Nikon Corporation v. GlobalFoundries U.S., Inc.

Plaintiff: Nikon Corporation
Defendant: GlobalFoundries U.S., Inc.
Case Number: 5:2017mc80071
Filed: June 6, 2017
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 27 RESPONDENT GLOBALFOUNDRIES' MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/16/2017.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
September 22, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 28 RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO STAY PENDING DISPOSITION OF 27 RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER; SUBMITTING 27 RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER FOR DISPOSITION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT; AND VACATING HEARING SET FOR FEBRUARY 1, 2018. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/22/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
August 17, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 1 APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER DIRECTING GLOBALFOUNDRIES, U.S., INC. TO RESPOND TO REQUESTS FOR DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1782 FOR USE IN FOREIGN PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/17/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2017)
June 13, 2017 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/11/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/13/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nikon Corporation v. GlobalFoundries U.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikon Corporation
Represented By: Jack Williford Londen
Represented By: Sorin Gabriel Zaharia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlobalFoundries U.S., Inc.
Represented By: James M. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?