Ramachandran v. City of Los Altos et al
Plaintiff: Mr. Satish Ramachandran and Satish Ramachandran
Defendant: City of Los Altos, Kirk Ballard, Greg Anderson, David Kornfield, Amanda Pitman, Chris Jordan, Garrett Jones, SGT. Steve Spillman, Officer Eric Bardwell, Zach Dahl, Jean Mordo, Jon Biggs and Officer Jessica Vernon
Case Number: 5:2018cv01223
Filed: February 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Order Conditionally Granting #98 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Fulvio F. Cajina, Esq. All proceedings are STAYED through 9/25/2019. Case Management Statement due by 10/15/2019. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/22/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 8/26/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Interim Order re Plaintiff's Counsel's Motion to Withdraw. Mr. Cajina shall confer with Mr. Ramachandran by 8/20/2019. In camera Status Report due by 8/23/2019. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 8/14/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 102 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/13/2019 10:03:33 AM ]. File Size [ 8736 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:18:12 ]. (courtspeak).
August 13, 2019 Filing 101 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi: Motion Hearing held on 8/13/2019. re #98 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Fulvio F. Cajina, Esq. filed by Satish Ramachandran Hearing held. Plaintiff to submit documents in camera. Court to then issue written order.FTR Time: 10:03-10:21. Plaintiff Attorney: Fulvio Cajina. Also present Satish Ramachandran Defendant Attorney: Christopher Moffitt. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/13/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 100 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO MODIFY CASE SCHEDULE filed by Satish Ramachandran. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cajina, Fulvio) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 99 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING 8/27/2019 HEARING as to #98 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Fulvio F. Cajina, Esq. Please take notice that the 8/27/2019 hearing is hereby ADVANCED to 8/13/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 98 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Fulvio F. Cajina, Esq. filed by Satish Ramachandran. Motion Hearing set for 8/27/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Responses due by 8/5/2019. Replies due by 8/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Fulvio F. Cajina)(Cajina, Fulvio) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi denying without prejudice #96 Stipulation to Modify Case Schedule. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 16, 2019 Filing 96 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO MODIFY CASE SCHEDULE filed by Satish Ramachandran. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cajina, Fulvio) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 95 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Third Amended Complaint) byCity of Los Altos. (Moffitt, Christopher) (Filed on 4/10/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 94 Summons Issued as to Amanda Pitman. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 93 Proposed Summons. (Cajina, Fulvio) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 92 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Satish Ramachandran. (Cajina, Fulvio) (Filed on 3/18/2019) Modified text on 3/19/2019 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Order re #90 Stipulation for Extension to File Responsive Pleading. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 3/18/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 90 STIPULATION CORRECTION OF DOCKET #89 filed by Greg Anderson, Kirk Ballard, Eric Bardwell, City of Los Altos, Zach Dahl, Garrett Jones, David Kornfield, Jean Mordo, Steve Spillman, Jessica Vernon. (Ditfurth, Scott) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 89 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING filed by Greg Anderson, Kirk Ballard, City of Los Altos, David Kornfield. (Ditfurth, Scott) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 SCHEDULING ORDER. Close of Fact Discovery due by 8/15/2019. Close of Expert Discovery due by 10/17/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. Jury Trial set for 2/26/2020, 2/27/2020, 2/28/2020, 3/2/2020, 3/3/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 87 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE PROPOSED SCHEDULING filed by City of Los Altos. (Moffitt, Christopher) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 86 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants. Filed bySatish Ramachandran. (Cajina, Fulvio) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 22, 2019 Filing 85 Witness List by City of Los Altos /Expert Disclosure. (Moffitt, Christopher) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #67 Motion to Continue Case Schedule. Parties to meet and confer re continuation of deadlines set in Court's original case management order. Stipulated proposed schedule or parties' respective proposals due by 3/6/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re #64 Discovery Letter Brief. Discovery is not stayed. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #59 Motion to Strike Amended Complaint; granting with leave to amend #60 Motion to Dismiss; granting #61 Request for Judicial Notice; and denying without prejudice #62 Special Motion to Strike (Anti-SLAPP). Plaintiff's amended complaint due by 2/27/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
January 24, 2019 Filing 81 Certification of ADR Session by Mediator Martin H. Dodd: I hereby certify that the parties in this matter held a Mediation session on 1/16/2019. The case did not settle. Further facilitated discussions are expected following ruling on Motion to Dismiss. Mediation process is ongoing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 24, 2019 Set/Reset Hearing Mediation Hearing was held on 1/16/2019. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 80 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/22/2019 9:59:51 AM ]. File Size [ 35968 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:14:56 ]. (courtspeak).
