Bradley et al v. T-Mobile US, Inc. et al Featured Case

A case in which older workers accuse Facebook, Ikea, and hundreds of other companies of discriminating against job seekers in their 50s and 60s through targeted job ads posted on Facebook.

Plaintiff: Linda Bradley, Maurice Anscombe, Lura Callahan and Communications Workers Of America
Defendant: T-Mobile US, Inc., Amazon.com Inc., Cox Communications, Inc. and Cox Media Group, LLC
Case Number: 5:2017cv07232
Filed: December 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jahan C. Sagafi (Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
May 29, 2018 Filing 56 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byCommunications Workers Of America, Linda Bradley, Lura Callahan, Maurice Anscombe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Romer-Friedman, Peter) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
April 20, 2018 Filing 55 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/29/18 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by T-Mobile US, Inc., for Court Reporter Joan Columbini. (Hess, Ryan) (Filed on 4/20/2018)
April 11, 2018 Filing 54 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 4/11/2018)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING 51 STIPULATION SELECTING PRIVATE ADR. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/9/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
April 9, 2018 Filing 52 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Hess, Ryan) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
April 9, 2018 Filing 51 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by T-Mobile US, Inc. filed by T-Mobile US, Inc.. (Hess, Ryan) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
April 4, 2018 Filing 50 Transcript of Proceedings held on March 29, 2018, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 49 Transcript Order, 47 Transcript Order, 48 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 4/25/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/7/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/3/2018. (Related documents(s) 49 , 47 , 48 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 3, 2018 Filing 49 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on March 29, 2018 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Maurice Anscombe, Linda Bradley, Lura Callahan, Communications Workers Of America, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Romer-Friedman, Peter) (Filed on 4/3/2018) (TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 4/3/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2018 Filing 48 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/29/2018 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Amazon.com Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 4/3/2018) (TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 4/3/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2018 Filing 47 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/29/2018 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 45 Case Management Conference - Initial, Last Day to Hear Class Certification set for 10/10/2019 09:00 AM. Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motions set for 4/15/2021 09:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2021 01:30 PM. Jury Selection set for 9/24/2021, 9/27/2021 09:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 9/27/2021, 9/28/2021, 9/29/2021, 9/30/2021, 10/1/2021, 10/4/2021, 10/5/2021, 10/6/2021, 10/7/2021, 10/8/2021, 10/11/2021, 10/12/2021, 10/13/2021, 10/14/2021, 10/15/2021 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman.Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/29/2018. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
March 29, 2018 Filing 45 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/29/2018.FTR Time: 11:14 - 11:51. Plaintiff Attorney: Peter Romer-Friedman, Patrick Lopez. Defendant Attorney: Joan Fife, Stephen Rammage, Jason Schwartz. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/29/2018)
March 29, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Emilie Consuelo Woodhead (Woodhead, Emilie) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
March 29, 2018 Filing 43 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cox Media Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cox Enterprises, Inc. for Cox Media Group, LLC. (Tucker Fife, Joan) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
March 29, 2018 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cox Media Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cox Enterprises, Inc. for Cox Media Group, LLC. (Tucker Fife, Joan) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
March 29, 2018 Filing 41 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cox Communications, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cox Enterprises, Inc. for Cox Communications, Inc.. (Tucker Fife, Joan) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
March 29, 2018 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cox Communications, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cox Enterprises, Inc. for Cox Communications, Inc.. (Tucker Fife, Joan) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING 32 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (Re: Cyrus E. Ansari). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/23/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING 30 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (Re: Stephen M. Rummage). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/23/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING 29 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (Re: Jason C. Schwartz). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/23/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Seth Lipshutz (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Coby Hess (Hess, Ryan) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 22, 2018 Filing 34 Certificate of Interested Entities by T-Mobile US, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate T-Mobile Global Zwischenholding GmbH, Other Affiliate T-Mobile Global Holding GmbH, Other Affiliate Deutsche Telekom Holding B.V., Other Affiliate Deutsche Telekom AG for T-Mobile US, Inc.. (Bosley, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
March 22, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Bosley (Bosley, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
March 22, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Cyrus E. Ansari) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12211795.) filed by T-Mobile US, Inc.. (Ansari, Cyrus) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
March 22, 2018 Filing 31 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Maurice Anscombe, Linda Bradley, Lura Callahan, Communications Workers Of America. (Romer-Friedman, Peter) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
March 22, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12211081.) filed by T-Mobile US, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rummage, Stephen) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
