Kannan v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Raja Kannan
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 5:2017cv07305
Filed: December 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Order re Discovery Disputes. Discovery Hearing re 184 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiff's Failure to Produce Documents Related to His App Development and His Family's Time in India set for 11/20/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 11/12/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 179 Discovery Letter Brief re Compensation Information. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Interim Order re 166 Discovery Letter Brief re AEO Designations. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 10/31/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 152 Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiff's Privilege Log. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Order re 153 Discovery Letter Brief re Deposition of M Raja. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 10/28/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 151 Discovery Letter Brief re Apple's Request to Compel Plaintiff's Document Production. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 141 Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiff's Objections to Defendant's Subpoenas to Prospective Employers. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 140 Discovery Letter Brief re Protective Order and expert disclosure. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Interim Order re Joint Discovery Dispute Letters. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 10/9/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2019)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Order re Further Deposition of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 10/4/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Order re Apple's Document Production and Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 10/2/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2019)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 108 Administrative Motion for Relief from Standing Order; 110 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Apple Inc.'s Request to Compel Plaintiff's Document Production and Privilege Log; 112 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Apple Inc.'s Request for Production, Set Two and the Continued Deposition of Plaintiff; 113 Discovery Letter Brief in Response to Plaintiff's Discovery Dispute re Protective Order for Medica l Records; 114 Discovery Letter Brief in Response to Plaintiff's Discovery Dispute re Compliance with Court Order; 115 Discovery Letter Brief in Response to Plaintiff's Discovery Dispute re 30(b)(6) Deposition. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Order re Discovery Dispute re Plaintiff's Document Requests to Apple. Apple must produce responsive documents consistent with this order no later than 7/18/2019. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 7/11/2019. Motions terminated: 90 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION submitting Discovery Disputes filed by Raja Kannan. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi denying without prejudice 83 Stipulated Protective Order. The parties may either submit a revised proposed protective order that addresses the concerns noted, or they may submit a joint discovery dispute letter that explains why the current proposed provisions should be adopted, notwithstanding the Court's concerns. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi denying without prejudice 84 Discovery Letter Brief. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2019)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING 39 DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/10/2018. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING 13 DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/19/2018. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kannan v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raja Kannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Todd Kenneth Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?