The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University v. Agilent Technologies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University
Defendant: Agilent Technologies, Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, HP Inc. and Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co.
Case Number: 5:2018cv01199
Filed: February 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 266 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria denying 216 Motion for Summary Judgment. (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2022)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 261 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria re 249 Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and granting in part and denying in part 235 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 09/02/2022. (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2022)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER #3 re: cross motions for summary judgment, Dkt. Nos. 106 , 114 , 120 , 123 . Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 12/2/2021. (vclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2021)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER #2 RE CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/17/2020. (vclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University v. Agilent Technologies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board of Trustees of the Leland Stanford Junior University
Represented By: Christopher Berka
Represented By: Winnie Wingshum Hung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agilent Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HP Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett Packard Enterprise Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?