January 22, 2019 Filing 79 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi: Motion Hearing held on 1/22/2019. re #67 MOTION to Vacate, #62 MOTION for Hearing re #34 Amended Complaint Special Motion to Strike [Anti-Slapp], #75 Supplemental Discovery Letter Brief filed by City of Los Altos, #60 MOTION to Dismiss, #59 MOTION to Strike #34 Amended Complaint Counsel present arguments. Matters taken under submission. Court to issue written orders.FTR Time: 10:09-11:14. Plaintiff Attorney: Fulvio Cajina. Defendant Attorney: Scott Ditfurth. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/22/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 78 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by City of Los Altos.. (Ditfurth, Scott) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 77 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/22/2019. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 15, 2019 Filing 76 Letter Brief Further Letter Brief re Discovery Stay filed bySatish Ramachandran. (Cajina, Fulvio) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
January 15, 2019 Filing 75 Supplemental Discovery Letter Brief filed by City of Los Altos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Moffitt, Christopher) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
December 21, 2018 Filing 74 REPLY (re #60 MOTION to Dismiss , #59 MOTION to Strike #34 Amended Complaint ) and Evidentiary Objections filed byCity of Los Altos. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Special Motion to Strike Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure 425.16, #2 Defendants' Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Satish Ramachandran, #3 Defendants' Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Paul Boetius)(Ditfurth, Scott) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #72 Stipulation. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 72 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Allow City to Represent All Named Defendants at Mediation filed by Greg Anderson, Kirk Ballard, Eric Bardwell, Jon Biggs, City of Los Altos, Zach Dahl, Garrett Jones, Chris Jordan, David Kornfield, Jean Mordo, Steve Spillman, Jessica Vernon. (Moffitt, Christopher) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 15, 2018 Filing 71 NOTICE by Satish Ramachandran re #59 MOTION to Strike #34 Amended Complaint Notice of Non-Opposition (Cajina, Fulvio) (Filed on 12/15/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 70 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #60 MOTION to Dismiss ) Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed bySatish Ramachandran. (Cajina, Fulvio) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 69 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #59 MOTION to Strike #34 Amended Complaint ) Opposition to Anti-SLAPP Motion filed bySatish Ramachandran. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Paul Boetius, #2 Declaration Declaration of Satish Ramachandran)(Cajina, Fulvio) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Second Interim Order re #64 Discovery Letter Brief. Supplemental discovery dispute letters (1000 words max) due by 1/15/2019. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 12/14/2018. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 67 MOTION to Vacate or Continue Trial Date and Related Dates filed by Greg Anderson, Kirk Ballard, Eric Bardwell, Jon Biggs, City of Los Altos, Zach Dahl, Garrett Jones, Chris Jordan, David Kornfield, Jean Mordo, Steve Spillman, Jessica Vernon. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Responses due by 12/27/2018. Replies due by 1/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Moffitt, Christopher) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 66 RESPONSE to re #64 Letter Brief, Response to Discovery Letter Brief by Satish Ramachandran. (Cajina, Fulvio) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Interim Order re #64 Discovery Letter Brief. Plaintiff's response (1500 words max) due by 12/13/2018 at 12:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 12/12/2018. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 64 Letter Brief Joint Discovery filed byGreg Anderson, Kirk Ballard, Eric Bardwell, Jon Biggs, City of Los Altos, Zach Dahl, Garrett Jones, Chris Jordan, David Kornfield, Jean Mordo, Steve Spillman, Jessica Vernon. (Moffitt, Christopher) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 3, 2018 Filing 63 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing 1/8/2019 Motion Hearing to 1/22/2019. Set/Reset Deadlines as to: #59 MOTION to Strike #34 Amended Complaint; #60 MOTION to Dismiss; #62 MOTION for Hearing re #34 Amended Complaint Special Motion to Strike [Anti-Slapp]. