PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/4/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 110 Discovery Dispute re Communications with Publishers and Advertisers. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 97 November 19, 2018 Joint Discovery Dispute Letter. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi denying 85 defendant's Motion for Reconsideration; granting 91 defendant's Motion for Administrative Relief. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER DENYING 86 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S NON-DISPOSITIVE PRE-TRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/16/2018. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Setting Discovery Hearing. Discovery Hearing re 85 , 91 set for 11/20/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 11/14/2018. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Setting Briefing re 85 Google's Motion for Reconsideration. AdTrader's response due by 11/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 11/8/2018. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 74 September 13, 2018 Joint Discovery Dispute Letter. AdTrader's motion to compel is granted. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER DENYING 75 DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/26/2018. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING WITH LEAVE TO AMEND IN PART AND WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 36 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/13/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DENYING 32 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/19/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AdTrader, Inc. v. Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AdTrader, Inc.
Represented By: Randolph Gaw
Represented By: Victor Meng
Represented By: Mark Weylin Poe
Represented By: Samuel S. Song
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Gutkin
Represented By: Audrey Jane Mott-Smith
Represented By: Michael Graham Rhodes
Represented By: Kyle Christopher Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?