Cyntec Company, Ltd. v. Chilisin Electronics Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Cyntec Company, Ltd.
Defendant: Chilisin Electronics Corp. and Chilisin America Ltd.
Case Number: 5:2018cv00939
Filed: February 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 318 Amended judgment following jury verdict. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 5/6/2022. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2022)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 308 administrative motion for leave to file sur-reply. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2022)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 303 Discovery Letter Brief. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2021)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER by Judge Hamilton re post-trial schedule and discovery motion. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2021)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER re further proceedings. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 09/01/2021. (pjhlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2021)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 234 Final pretrial order by Judge Hamilton. (pjhlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER by Judge Donna M. Ryu Granting 194 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Gelwicks, Daniel. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2021)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER re proposed jury instruction regarding "by means of" limitation. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 6/17/2021. (pjhlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2021)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 141 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 139 Motion to exclude opinions; granting 138 , 140 , 148 , 150 , 158 , and 160 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. (pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2020)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/20/2019. (pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cyntec Company, Ltd. v. Chilisin Electronics Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyntec Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Albert Shih
Represented By: James Chung-Yul Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chilisin Electronics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chilisin America Ltd.
Represented By: Jing Hong Cherng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?