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 62 MOTION for Hearing re #34 Amended Complaint Special Motion to Strike [Anti-Slapp] [Please set on 01/08/19] filed by Greg Anderson, Kirk Ballard, Eric Bardwell, Jon Biggs, City of Los Altos, Zach Dahl, Garrett Jones, Chris Jordan, David Kornfield, Jean Mordo, Steve Spillman, Jessica Vernon. (Moffitt, Christopher) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 61 Request for Judicial Notice re #60 MOTION to Dismiss filed byGreg Anderson, Kirk Ballard, Eric Bardwell, Jon Biggs, City of Los Altos, Zach Dahl, Garrett Jones, Chris Jordan, David Kornfield, Jean Mordo, Steve Spillman, Jessica Vernon. (Related document(s) #60 ) (Moffitt, Christopher) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 60 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Greg Anderson, Kirk Ballard, Eric Bardwell, Jon Biggs, City of Los Altos, Zach Dahl, Garrett Jones, Chris Jordan, David Kornfield, Jean Mordo, Steve Spillman, Jessica Vernon. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Responses due by 12/14/2018. Replies due by 12/21/2018. (Moffitt, Christopher) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 59 MOTION to Strike #34 Amended Complaint filed by Greg Anderson, Kirk Ballard, Eric Bardwell, Jon Biggs, City of Los Altos, Zach Dahl, Garrett Jones, Chris Jordan, David Kornfield, Jean Mordo, Steve Spillman, Jessica Vernon. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Responses due by 12/14/2018. Replies due by 12/21/2018. (Moffitt, Christopher) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 58 STATUS REPORT Submitted By Defendants City of Los Altos, Kirk Ballard, Greg Anderson, and David Kornfield by City of Los Altos. (Ditfurth, Scott) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 57 Summons Issued as to Zach Dahl. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 56 Summons Issued as to Jon Biggs. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 55 Summons Issued as to Chris Jordan. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 54 Summons Issued as to Garrett Jones. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 53 Summons Issued as to Jean Mordo. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 52 Summons Issued as to Steve Spillman. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 51 Summons Issued as to Eric Bardwell. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 50 Summons Issued as to Jessica Vernon. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 49 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Proposed Summons, #2 Summons Proposed Summons, #3 Summons Proposed Summons, #4 Summons Proposed Summons, #5 Summons Proposed Summons, #6 Summons Proposed Summons, #7 Summons Proposed Summons)(Cajina, Fulvio) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #37 Motion to Extend Deadline for Completion of Mediation. Deadline to complete mediation: 1/21/2019. Plaintiff shall promptly contact defendants counsel to arrange for the mediation session as described in the order. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Order Discharging #44 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 11/6/2018. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 46 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 11/6/2018 11:01:30 AM ]. File Size [ 1096 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:17 ]. (courtspeak).
November 6, 2018 Filing 45 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi: Show Cause Hearing held on 11/6/2018.Hearing held. OSC is discharged.FTR Time: 11:01-11:03. Plaintiff Attorney: Fulvio Cajina. Plaintiff also present. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/6/2018)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT IMPOSE SANCTIONS FOR PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO APPEAR. Show Cause Response due by 11/2/2018. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/6/2018 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 10/30/2018. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Plaintiff to serve defendants Zach Dahl, Jon Biggs, Chris Jordan, Garrett Jones, Jean Mordo, Sgt. Steve Spillman, Officer Eric Bardwell, and Officer Jessica Vernon by 11/13/2018. Defendants' Status Report due by 11/14/2018. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 10/30/2018. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 30, 2018 Filing 42 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/30/2018 1:33:26 PM ]. File Size [ 3112 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:06:29 ]. (courtspeak).
