LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C. et al v. Trademark Engine LLC et al

Plaintiff: LegalForce RAPC Worldwide P.C., LegalForce, Inc. and Raj V. Abhyanker
Defendant: Trademark Engine LLC, Travis Crabtree and Gray Reed & McGraw P.C.
Case Number: 5:2017cv07303
Filed: December 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:0045
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION, AS ALLEGED AGAINST DEFENDANT TRAVIS CRABTREE, WITH PREJUDICE; STRIKING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; DENYING AS MOOT MOTION TO STRIKE AND FOR DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 10, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; AFFORDING PLAINTIFF LIMITED LEAVE TO AMEND. The First Claim for Relief is dismissed without leave to amend. The Second Claim for Relief, to the extent based on TME's use of the word "professional," is dismissed without leave to amend, and to the extent alleged against Crabtree based on the privacy-related statements, is dismissed with leave to amend; in all other respects , the Second Claim for Relief is not subject to dismissal. The Third Claim for Relief is dismissed with leave to amend, with the exception of RAPC's claim for injunctive relief based on the alleged unauthorized practice of law by TME, which clai m is not subject to dismissal. RAPC is afforded leave to amend solely to the extent set forth above. Any Third Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than November 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 31, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS INITIAL COMPLAINT; AFFORDING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO AMEND. Defendants' motion to dismiss is granted and the First A mended Complaint is dismissed in its entirety. Plaintiffs are afforded leave to amend for purposes of curing the deficiencies identified. Any such Second Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than August 10, 2018, and plaintiffs may not add therein any new defendants or any new claims, without first obtaining leave of court. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 19, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 26, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2018)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 14, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 9, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS; EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. Plaintiffs are directed to file in the public record, no later than seven days from the date of this order, either: (1) an opposition to defendants' sanctions motion, as well as any evidence in support thereof; or (2) a renewed administrative motion to file under seal. T he deadline for defendants to file a reply to plaintiffs' opposition to the motion for sanctions is extended; defendants' reply shall be filed no later than seven days following the date on which plaintiffs serve defendants with their opposition. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 24, 2018. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LegalForce RAPC Worldwide, P.C. et al v. Trademark Engine LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trademark Engine LLC
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Kappes
Represented By: Dayna E Underhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Crabtree
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Kappes
Represented By: Dayna E Underhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gray Reed & McGraw P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LegalForce RAPC Worldwide P.C.
Represented By: Raj Vasant Abhyanker
Represented By: Batkhand Zoljargal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LegalForce, Inc.
Represented By: Raj Vasant Abhyanker
Represented By: Batkhand Zoljargal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raj V. Abhyanker
Represented By: Raj Vasant Abhyanker
Represented By: Batkhand Zoljargal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?