Hallisey v. Zuckerberg et al Featured Case

In the wake of the Cambridge Analytica data misuse and political ad targeting scandal, several investors filed separate lawsuits against the social networking giant and its top executives. This one, filed by Facebook shareholder Jeremiah F Hallisey, alleges that CEO and founder Mark Zuckerberg as well as other senior managers "breached their fiduciary duties by failing to prevent the initial misappropriation [of user data]" and by failing to disclose the misappropriation once they became aware of it.

Plaintiff: Jeremiah F. Hallisey
Defendant: Mark Zuckerberg, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Marc L. Andreessen, Peter A. Thiel, Reed Hastings, Erskine B. Bowles, Susan D. Desmond-Hellmann, Jan Koum and Facebook, Inc.
Miscellaneous: James Karon
Case Number: 5:2018cv01792
Filed: March 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Filing 151 Proposed Order re 149 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Stay Case, or in the Alternative, Modify the Hearing and Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Set A Briefing and Hearing Schedule for a Motion to Stay re 144 MOTION to Dismiss 142 First Amended Denying Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Stay Case, or in the Alternative, Modify the Hearing and Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Set a Briefing and Hearing Schedule for a Motion to Stay by Peggy Alford, Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Kenneth Chenault, Susan D. Desmond-Hellmann, Facebook, Inc., Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Peter A. Thiel, David M. Wehner, Jeffrey Zients, Mark Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 6, 2020 Filing 150 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 149 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Stay Case, or in the Alternative, Modify the Hearing and Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Set A Briefing and Hearing Schedule for a Motion to Stay re 144 MOTION to Dismiss 142 First Amended ) filed byPeggy Alford, Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Kenneth Chenault, Susan D. Desmond-Hellmann, Facebook, Inc., Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Peter A. Thiel, David M. Wehner, Jeffrey Zients, Mark Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 149 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Stay Case, or in the Alternative, Modify the Hearing and Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Set A Briefing and Hearing Schedule for a Motion to Stay re 144 MOTION to Dismiss 142 First Amended Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc.. filed by Gloria Stricklin Trust, Jeremiah F. Hallisey, James Karon, Ronald Martin, Natalie Ocegueda. Responses due by 4/6/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark C. Molumphy, # 2 Proposed Order)(Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
March 31, 2020 Filing 148 NOTICE of Appearance by Anya N. Thepot (Thepot, Anya) (Filed on 3/31/2020)
February 19, 2020 Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: In the future, please attach all supporting documents to the Motion. No further action is necessary. Re: 145 MOTION to Dis miss 142 First Amended Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc.. filed by Jeffrey Zients, Marc L. Andreessen, Peter A. Thiel, Kenneth Chenault, Jan Koum, Susan D. Desmond-Hellmann, Mark Zuckerberg, Erskine B. Bowles, David M. Wehner, Peggy Alford, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, 146 Request for Judicial Notice,, filed by Jeffrey Zients, Marc L. Andreessen, Facebook, Inc., Peter A. Thiel, Kenneth Chenault, Jan Koum, Susan D. Desmond-Hellmann, Erskine B. Bowles, Mark Zuckerberg, David M. Wehner, Peggy Alford, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, 144 MOTION to Dismiss 142 First Amended Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc.. filed by Facebook, Inc., 147 Declaration in Support,,, filed by Jeffrey Zients, Marc L. Andreessen, Facebook, Inc., Peter A. Thiel, Kenneth Chenault, Jan Koum, Susan D. Desmond-Hellmann, Erskine B. Bowles, Mark Zuckerberg, David M. Wehner, Peggy Alford, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2020)
February 18, 2020 Filing 147 Declaration of Brian M. Lutz in Support of 144 MOTION to Dismiss, 145 MOTION to Dismiss filed byPeggy Alford, Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Kenneth Chenault, Susan D. Desmond-Hellmann, Facebook, Inc., Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Peter A. Thiel, David M. Wehner, Jeffrey Zients, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25)(Related document(s) 144 , 145 ) (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 2/18/2020) Modified on 2/19/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2020 Filing 146 Request for Judicial Notice re 145 MOTION to Dismiss 142 First Amended Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc.. 144 MOTION to Dismiss 142 First Amended Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc.. filed byPeggy Alford, Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Kenneth Chenault, Susan D. Desmond-Hellmann, Facebook, Inc., Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Peter A. Thiel, David M. Wehner, Jeffrey Zients, Mark Zuckerberg. (Related document(s) 145 , 144 ) (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 2/18/2020) Modified on 2/19/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2020 Filing 145 MOTION to Dismiss 142 First Amended Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc.. filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Susan D. Desmond-Hellmann, Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg, David M. Wehner, Kenneth Chenault, Jeffrey Zients, Peggy Alford. Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 4/20/2020. Replies due by 5/26/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 2/18/2020) Modified on 2/19/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2020 Filing 144 MOTION to Dismiss 142 First Amended Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 4/20/2020. Replies due by 5/26/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 2/18/2020) Modified on 2/19/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/19/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING DEFENDANT'S 124 MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
