LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C. et al v. LegalZoom.Com, Inc. et al Featured Case

An IP attorney has filed suit against LegalZoom and several state bars alleging that legal tech company violates unauthorized practice of law rules and that the state bars turn a blind eye to these violations. The plaintiff attorney claims that LegalZoom is effectively practicing law but disclaiming status as a law firm and thus avoiding the regulatory costs associated with being one.

Plaintiff: LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, LegalForce, Inc. and Raj V. Abhyanker
Defendant: LegalZoom.com, Inc., LegalZoom Legal Services Ltd., Brian P. Y. Liu, Edward Richard Hartman, Brian S. Lee, United States Patent & Trademark Office, State Bar of California, State Bar of Arizona and State Bar of Texas
Case Number: 5:2017cv07194
Filed: December 19, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2018 143 Featured Case ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; VACATING HEARING; CONDITIONALLY CLOSING CASE FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 10, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
July 9, 2018 142 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of the Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. 119) by LegalForce, Inc. (Ma, Wensheng) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 6, 2018 141 REPLY (re 121 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint ) filed byLegalZoom.com, Inc.. (Doolin, Michelle) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 140 Featured Case ORDER RE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL. State Bar of Arizona's notice of withdrawal as to Jeffrey L. Sklar is approved. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 6, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 5, 2018 139 Featured Case ORDER. LegalForce, Inc. v. LegalZoom.com, Inc., 17-7194 MMC, is not related to LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C., et al. v. UpCounsel, Inc., et al., 18-2573 YGR. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 5, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2018)
June 29, 2018 138 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 121 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint ) pursuant to 134 court order filed byLegalForce, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Raj Abhyanker, # 2 Exhibit A-C)(Ma, Wensheng) (Filed on 6/29/2018)
June 28, 2018 137 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 135 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED ) filed byLegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, LegalForce, Inc.. (Ma, Wensheng) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
June 27, 2018 136 NOTICE by State Bar of Arizona to Withdraw (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order )(Sklar, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/27/2018) Modified on 6/28/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2018 135 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by UpCounsel, Inc., Elizabeth J Oliner, Seth Weiner, Kanika Radhakrishnan. Responses due by 6/29/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jesselyn Friley, # 2 Proposed Order)(Agnolucci, Simona) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
June 20, 2018 134 Featured Case ORDER DENYING AS PREMATURE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. To facilitate the orderly resolution of the issues presented, the Court denies as premature LegalForce's Motion for Leave, and affords LegalForce leave to file, no later than June 29, 2018, opposition to the Motion to Dismiss. If LegalForce chooses to avail itself of such opportunity, LegalZoom shall file its reply no later than July 6, 2018. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 20, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2018)
June 15, 2018 133 OBJECTIONS to re 129 Reply to Opposition/Response To Reply Evidence by LegalZoom.com, Inc.. (Doolin, Michelle) (Filed on 6/15/2018)
June 14, 2018 132 Statement of Non-Opposition re 121 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed byLegalForce, Inc.. (Related document(s) 121 ) (Ma, Wensheng) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
June 14, 2018 131 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Nicholas C. Craft is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 14, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
June 13, 2018 130 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12431703.) filed by LegalForce, Inc.. (Craft, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
June 8, 2018 129 REPLY (re 120 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Leave to Amend to file Third Amended Complaint (TAC) ) filed byLegalForce, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 1, 2, and 3)(Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 6/8/2018)
June 8, 2018 128 Request for Judicial Notice re 120 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Leave to Amend to file Third Amended Complaint (TAC) filed byLegalForce, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 120 ) (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 6/8/2018) Modified on 6/11/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2018 ***Deadlines terminated. Set/Reset Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 127 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11, 120 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Leave to Amend to file Third Amended Complaint (TAC). Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/7/2018 10:30 AM. Case Management Statement due by 8/31/2018. Motion Hearing set for 7/20/2018 09:00 AM before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
June 5, 2018 127 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The hearing on plaintiff's motion for leave to file a Third Amended Complaint is continued to July 20, 2018, at 9:00 a.m. The Case Management Conference is continued from July 27, 2018, to September 7, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than August 31, 2018. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 5, 2018.(mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
June 4, 2018 126 *** DUPLICATE ENTRY *** REPLY (re 123 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Continue Hearing Date re 120 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Leave to Amend to file Third Amended Complaint (TAC) ) blank page 6 deleted filed byLegalForce, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Raj Abhyanker, # 2 Proposed Order)(Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 6/4/2018) Modified on 6/5/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/5/2018
June 4, 2018 125 REPLY (re 123 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Continue Hearing Date re 120 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Leave to Amend to file Third Amended Complaint (TAC) ) filed byLegalForce, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Raj V. Abhyanker, # 2 Proposed Order)(Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
June 1, 2018 124 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 120 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Leave to Amend to file Third Amended Complaint (TAC) ) filed byLegalZoom.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Doolin, Michelle) (Filed on 6/1/2018)