October 30, 2018 Filing 41 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi: Status Conference held on 10/30/2018.Hearing held. Court to issue orders.FTR Time: 1:33-1:39. Plaintiff Attorney: No Appearance. Defendant Attorney: Scott Ditfurth, via telephone. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/30/2018)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi granting #39 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at October 30, 2018 Status Conference; [Proposed] Order filed by City of Los Altos. (Ditfurth, Scott) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 10/30/2018 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 10/24/2018. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 16, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION to Continue or Extend Deadline for Mediation Completion filed by City of Los Altos. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott W. Ditfurth in Support of Motion to Extend Deadline to Complete Mediation, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Extend Deadline for Mediation Completion)(Ditfurth, Scott) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
September 5, 2018 Set/Reset Hearing Jury Trial set for 9/13/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 4, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Jury Trial set for 9/10/2019, 9/11/2019, 9/12/2019, 9/13/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
September 4, 2018 Set/Reset Hearing Jury Trial set for 9/10/2019, 9/11/2019, 9/12/2019, 9/13/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018) Modified on 9/4/2018 (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2018 Set/Reset Hearing Mediation Hearing set for 10/30/2018 09:30 AM., at the law offices of Futterman Dupree Dodd Croley Maier LLP, 601 Montgomery St., Suite 333, San Francisco, CA 94111. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
August 3, 2018 Filing 36 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Martin H. Dodd as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
August 2, 2018 Filing 35 STIPULATION for Extension to File Responsive Pleading filed by Greg Anderson, Kirk Ballard, City of Los Altos, David Kornfield. (Moffitt, Christopher) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
July 18, 2018 Filing 34 First Amended Complaint< against All Defendants. Filed by Satish Ramachandran. (Cajina, Fulvio) (Filed on 7/18/2018) Modified on 7/19/2018 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi GRANTING #32 Stipulation to File First Amended Complaint. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 18, 2018 Filing 32 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for leave to file FAC filed by Satish Ramachandran. (Cajina, Fulvio) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
June 27, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Matthew Moffitt (Moffitt, Christopher) (Filed on 6/27/2018)
June 27, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Mediation #30 . Deadline to complete mediation is 11/21/2018. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2018)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline for service of initial disclosures: 7/6/2018. Deadline to complete mediation: 11/21/2018. Fact Discovery cut-off: 2/4/2019. Deadline for Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures: 2/22/2019. Deadline for Rule 26(a)(2) rebuttal disclosures due by 3/15/2019. Expert Discovery cut-off: 6/4/2019. Last day for hearing on dispositive motions/Daubert motions: 5/28/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. Start of Jury Trial (5 days) set for 9/9/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 6/26/2018. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2018)
June 26, 2018 Filing 29 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/26/2018 1:35:08 PM ]. File Size [ 7080 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:14:45 ]. (courtspeak).