December 17, 2019 Filing 142 FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT against Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Susan D. Desmond-Hellmann, Facebook, Inc., Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. Filed byRonald Martin, Gloria Stricklin Trust, Jeremiah F. Hallisey, Natalie Ocegueda, James Karon. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 12/17/2019) Modified on 12/18/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 139 Stipulation SCHEDULING FOR AMENDED COMPLAINT. Amended Pleadings due by 12/17/2019; Motions due by 2/18/2020; Responses due by 4/20/2020; Replies due by 5/25/2020 and Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 139 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Schedule for Amended Complaint filed by Jeremiah F. Hallisey, Mark Zukerberg, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Marc L. Andreessen, Peter A. Thiel, Reed Hastings, Erskine B. Bowles, SUsan D. Desmond-Hellmann, Jan Kourn, and Facebook, Inc. (Stassi, Gina) (Filed on 12/2/2019) Modified on 12/3/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING PLAINTIFFS 114 MOTION TO LIFT DISCOVERY STAY. Amended Pleadings due by 12/3/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 135 Administrative Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply Re 134 Reply to Opposition/Response. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 29, 2019 Filing 136 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 135 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to File Sur-reply re 134 Reply to Opposition/Response, ) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying John O' Connor Administrative Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply)(Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 135 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to File Sur-reply re 134 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed by John Francis O'Connor. Responses due by 10/29/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Proposed Sur-reply), # 2 Declaration of R. Alexander Saveri in Support of Administrative Motion, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion)(Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 10/25/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 134 REPLY (re 124 MOTION for Permanent Injunction ) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian M. Lutz in Support of Facebook, Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion for Permanent Injunction of State Proceedings, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 9/27/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 132 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 124 MOTION for Permanent Injunction ) per ECF 127 filed byJohn Francis O'Connor. (Saveri, Richard) (Filed on 9/20/2019)
September 20, 2019 Filing 131 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 124 MOTION for Permanent Injunction ) filed byJeremiah F. Hallisey. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gina Stassi ISO Plaintiffs' Response to Facebook's Motion for Permanent Injunction)(Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 9/20/2019) Modified on 9/23/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byJeremiah F. Hallisey. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 9/18/2019)
September 5, 2019 Filing 129 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Daniel E. Barenbaum (Barenbaum, Daniel) (Filed on 9/5/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 128 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding by Jeremiah F. Hallisey (Redenbarger, Tyson) (Filed on 8/29/2019) Modified on 8/30/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 14, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to Docket No. 124 , See Docket No. 127 : Responses due by 9/20/2019 and Replies due by 10/15/2019. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 126 Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule for 124 Motion for Permanent Injunction of State Proceedings. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