May 31, 2018 123 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Continue Hearing Date re 120 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Leave to Amend to file Third Amended Complaint (TAC) filed by LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Responses due by 6/4/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michelle C. Doolin)(Doolin, Michelle) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 122 Request for Judicial Notice re 121 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed byLegalZoom.com, Inc.. (Related document(s) 121 ) (Doolin, Michelle) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 121 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/20/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 6/14/2018. Replies due by 6/21/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Doolin, Michelle) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 18, 2018 120 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion for Leave to Amend to file Third Amended Complaint (TAC) filed by LegalForce, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 6/1/2018. Replies due by 6/8/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit [Proposed] Third Amended Complaint, # 2 Declaration of Raj Abhyanker, # 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order granting Leave to file TAC)(Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 17, 2018 119 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Filed byLegalForce, Inc.. (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 16, 2018 118 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 5/16/2018 by Tamara Lange. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 9, 2018 117 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 9, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 8, 2018 116 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Wednesday, May 16, 2018, at 10:00 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 7, 2018 115 USCA Case Number 18-15802 USCA for 114 Notice of Appeal, filed by LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 2, 2018 114 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C. Appeal of Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, 111 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-12321939 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order being Appealed Dkt 111, Order Denying LegalForce RAPC's Motion for Leave to File SAC v. USPTO)(Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 5/2/2018)
May 1, 2018 113 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Seeking Clarification in the Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint re 111 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, filed by LegalForce, Inc.. Responses due by 5/7/2018. (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
May 1, 2018 112 Featured Case ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT LEGALZOOM'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 1, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
April 30, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Second Amended Complaint due by 5/18/2018. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/20/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/27/2018 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 7, 19th Floor. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
April 30, 2018 111 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file the proposed Second Amended Complaint submitted on March 21, 2018, is denied. Legal Force, which previously was afforded leave to amend, shall file any Second Amended Complaint no later than May 18, 2018. The Case Management Conference is continued from June 1, 2018, to July 27, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement shall be filed no later than July 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 30, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
April 30, 2018 110 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE'S MOTION TO DISMISS; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 30, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
April 27, 2018 109 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For Leave To File Opposition re 108 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, LegalForce, Inc.. Responses due by 5/1/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Opposition, # 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Raj Abyanker, # 4 Exhibit D - Email communication with opposing counsel)(Ma, Wensheng) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
April 25, 2018 108 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by LegalZoom.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Motion and Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration Michelle Doolin, # 3 Exhibit A-G, # 4 Proposed Order Granting Motion, # 5 Proposed Order Granting Leave to File)(Doolin, Michelle) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
April 23, 2018 107 Featured Case ORDER VACATING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 23, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
April 17, 2018 106 Statement of Non-Opposition re 96 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant United States Patent and Trademark Office's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed byLegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, LegalForce, Inc.. (Related document(s) 96 ) (Ma, Wensheng) (Filed on 4/17/2018)
April 11, 2018 105 REPLY (re 84 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct 10 Amended Complaint, Second Amended Complaint ) against LegalZoom filed byLegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, LegalForce, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
April 11, 2018 104 REPLY (re 84 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct 10 Amended Complaint, Second Amended Complaint ) against the USPTO filed byLegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, LegalForce, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A - C)(Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
April 10, 2018 103 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING LEGALZOOM'S MOTION TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF LEGALFORCE LEAVE TO AMEND. LegalForce's claims against LegalZoom are dismissed, with leave to amend to be provided by the Court after resolution of LegalForce's motion for leave to amend and the USPTO's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 10, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
April 10, 2018 102 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; STAYING LEGALFORCE RAPC WORLDWIDE'S CLAIMS AGAINST LEGALZOOM.COM, INC. To the extent the motion to compel seeks an order staying LegalForce RAPC's claims against LegalZoom, the motion is granted, and LegalForce RAPC's claims against LegalZoom are stayed pending arbitration. In all other respects, the motion is denied. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 10, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
April 9, 2018 101 Featured Case RELATED CASE ORDER. LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C. v. LegalZoom.com, Inc., Case No. 17-7194, is related to Case Nos. 17-7303, 17-7318, 17-7331, 17-7354, 18-43, 18-127, and 18-142. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 9, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
April 6, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 89 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related . Motion Hearing set for 5/11/2018 09:00 AM before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