March 22, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Jason C. Schwartz ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12209080.) filed by Amazon.com Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A [Certificate of Good Standing])(Schwartz, Jason) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
March 21, 2018 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazon.com Inc. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 21, 2018 Filing 27 Certificate of Interested Entities by Amazon.com Inc. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 21, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel S. Brass (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 3/21/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Communications Workers Of America, Linda Bradley, Lura Callahan, Maurice Anscombe. Service waived by T-Mobile US, Inc. waiver sent on 3/13/2018, answer due 5/14/2018. (Fisher, Robert) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Communications Workers Of America, Linda Bradley, Lura Callahan, Maurice Anscombe. Service waived by Cox Media Group, LLC waiver sent on 3/14/2018, answer due 5/14/2018. (Fisher, Robert) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Communications Workers Of America, Linda Bradley, Lura Callahan, Maurice Anscombe. Service waived by Cox Communications, Inc. waiver sent on 3/14/2018, answer due 5/14/2018. (Fisher, Robert) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Communications Workers Of America, Linda Bradley, Lura Callahan, Maurice Anscombe. Service waived by Amazon.com Inc. waiver sent on 3/13/2018, answer due 5/14/2018. (Fisher, Robert) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING 20 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE RE: ADAM KLEIN. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/14/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2018)
March 14, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Adam Klein ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12187338.) filed by Maurice Anscombe, Linda Bradley, Lura Callahan, Communications Workers Of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Klein, Adam) (Filed on 3/14/2018)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING 18 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE RE: PATRICK DAVID LOPEZ. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/9/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2018)
March 9, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Patrick David Lopez ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12174554.) filed by Maurice Anscombe, Linda Bradley, Lura Callahan, Communications Workers Of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lopez, Patrick) (Filed on 3/9/2018)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING 14 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE RE: PETER ROMER-FRIEDMAN. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/8/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING 13 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE RE: JARED GOLDMAN. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/8/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
March 8, 2018 Filing 15 ADR Remark: The ADR Unit is in receipt of the Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference (Dkt. # 12 ) but cannot set a phone conference until a defendant has appeared. Plaintiff is directed to contact the ADR Unit to schedule a phone conference, if necessary, when there is an appearance by defendant. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
March 8, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Peter Romer-Friedman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12171659.) filed by Maurice Anscombe, Linda Bradley, Lura Callahan, Communications Workers Of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Romer-Friedman, Peter) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
March 8, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jared W.Goldman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12171499.) filed by Maurice Anscombe, Linda Bradley, Lura Callahan, Communications Workers Of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Goldman, Jared) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
March 8, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Fisher, Robert) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
March 8, 2018 Filing 11 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Fisher, Robert) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE: ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES ARE RELATED. The Court finds cases 5:16-cv-06440-EJD and 5:17-cv-07232-BLF are NOT related. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/8/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2018)
December 27, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jahan C. Sagafi of Robert N. Fisher (Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 12/27/2017)
December 26, 2017 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Maurice Anscombe, Linda Bradley, Lura Callahan, Communications Workers Of America (Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 12/26/2017)
December 21, 2017 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 3/22/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 21, 2017 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to T-Mobile US, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 21, 2017 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Amazon.com Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 21, 2017 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cox Communications, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 21, 2017 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cox Media Group, LLC. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 21, 2017 Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:[1-3, 1-4, 1-5, 1-6] attachments to Complaint, filed by Linda Bradley, Lura Callahan, Maurice Anscombe, Communications Workers Of America **Proposed Summons should not be filed as attachments to complaint** (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
December 20, 2017 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman and Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 20, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11967059.). Filed byCommunications Workers Of America, Linda Bradley, Lura Callahan, Maurice Anscombe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons to T-Mobile US, Inc., # 4 Summons to Amazon.com, Inc., # 5 Summons to Cox Communications, Inc., # 6 Summons to Cox Media Group, LLC)(Sagafi, Jahan) (Filed on 12/20/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley et al v. T-Mobile US, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Bradley
Represented By: Robert Neil Fisher
Represented By: Jahan C. Sagafi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Anscombe
Represented By: Robert Neil Fisher
Represented By: Jahan C. Sagafi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lura Callahan
Represented By: Robert Neil Fisher
Represented By: Jahan C. Sagafi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Communications Workers Of America
Represented By: Robert Neil Fisher
Represented By: Jahan C. Sagafi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Media Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?