August 13, 2019 Filing 126 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule for 124 Motion for Permanent Injunction of State Proceedings filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Susan D. Desmond-Hellmann, Facebook, Inc., Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg, and Jeremiah F. Hallisey. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian M. Lutz, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lutz, Brian) (Filed on 8/13/2019) Modified on 8/14/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/14/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2019 Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyson Carl Redenbarger (Redenbarger, Tyson) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 124 MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 8/15/2019. Replies due by 8/22/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian M. Lutz, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Proposed Order)(Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byJeremiah F. Hallisey. (Related document(s) 119 , 114 ) (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 122 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Court takes the pending 114 motion to lift stay filings under submission. The hearing previously scheduled for June 27, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. is vacated. The Court will issue a written order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d In Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay To Permit Inspection In Aid of Pleading Demand Futility filed byJeremiah F. Hallisey. (Related document(s) 114 ) (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 120 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Melissa Ann Fortunato for Bragar Eagel & Squire, P.C. (Fortunato, Melissa) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 119 REPLY (re 114 MOTION to Lift Stay To Permit Inspection In Aid of Pleading Demand Futility ) filed byGloria Stricklin Trust, Jeremiah F. Hallisey, James Karon, Ronald Martin, Natalie Ocegueda. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 118 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 114 MOTION to Lift Stay To Permit Inspection In Aid of Pleading Demand Futility ) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian M. Lutz, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6)(Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 1, 2019 Set Hearing, see Docket No. 117 : 114 MOTION to Lift Stay To Permit Inspection In Aid of Pleading Demand Futility set for 6/27/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART 115 Plaintiffs' administrative motion to shorten time for hearing on Plaintiffs' motion to lift stay. The hearing for 114 Plaintiffs' motion to lift stay is set for June 27, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. The parties' current briefing schedule remains in effect. Plaintiffs' deadline to file an amended complaint is hereby continued from April 19, 2019 to a date to be set by the Court at the motion hearing on June 27, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
April 1, 2019 Filing 116 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice not re- file the 114 motion to lift stay. Hearing date of June 20, 2019, is vacated. The briefing schedule remains in effect. Counsel is directed to check the Court's scheduling notes before re-noticing the motion for a new hearing date. June 20th was not the Court's next available hearing date when this motion was e-filed. If the motion to shorten time is granted, the Court will advance the briefing and/or the hearing date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 115 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Shorten Time For Hearing On Plaintiffs' Motion To Lift Stay To Permit Inspection In Aid of Pleading Demand Futility or, Alternatively, To Extend Time For Plaintiffs To File An Amended Complaint re 114 MOTION to Lift Stay To Permit Inspection In Aid of Pleading Demand Futility filed by Gloria Stricklin Trust, Jeremiah F. Hallisey, James Karon, Ronald Martin, Natalie Ocegueda. Responses due by 4/1/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark C. Molumphy, # 2 Proposed Order)(Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 114 MOTION to Lift Stay To Permit Inspection In Aid of Pleading Demand Futility filed by Gloria Stricklin Trust, Jeremiah F. Hallisey, James Karon, Ronald Martin, Natalie Ocegueda. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 4/11/2019. Replies due by 4/18/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay To Permit Inspection, # 2 Declaration of Mark C. Molumphy, # 3 Proposed Order)(Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 3/28/2019)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. ON ( 69 , 70 , 71 MOTIONS TO DISMISS, 72 MOTION TO STAY, AND 84 MOTION TO INTERVENE.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 112 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Jeremiah F. Hallisey (Biehl, Stephanie) (Filed on 2/6/2019) Modified on 2/7/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 93 MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byCity of Birmingham Relief and Retirement System, Construction and General Building Laborers' Local Union No. 79 General Fund, Christopher Leagre, Lidia Levy. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Transcript)(Related document(s) 104 ) (Oddo, Stephen) (Filed on 1/8/2019)
January 8, 2019 Filing 109 NOTICE of Change of Address by Stephen J. Oddo (Oddo, Stephen) (Filed on 1/8/2019)
November 21, 2018 Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Counsel is instructed that all future filings shall bear the initials HSG immediately after the case number. Re: 108 Notice of Appearance filed by James Karon (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 20, 2018 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek G. Howard (Howard, Derek) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J. Tabacco, Jr. (Tabacco, Joseph) (Filed on 11/15/2018) Modified on 11/16/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING Dkt. No. 98 Motion to Shorten Time. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)<\i>(hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 105 CLERK'S NOTICE RE Docket Nos. 69 -[72) and 84 . Notice is hereby given that the Court takes the pending motion filings under submission. The hearings previously scheduled for today, November 15, 2018 at 2:00 p.m. are vacated. The Court will issue a written order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 104 Joinder re 84 MOTION to Intervene to Make a Limited Objection to Defendant's Request for Dismissal with Prejudice by City of Birmingham Relief and Retirement System, Construction and General Building Laborers' Local Union No. 79 General Fund, Lidia Levy. (Oddo, Stephen) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 103 REPLY (re 93 MOTION to Stay Inspection of Facebook's Books and Records Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. § 78U-4(B)(3)(D) ) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian M. Lutz)(Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 102 Statement regarding Recent Decision re 84 MOTION to Intervene to Make a Limited Objection to Defendant's Request for Dismissal with Prejudice by Christopher Leagre. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Oddo, Stephen) (Filed on 11/8/2018) Modified on 11/9/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2018 Filing 101 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. re 98 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion to Stay Inspection of Facebook's Books and Records of Plaintiffs' Failure to Timely Oppose (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 100 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 93 MOTION to Stay Inspection of Facebook's Books and Records Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. § 78U-4(B)(3)(D) ) filed byJeremiah F. Hallisey. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gina Stassi)(Stassi, Gina) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 99 REPLY (re 84 MOTION to Intervene to Make a Limited Objection to Defendant's Request for Dismissal with Prejudice ) filed byChristopher Leagre. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stephen J. Oddo)(Oddo, Stephen) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 98 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion to Stay Inspection of Facebook's Books and Records filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian M. Lutz, # 2 Proposed Order)(Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 97 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 84 MOTION to Intervene to Make a Limited Objection to Defendant's Request for Dismissal with Prejudice ) filed byGloria Stricklin Trust, Jeremiah F. Hallisey, James Karon, Ronald Martin, Natalie Ocegueda. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gina Stassi, # 2 Proposed Order)(Stassi, Gina) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 96 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 84 MOTION to Intervene to Make a Limited Objection to Defendant's Request for Dismissal with Prejudice ) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 94 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Orenstein, Nathaniel. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 94 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12783503.) filed by Gloria Stricklin Trust. (Orenstein, Nathaniel) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 18, 2018 Filing 93 MOTION to Stay Inspection of Facebook's Books and Records Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. § 78U-4(B)(3)(D) filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 11/1/2018. Replies due by 11/8/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Brian M. Lutz in Support of Facebook Inc.'s Motion to Stay Inspection of Facebook's Books and Records, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Proposed Order)(Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 10/18/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 92 Supplemental Declaration of Brian M. Lutz in Support of 86 Reply to Opposition/Response, 87 Reply to Opposition/Response, 88 Reply to Opposition/Response, 89 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byMarc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Susan D. Desmond-Hellmann, Facebook, Inc., Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 17, # 2 Exhibit 18, # 3 Exhibit 19)(Related document(s) 86 , 87 , 88 , 89 ) (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 10/12/2018) Modified on 10/15/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2018 Filing 91 Request for Judicial Notice re 86 Reply to Opposition/Response, 87 Reply to Opposition/Response, 88 Reply to Opposition/Response, 89 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byMarc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Susan D. Desmond-Hellmann, Facebook, Inc., Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Related document(s) 86 , 87 , 88 , 89 ) (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 90 Reply in Support of 73 Request for Judicial Notice, filed byMarc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Susan D. Desmond-Hellmann, Facebook, Inc., Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Related document(s) 73 ) (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 10/12/2018) Modified on 10/15/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2018 Filing 89 REPLY (re 72 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Related Securities Action, Consumer Actions, and FTC Investigation ) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 88 REPLY (re 71 MOTION to Dismiss Shareholder Derivative Complaint on Forum Non Conveniens Grounds ) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 87 REPLY (re 70 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B) ) filed byMarc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Susan D. Desmond-Hellmann, Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 86 REPLY (re 69 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23.1 ) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 12, 2018 Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL: In the future, please attach all supporting documents to the Motion. No further action is necessary. Re: 85 Declar ation in Support, filed by Christopher Leagre, 84 MOTION to Intervene to Make a Limited Objection to Defendant's Request for Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Christopher Leagre (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 11, 2018 Filing 85 Declaration of Stephen J. Oddo in Support of 84 MOTION to Intervene to Make a Limited Objection to Defendant's Request for Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Christopher Leagre. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 84 ) (Oddo, Stephen) (Filed on 10/11/2018) Modified on 10/12/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2018 Filing 84 MOTION to Intervene to Make a Limited Objection to Defendant's Request for Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Christopher Leagre. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 10/25/2018. Replies due by 11/1/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Oddo, Stephen) (Filed on 10/11/2018) Modified on 10/12/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2018 Filing 83 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 71 MOTION to Dismiss Shareholder Derivative Complaint on Forum Non Conveniens Grounds ) filed byGloria Stricklin Trust, Jeremiah F. Hallisey, James Karon, Ronald Martin, Natalie Ocegueda. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 82 OBJECTIONS to re 73 Request for Judicial Notice,,, by Gloria Stricklin Trust, Jeremiah F. Hallisey, James Karon, Ronald Martin, Natalie Ocegueda. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 81 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 72 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Related Securities Action, Consumer Actions, and FTC Investigation ) filed byGloria Stricklin Trust, Jeremiah F. Hallisey, James Karon, Ronald Martin, Natalie Ocegueda. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 80 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 70 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B) ) filed byGloria Stricklin Trust, Jeremiah F. Hallisey, James Karon, Ronald Martin, Natalie Ocegueda. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 79 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 69 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23.1 ) filed byGloria Stricklin Trust, Jeremiah F. Hallisey, James Karon, Ronald Martin, Natalie Ocegueda. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/11/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 77 NOTICE of Pending Stipulation to Consolidate Cases by Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 9/7/2018) Modified on 9/10/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 75 Motion to Relate Case to 18-cv-3710-LB. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 75 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Susan D. Desmond-Hellmann, Facebook, Inc., Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Stipulation in Support of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lutz, Brian) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 10, 2018 Filing 74 Declaration of Brian M. Lutz in Support of 70 MOTION to Dismiss Individual Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B), 69 MOTION to Dismiss Facebook, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23.1, 71 MOTION to Dismiss Facebook, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint on Forum Non Conveniens Grounds, 72 MOTION to Stay Facebook, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of Related Securities Action, Consumer Actions, and FTC Investigation filed byMarc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Susan D. Desmond-Hellmann, Facebook, Inc., Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16)(Related document(s) 70 , 69 , 71 , 72 ) (Lutz, Brian) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 10, 2018 Filing 73 Request for Judicial Notice re 70 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B), 72 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Related Securities Action, Consumer Actions, and FTC Investigation, 69 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23.1, 71 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint on Forum Non Conveniens Grounds filed byMarc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Susan D. Desmond-Hellmann, Facebook, Inc., Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Related document(s) 70 , 72 , 69 , 71 ) (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2018 Filing 72 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Related Securities Action, Consumer Actions, and FTC Investigation filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 9/17/2018. Replies due by 10/12/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2018 Filing 71 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint on Forum Non Conveniens Grounds filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 9/17/2018. Replies due by 10/12/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2018 Filing 70 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B) filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Susan D. Desmond-Hellmann, Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 9/17/2018. Replies due by 10/12/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2018 Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23.1 filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr. Responses due by 9/17/2018. Replies due by 10/12/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 8/10/2018) Modified on 8/13/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 66 Stipulation Regarding Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and/or Stay. Motions due by 8/10/2018; Responses due by 9/17/2018; Replies due by 10/12/2018; Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER DENYING 35 MOTION TO INTERVENE. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/20/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 66 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Schedule for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and/or Stay filed by Gloria Stricklin Trust, Jeremiah F. Hallisey, James Karon, Ronald Martin, Natalie Ocegueda, Mark Zuckerberg, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Marc L. Andreesen, Peter A. Thiel, Reed Hastings, Erskine B. Bowles, Susan D. Desmond-Hellmann, Jan Koum, Facebook, Inc. (Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 7/19/2018) Modified on 7/20/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DENYING PLAINTIFFS 60 REQUEST TO LIFT THE DISCOVERY STAY AND GRANTING DEFENDANTS 61 REQUEST TO MAINTAIN THE DISCOVERY STAY.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 11, 2018 Filing 64 Order denying 63 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
July 10, 2018 Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to File Response to 60 Plaintiffs' Submission Regarding the Applicability and Scope of the PSLRA Discovery Stay filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 7/10/2018) Modified on 7/11/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2018 Filing 62 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 27, 2018, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 925-899-2812, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (53 in 4:18-cv-01792-HSG) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2018. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
July 9, 2018 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] Correct Event is "Motion." Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: 61 MO TION filed by Facebook, Inc. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 61 Request to Maintain The PSLRA Automatic Stay of Discovery by Facebook, Inc. (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 7/6/2018) Modified on 7/9/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/9/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2018 Filing 60 Plaintiffs' Submission Regarding The Applicability and Scope of The PSLRA Discovery Stay filed by Gloria Stricklin Trust, Jeremiah F. Hallisey, James Karon, Ronald Martin, Natalie Ocegueda. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 7/6/2018) Modified on 7/9/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynda J Grant (Grant, Lynda) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 3, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Danitz (Danitz, Brian) (Filed on 7/3/2018)
July 3, 2018 Filing 57 Verifications To The Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint by Gloria Stricklin Trust, Jeremiah F. Hallisey, James Karon, Ronald Martin, Natalie Ocegueda re 56 Complaint, (Cotchett, Joseph) (Filed on 7/3/2018) Modified on 7/5/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2018 Filing 56 CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT against Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Susan D. Desmond-Hellmann, Facebook, Inc., Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. Filed byRonald Martin, Gloria Stricklin Trust, Jeremiah F. Hallisey, Natalie Ocegueda, James Karon. (Cotchett, Joseph) (Filed on 7/2/2018) Modified on 7/3/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2018 Filing 54 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/27/18 before Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr by James Karon, for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Gabriel, Larry) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
June 28, 2018 Filing 53 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/27/2018 before Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr by Jeremiah F. Hallisey, for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
June 27, 2018 Filing 55 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Initial Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing held on 6/27/2018 in case nos. 4:18-cv-01792-HSG ; 4:18-cv-01834-HSG; 4:18-cv-01893-HSG; 4:18-cv-02011-HSG; and 4:18-cv-01929-HSG. Total Time in Court: 13 Minutes. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. Plaintiff Attorney: Gina Stassi; Mark Molumphy; Daniel Barenbaumb; Lynda Grant appearing via courtcall. Defendant Attorney: Orin Snyder; Brian Lutz; Joshua Lipshutz. Movant Attorney: Catherine Pratsinakis; Jennifer Coleman; John Picone Movant's motions to intervene (docket no. 35 in case no. 18-cv-1792-HSG, docket no. 40 in case number 18-cv-1893-HSG and docket no. 20 in case numbers 18-cv-1929-HSG and 18-cv-2011-HSG) are argued and submitted by the parties, and DENIED by the Court. Written order to follow. Plaintiff is ordered to e- file the consolidated complaint by Monday, July 2nd. Parties are directed to meet and confer regarding an anticipated motion to dismiss, and are directed to file a stipulation and proposed scheduling order. Simultaneous briefs (7 pages maximum) regarding whether an automatic discovery stay applies under the PSLRA and, if so, the scope of the stay, are due by July 6th. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/27/2018)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr GRANTING (33) Stipulation in case 4:18-cv-01792-HSG. GOOD CAUSE appearing therefore, the cases captioned: Hallisey v. Zuckerberg et al, Case No. 18-cv-01792-HSG; Martin v. Zuckerberg et al, Case No. 18-cv-01834-HSG; Ocegueda v. Zuckerberg et al, Case No. 18-cv-01893-HSG; Gloria Stricklin Trust v. Zuckerberg et al, Case No. 18-cv-02011-HSG; and Karon v. Facebook, Inc., Case No. 18-cv-01929-HSG are hereby consolidated. The earliest-filed civil action, Case No. 18-cv-01792-HSG, shall serve as the lead case. The clerk is directed to administratively close the later-filed civil actions, Case Nos. 18-cv-01834-HSG, 18-cv-01893-HSG, 18-cv-02011-HSG, and 18-cv-01929-HSG. All future filings should be done in the lead case (Case No. 18-cv-01792-HSG) only and should be captioned "In Re Facebook, Inc. Shareholder Derivative Privacy Litigation". Associated Cases: 4:18-cv-01792-HSG, 4:18-cv-01834-HSG, 4:18-cv-01893-HSG, 4:18-cv-01929-HSG, 4:18-cv-02011-HSG(hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2018)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Pratsinakis, Catherine. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2018)
June 21, 2018 Filing 50 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 6/21/2018 by Tamara Lange. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2018) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
June 21, 2018 Electronic filing error. REMINDER TO COUNSEL : Document missing suffix to Judge's Name. Counsel need not re-file document, but should reference Hon. Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. in future filings if they wish to include reference to Judge's full assignment reference. This is a text only docket entry. There is no document associated with this entry Re: 48 Reply to Opposition/Response filed by Karen Sbriglio (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2018)
June 20, 2018 Filing 49 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Rule 26(F) Report filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Susan D. Desmond-Hellmann, Facebook, Inc., Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg., Jeremiah F. Hallisey,James Karon, Ronald Martin, Natalie Ocegueda, and Karen Sbriglio. (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 6/20/2018) Modified on 6/21/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2018 Filing 48 REPLY (re 35 MOTION to Intervene and Strike or Modify Stipulation and Proposed Order ) filed byKaren Sbriglio. (Coleman, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/20/2018)
June 20, 2018 Filing 47 Certificate of Interested Entities by Jeremiah F. Hallisey (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 6/20/2018)
June 20, 2018 Filing 46 Individual Certificate of Interested Entities by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Susan D. Desmond-Hellmann, Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 6/20/2018) Modified on 6/21/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2018 Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Facebook, Inc. (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 6/20/2018) Modified on 6/21/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12442333.) filed by Karen Sbriglio. (Pratsinakis, Catherine) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
June 13, 2018 Filing 43 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 35 MOTION to Intervene and Strike or Modify Stipulation and Proposed Order ) filed byJeremiah F. Hallisey. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
June 13, 2018 Filing 42 Declaration of Brian M. Lutz in Support of 41 Opposition/Response to Motion to Intervene filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 41 ) (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
June 13, 2018 Filing 41 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 35 MOTION to Intervene and Strike or Modify Stipulation and Proposed Order ) filed byFacebook, Inc. (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 6/13/2018) Modified on 6/14/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2018 Filing 40 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on June 21, 2018 at 10:00 AM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
June 6, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 6/6/2018)
June 6, 2018 Filing 38 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 6/6/2018)
June 6, 2018 Filing 37 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Lutz, Brian) (Filed on 6/6/2018)
May 31, 2018 Reset Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing Date Re Docket No. 35 in 4:18-cv-01792-HSG Docket No. 39 in 4:18-cv-01834-HSG, Docket No. 40 in 4:18-cv-01893-HSG, Docket No. 20 in 4:18-cv-01929-HSG and Docket No. 20 in 4:18-cv-02011-HSG : Case Management Conference/ Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2018 03:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. ADVANCING the currently-noticed hearing date on the motion to intervene (Dkt. No. 35 ) from August 23, 2018 to June 27, 2018 at 3:00 p.m. The current briefing schedule remains in place. The case management conference currently set for July 10, 2018 is also ADVANCED to June 27, 2018 at 3:00 p.m. At the hearing, the parties should be prepared to discuss the substance of the stipulation and proposed order (Dkt. No. 33 ) as well as the intervention issue. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018) Modified on 5/31/2018 (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/31/2018 (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/31/2018 (hsglc2S, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/31/2018 to reflect previous hearing date and correct docket numbers(hsglc2S, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2018 Electronic filing error Re: 35 MOTION to Intervene and Strike or Modify Stipulation and Proposed Order filed by Karen Sbriglio. REMINDER TO COUNSEL Please b e sure that the Judge's name is reflected as Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on the signature line of all future proposed orders submitted (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