April 6, 2018 100 Renotice motion hearing re 89 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed byTrademarks Information International LLC. (Related document(s) 89 ) (Miller, Scott) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
April 4, 2018 99 Proposed Order re 84 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct 10 Amended Complaint, Second Amended Complaint by United States Patent & Trademark Office. (Lo, Michelle) (Filed on 4/4/2018) Modified on 4/5/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2018 98 Proposed Order re 84 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct 10 Amended Complaint, Second Amended Complaint by LegalZoom.com, Inc. (Doolin, Michelle) (Filed on 4/4/2018) Modified on 4/5/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2018 97 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 84 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct 10 Amended Complaint, Second Amended Complaint ) Defendant United States Patent and Trademark Office's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed byUnited States Patent & Trademark Office. (Lo, Michelle) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 4, 2018 96 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant United States Patent and Trademark Office's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by United States Patent & Trademark Office. Motion Hearing set for 5/11/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 4/18/2018. Replies due by 4/25/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lo, Michelle) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 4, 2018 95 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Filed By LegalZoom.com, Inc. (Doolin, Michelle) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 4, 2018 94 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 84 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct 10 Amended Complaint, Second Amended Complaint ) filed byLegalZoom.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Michelle Doolin, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Doolin, Michelle) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 2, 2018 93 Featured Case ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 2, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
March 30, 2018 92 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 89 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related ) RESPONSE filed byTrademark Engine, LLC, Travis Crabtree. (Kappes, Daniel) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 30, 2018 91 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 89 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related ) filed byLegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, LegalForce, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Comparison Chart of Cases, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ma, Wensheng) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 30, 2018 90 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 89 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related ) filed byLegalZoom.com, Inc.. (Doolin, Michelle) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 26, 2018 89 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Trademarks Information International LLC. Responses due by 3/30/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Scott Alan Miller, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Miller, Scott) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
March 23, 2018 88 Proposed Order re 60 Motion to Compel Arbitration by LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, LegalForce, Inc. (Ma, Wensheng) (Filed on 3/23/2018) Modified on 3/26/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2018 87 Proposed Order re 61 Motion to Dismiss FAC by LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, LegalForce, Inc. (Ma, Wensheng) (Filed on 3/23/2018) Modified on 3/26/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2018 86 SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 3/23/2018. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 22, 2018 85 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal By Only Plaintiff Raj V. Abhyanker In His Personal Capacity by Raj V. Abhyanker (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
March 21, 2018 84 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct 10 Amended Complaint, Second Amended Complaint filed by LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, LegalForce, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 4/4/2018. Replies due by 4/11/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Second Amended Complaint)(Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 14, 2018 83 Featured Case ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 14, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2018)
March 14, 2018 82 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 14, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2018)
March 13, 2018 81 REPLY (re 61 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byLegalZoom.com, Inc.. (Doolin, Michelle) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
March 13, 2018 80 REPLY (re 60 MOTION to Compel Arbitration; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byLegalZoom.com, Inc.. (Doolin, Michelle) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
March 7, 2018 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. The Correct Event is found under the "Motion and Related Filings/Other Supporting Documents" category. A caption page should also be included in future filings. [err101] Re: 76 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by LegalForce, Inc., LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, Raj V. Abhyanker, 74 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed by LegalForce, Inc., LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, Raj V. Abhyanker. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
March 7, 2018 79 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Wednesday, May 16, 2018, at 10:00 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
March 6, 2018 78 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) By Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs' Counsel (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
March 6, 2018 77 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options By Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs' Counsel (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
March 6, 2018 76 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 61 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) Labeled Exhibits A, B, and C filed byRaj V. Abhyanker, LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, LegalForce, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C)(Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
March 6, 2018 75 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 60 MOTION to Compel Arbitration; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byRaj V. Abhyanker, LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, LegalForce, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ryan Bethell, # 2 Declaration of Raj V. Abhyanker)(Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
March 6, 2018 74 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 61 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) Exhibits A, B, and C filed byRaj V. Abhyanker, LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, LegalForce, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