June 26, 2018 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/26/2018. Hearing held. Court to issue written scheduling order. FTR Time: 1:35-1:49. Plaintiff Attorney: Fulvio Cajina, via telephone. Defendant Attorney: Scott Ditfurth. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/26/2018)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi GRANTING #26 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2018)
June 19, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Satish Ramachandran. (Cajina, Fulvio) (Filed on 6/19/2018)
June 14, 2018 Filing 25 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Satish Ramachandran. (Cajina, Fulvio) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
June 6, 2018 Reset Hearing re 16 Clerk's Notice,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2018 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2018)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Judge Executive Committee on 6/4/18. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2018)
May 16, 2018 Filing 23 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed by Plaintiff (Cajina, Fulvio) (Filed on 5/16/2018)
May 14, 2018 Filing 22 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Greg Anderson, Kirk Ballard, City of Los Altos, David Kornfield.. (Ditfurth, Scott) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
May 14, 2018 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/29/2018. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
May 9, 2018 Filing 20 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed by Defendant David Kornfield (Ditfurth, Scott) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 9, 2018 Filing 19 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed by Defendant Greg Anderson (Ditfurth, Scott) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 9, 2018 Filing 18 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed by Defendant Kirk Ballard (Ditfurth, Scott) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 9, 2018 Filing 17 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed by Defendant City of Los Altos (Ditfurth, Scott) (Filed on 5/9/2018)
May 4, 2018 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE. The Initial Case Management Conference is hereby continued to 6/26/2018 at 1:30 PM. All related deadlines are continued accordingly. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
April 26, 2018 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by David Kornfield (Baca, Alexandra) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
April 26, 2018 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kirk Ballard (Ditfurth, Scott) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
April 26, 2018 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Greg Anderson (Ditfurth, Scott) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
April 26, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byGreg Anderson, Kirk Ballard, City of Los Altos, David Kornfield. (Ditfurth, Scott) (Filed on 4/26/2018)
April 2, 2018 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Satish Ramachandran.. (Cajina, Fulvio) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
April 2, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Greg Anderson, Kirk Ballard, City of Los Altos, David Kornfield. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
March 30, 2018 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Proposed Summons Ballard, #2 Summons Proposed Summons Kornfield, #3 Summons Proposed Summons Anderson)(Cajina, Fulvio) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 19, 2018 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 4/2/2018. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2018)
March 12, 2018 Filing 7 ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT*** Summons Returned Unexecuted by Satish Ramachandran as to David Kornfield. (Cajina, Fulvio) (Filed on 3/12/2018) Modified text on 3/13/2018 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2018 Filing 6 ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT*** Summons Returned Unexecuted by Satish Ramachandran as to Greg Anderson. (Cajina, Fulvio) (Filed on 3/12/2018) Modified text on 3/13/2018 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2018 Filing 5 ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT*** Summons Returned Unexecuted by Satish Ramachandran as to Kirk Ballard. (Cajina, Fulvio) (Filed on 3/12/2018) Modified text on 3/13/2018 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2018 Filing 4 ***INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED WHEN POSTING DOCUMENT*** Summons Returned Unexecuted by Satish Ramachandran as to City of Los Altos. (Cajina, Fulvio) (Filed on 3/12/2018) Modified text on 3/13/2018 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2018 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/22/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2018 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
February 27, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/13/2018. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
February 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12137724.). Filed bySatish Ramachandran. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cajina, Fulvio) (Filed on 2/25/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramachandran v. City of Los Altos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Los Altos
Represented By: Christopher Matthew Moffitt
Represented By: Scott William Ditfurth
Represented By: Alexandra Andreen Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Ballard
Represented By: Christopher Matthew Moffitt
Represented By: Scott William Ditfurth
Represented By: Alexandra Andreen Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Anderson
Represented By: Christopher Matthew Moffitt
Represented By: Scott William Ditfurth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kornfield
Represented By: Christopher Matthew Moffitt
Represented By: Scott William Ditfurth
Represented By: Alexandra Andreen Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Pitman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Jordan
Represented By: Christopher Matthew Moffitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrett Jones
Represented By: Christopher Matthew Moffitt
Represented By: Scott William Ditfurth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT. Steve Spillman
Represented By: Christopher Matthew Moffitt
Represented By: Scott William Ditfurth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Eric Bardwell
Represented By: Christopher Matthew Moffitt
Represented By: Scott William Ditfurth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zach Dahl
Represented By: Christopher Matthew Moffitt
Represented By: Scott William Ditfurth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Mordo
Represented By: Christopher Matthew Moffitt
Represented By: Scott William Ditfurth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Biggs
Represented By: Christopher Matthew Moffitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jessica Vernon
Represented By: Christopher Matthew Moffitt
Represented By: Scott William Ditfurth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Satish Ramachandran
Represented By: Fulvio Francisco Cajina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Satish Ramachandran
Represented By: Fulvio Francisco Cajina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?