March 6, 2018 73 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 61 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byRaj V. Abhyanker, LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, LegalForce, Inc.. (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
March 6, 2018 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Raj Vasant Abhyanker of Wensheng Ma (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
March 5, 2018 71 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal only the Second Claim For Relief for Unreasonable Restraint of Trade In Violation of Section 1 of The Sherman Act, 15 U.S.C. §1 by Raj V. Abhyanker, LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, LegalForce, Inc. (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 3/5/2018)
March 5, 2018 70 Featured Case ORDER DENYING AS MOOT STATE BAR MTD. The State Bar's motion to dismiss is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 5, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2018)
March 1, 2018 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Lo (Lo, Michelle) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
March 1, 2018 68 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal only The State Bar of California by Raj V. Abhyanker, LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, LegalForce, Inc. (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
February 28, 2018 67 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 54 First MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint with Declaration & Proposed Order ) filed byLegalZoom.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michelle C. Doolin In Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint)(Doolin, Michelle) (Filed on 2/28/2018)
February 28, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearing re 66 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11,,,,, Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/25/2018. Initial Case Management Conference reset to 6/1/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018)
February 27, 2018 66 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO RESCHEDULE HEARINGS ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. In light of the pendency of defendants' respective motions to dismiss, the Court continues the Initial Case Management Conference from March 23, 2018, to June 1, 2018, at 10:30 a.m.; a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than May 25, 2018. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 27, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
February 26, 2018 65 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 63 First ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Reschedule Hearing on Motion to Dismiss until April 27, 2018 re 61 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities ) filed byLegalZoom.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Doolin, Michelle) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
February 26, 2018 64 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 62 First ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION RESCHEDULE HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFENDANT THE STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA FROM MARCH 23, 2018 UNTIL APRIL 27, 2018 re 57 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant State Bar of California's Notice of Motion and Motion ) Defendant State Bar of California's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Reschedule Hearing on Motion to Dismiss by Defendant the State Bar of California filed byState Bar of California. (Shapp, Marc) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
February 22, 2018 63 First ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Reschedule Hearing on Motion to Dismiss until April 27, 2018 re 61 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Raj V. Abhyanker, LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, LegalForce, Inc.. Responses due by 2/26/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Raj V. Abhyanker, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order)(Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 2/22/2018)
February 21, 2018 62 First ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION RESCHEDULE HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFENDANT THE STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA FROM MARCH 23, 2018 UNTIL APRIL 27, 2018 re 57 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant State Bar of California's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Raj V. Abhyanker, LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, LegalForce, Inc.. Responses due by 2/26/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Raj V. Abhyanker, # 2 Exhibit A and B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 2/21/2018)
February 20, 2018 61 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 3/6/2018. Replies due by 3/13/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Doolin, Michelle) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
February 20, 2018 60 MOTION to Compel Arbitration; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by LegalZoom.com, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 3/6/2018. Replies due by 3/13/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edward Hartman, # 2 Proposed Order)(Doolin, Michelle) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
February 16, 2018 59 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Only State Bar of Arizona by Raj V. Abhyanker, LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, LegalForce, Inc. (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
February 16, 2018 58 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Only Defendant State Bar of Texas by Raj V. Abhyanker, LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, LegalForce, Inc. (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
February 16, 2018 57 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant State Bar of California's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by State Bar of California. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 3/2/2018. Replies due by 3/9/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant State Bar of California's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Chang, James) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
February 16, 2018 56 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 54 First MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint with Declaration & Proposed Order ) Defendant State Bar of California's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend filed byState Bar of California. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of James J. Chang in Support of Defendant State Bar of California's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend)(Chang, James) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
February 15, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 54 First MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint with Declaration & Proposed Order. Opposition due by 2/28/2018. Reply due by 3/7/2018. Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2018)
February 15, 2018 Electronic filing error. For future filings, please include the case initials MMC and the correct office division. Re: 55 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by LegalForce, Inc., LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, Raj V. Abhyanker, 54 First MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint with Declaration & Proposed Order filed by LegalForce, Inc., LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, Raj V. Abhyanker. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
February 14, 2018 55 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Only Defendants Brian P. Y. Liu; Edward Richard Hartman; Brian S. Lee; and LegalZoom United Kingdom (LegalZoom Legal Services Ltd.) by Raj V. Abhyanker, LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, LegalForce, Inc. (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 2/14/2018)
February 14, 2018 54 First MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint with Declaration & Proposed Order filed by Raj V. Abhyanker, LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, LegalForce, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Raj V. Abhyanker, # 2 Proposed Order)(Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 2/14/2018)
February 6, 2018 53 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/23/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/16/2018.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 2/6/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order of Judge Maxine M. Chesney, # 2 Standing Order of All Judges)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
February 6, 2018 52 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF COMPLAINT AND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 6, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
January 26, 2018 51 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of James D. Blume is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 26, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 26, 2018 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael John Agoglia (Agoglia, Michael) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 26, 2018 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Nell Gibson Moley (Moley, Nell) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 26, 2018 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Ellen Quiros (Quiros, Courtney) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 26, 2018 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa R Bugni (Bugni, Lisa) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 26, 2018 46 NOTICE of Appearance by James Jou Chang (Chang, James) (Filed on 1/26/2018)
January 25, 2018 45 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Lisa R. Bugni is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 25, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 25, 2018 44 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. The application of Courtney E. Quiros is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 25, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 24, 2018 43 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Lisa R. Bugni ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 267BS280.) Filing fee previously paid on 01/24/18 filed by State Bar of Texas. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Bugni, Lisa) (Filed on 1/24/2018)
January 24, 2018 42 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Courtney E. Quiros ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12051408.) filed by State Bar of Texas. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Quiros, Courtney) (Filed on 1/24/2018)
January 24, 2018 41 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 1/24/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2018)
January 23, 2018 40 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 23, 2018 39 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Edward Richard Hartman, Brian S. Lee, LegalZoom Legal Services Ltd., LegalZoom.com, Inc., Brian P. Y. Liu.. (Doolin, Michelle) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 22, 2018 38 STIPULATION re 10 Amended Complaint, to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1(a) filed by State Bar of Arizona. (Sklar, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 22, 2018 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Louis Sklar (Sklar, Jeffrey) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 19, 2018 36 Certificate of Interested Entities by State Bar of Texas (Kravitz, Ronald) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 18, 2018 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LegalForce, Inc., Raj V. Abhyanker, LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C. LegalZoom.com, Inc.; LegalZoom Legal Services, Ltd.; Brian Liu, Edward Richard Hartman and Brian S. Lee (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 18, 2018 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LegalForce, Inc., Raj V. Abhyanker, LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C. United States Patent & Trademark Office (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Process Server)(Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 18, 2018 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LegalForce, Inc., Raj V. Abhyanker, LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C. State Bar of California (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 18, 2018 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LegalForce, Inc., Raj V. Abhyanker, LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C. State Bar of Texas (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 18, 2018 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LegalForce, Inc., Raj V. Abhyanker, LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C. State Bar of Arizona (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 1/18/2018)
January 12, 2018 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety. Re: 29 Affidavit of Service, filed by LegalForce, Inc., LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, Raj V. Abhyanker **Re-File as Summons Returned Executed as to USA** (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety. Re: 27 Certificate of Service filed by LegalForce, Inc., LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, Raj V. Abhyanker, 28 Certificate of Service filed by LegalForce, Inc., LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, Raj V. Abhyanker, 26 Certificate of Service filed by LegalForce, Inc., LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, Raj V. Abhyanker, 30 Certificate of Service, filed by LegalForce, Inc., LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, Raj V. Abhyanker **Re-File ECF 26, 27, 28 and 30 as Summons Returned Executed** (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 12, 2018 30 *filing error* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Raj V. Abhyanker, LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, LegalForce, Inc. Proof of Service on LegalZoom entities via email (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 1/12/2018) Modified on 1/16/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2018 29 * filing Error* AFFIDAVIT of Service for Initial Filing Documents Affidavit of Service served on USPTO, Denyce Bass on December 29, 2017, filed by Raj V. Abhyanker, LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, LegalForce, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 1/12/2018) Modified on 1/16/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2018 28 *filing error* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Raj V. Abhyanker, LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, LegalForce, Inc. State Bar of California (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 1/12/2018) Modified on 1/16/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2018 27 *filing error* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Raj V. Abhyanker, LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, LegalForce, Inc. State Bar of Texas (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 1/12/2018) Modified on 1/16/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2018 26 *filing error* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Raj V. Abhyanker, LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, LegalForce, Inc. on State Bar of Arizona (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 1/12/2018) Modified on 1/16/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2018 25 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Raj Vasant Abhyanker Withdrawal of Batkhand Zoljargal (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 11, 2018 24 STIPULATION To Extend Time to Respond to Amended Complaint Pursuant to L.R. 6-1(A) filed by State Bar of Texas. (Kravitz, Ronald) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
January 11, 2018 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by Raj V. Abhyanker, LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, LegalForce, Inc. (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
January 11, 2018 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald Scott Kravitz for Defendant The State Bar of Texas (Kravitz, Ronald) (Filed on 1/11/2018)
January 10, 2018 21 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Amended Complaint filed by Edward Richard Hartman, Brian S. Lee, LegalZoom Legal Services Ltd., LegalZoom.com, Inc., Brian P. Y. Liu. (Doolin, Michelle) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 10, 2018 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Brian S. Lee (Doolin, Michelle) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 10, 2018 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Edward Richard Hartman (Doolin, Michelle) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 10, 2018 18 Certificate of Interested Entities by Brian P. Y. Liu (Doolin, Michelle) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 10, 2018 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by LegalZoom Legal Services Ltd., LegalZoom.com, Inc. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Doolin, Michelle) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 10, 2018 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal R Gibeault (Gibeault, Neal) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 10, 2018 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Beatriz Mejia (Mejia, Beatriz) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 10, 2018 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Francis Cieslak (Cieslak, Jon) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 10, 2018 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Darcie Allison Tilly (Tilly, Darcie) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 10, 2018 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Carrie Doolin (Doolin, Michelle) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 10, 2018 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of James D. Blume ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12014529.) filed by State Bar of Texas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Blume, James) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 2, 2018 10 First Amended Complaint against All Defendants. Filed byLegalForce, Inc., Raj V. Abhyanker, LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Exhibits FAC)(Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 1/2/2018) Modified on 1/3/2018 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
January 2, 2018 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Raj V. Abhyanker, LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C, LegalForce, Inc... (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 1/2/2018)
December 26, 2017 8 STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1(a) filed by State Bar of California. (Shapp, Marc) (Filed on 12/26/2017)
December 26, 2017 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Aaron Shapp (Shapp, Marc) (Filed on 12/26/2017)
December 26, 2017 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert George Retana (Retana, Robert) (Filed on 12/26/2017)
December 19, 2017 5 Summons Issued as to Edward Richard Hartman, Brian S. Lee, LegalZoom Legal Services Ltd., LegalZoom.com, Inc., Brian P. Y. Liu, State Bar of Arizona, State Bar of California, State Bar of Texas, United States Patent & Trademark Office. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
December 19, 2017 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/14/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
December 19, 2017 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/2/2018. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
December 19, 2017 2 Proposed Summons. (Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
December 19, 2017 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11963026.). Filed byLegalForce, Inc., Raj Abhyanker, LegalForce RAPC Worldwide P.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-Z, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Abhyanker, Raj) (Filed on 12/19/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C. et al v. LegalZoom.Com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LegalZoom.com, Inc.
Represented By: Jon Francis Cieslak
Represented By: Michelle Carrie Doolin
Represented By: Neal R Gibeault
Represented By: Beatriz Mejia
Represented By: Darcie Allison Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LegalZoom Legal Services Ltd.
Represented By: Jon Francis Cieslak
Represented By: Michelle Carrie Doolin
Represented By: Neal R Gibeault
Represented By: Beatriz Mejia
Represented By: Darcie Allison Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian P. Y. Liu
Represented By: Jon Francis Cieslak
Represented By: Michelle Carrie Doolin
Represented By: Neal R Gibeault
Represented By: Beatriz Mejia
Represented By: Darcie Allison Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Richard Hartman
Represented By: Jon Francis Cieslak
Represented By: Michelle Carrie Doolin
Represented By: Neal R Gibeault
Represented By: Beatriz Mejia
Represented By: Darcie Allison Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian S. Lee
Represented By: Jon Francis Cieslak
Represented By: Michelle Carrie Doolin
Represented By: Neal R Gibeault
Represented By: Beatriz Mejia
Represented By: Darcie Allison Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Patent & Trademark Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Bar of California
Represented By: Robert George Retana
Represented By: Marc Aaron Shapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Bar of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Bar of Texas
Represented By: James Donald Blume
Represented By: Ronald Scott Kravitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C
Represented By: Raj Vasant Abhyanker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LegalForce, Inc.
Represented By: Raj Vasant Abhyanker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raj V. Abhyanker
Represented By: Raj Vasant Abhyanker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?