May 30, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION to Intervene and Strike or Modify Stipulation and Proposed Order filed by Karen Sbriglio. Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2018 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 6/13/2018. Replies due by 6/20/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Catherine Pratsinakis, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Proposed Order)(Coleman, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/30/2018)
May 23, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Larry Wayne Gabriel (Gabriel, Larry) (Filed on 5/23/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Consolidate Related Actions, Appoint Lead Counsel, and Related Matters filed by Jeremiah F. Hallisey, Natalie Ocegueda, James karon, Ronald Martin, and Facebook, Inc. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 5/21/2018) Modified on 5/22/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2018 Filing 32 STIPULATION Extending Nominal Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Time to Respond to Initial Complaint (L.R. 6-1(A)) filed by Facebook, Inc. and Jeremiah F. Hallisey. (Lutz, Brian) (Filed on 5/15/2018) Modified on 5/16/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Denying Administrative Motion to Relate Case to 18-cv-1732-VC, Price v. Facebook, Inc. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 4/30/2018. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
April 30, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Waivers of Service of Summons for Defendants Mark Zuckerberg, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Marc L. Andreessen, Peter A. Thiel, Reed Hastings, Erskine B. Bowles, Susan D. Desmond-Hellman, and Jan Koum by Jeremiah F. Hallisey (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 4/30/2018) Modified on 5/1/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2018 Filing 29 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for June 26, 2018, is continued to July 10, 2018, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by July 3, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2018)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Corrected ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 20 Administrative Motion To Relate Re Case Nos. 18-cv-1834-WHA, 18-cv-1893-VC, 18-cv-1929-EJD, and 18-cv-2011-WHO. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/24/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 20 Administrative Motion To Relate Re Case Nos. 18-cv-1834-WHA, 18-cv-1893-VC, 18-cv-1929-EJD, and 18-cv-2011-JSC. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
April 18, 2018 Filing 26 STIPULATION Extending Nominal Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Time to Respond to Initial Complaint (L.R. 6-1(A)) filed by Facebook, Inc., and Jeremiah Hallisey (Lutz, Brian) (Filed on 4/18/2018) Modified on 4/19/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2018 Filing 25 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 20 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Administrative Motion To Relate ) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
April 10, 2018 Filing 24 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 20 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Administrative Motion To Relate ) filed by Jeremiah F. Hallisey. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 4/10/2018) Modified on 4/11/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2018 Filing 23 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 20 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Administrative Motion To Relate ) filed byRonald Martin. (Bishop, Patrice) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
April 10, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrice L. Bishop on Behalf of Interested Party Ronald Martin (Bishop, Patrice) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
April 10, 2018 Filing 21 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 20 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Administrative Motion To Relate ) filed byNatalie Ocegueda. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bottini, Francis) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
April 6, 2018 Filing 20 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Administrative Motion To Relate filed by James Karon. Responses due by 4/10/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service, # 3 Proposed Order)(Mulligan, Daniel) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Snyder, Orin. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2018)
April 5, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Related Actions by Jeremiah F. Hallisey. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 4/5/2018) Modified on 4/6/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12247934.) Filing fee previously paid on April 5, 2018 filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 4/5/2018)
April 4, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Collins (Collins, Paul) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 4, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin A. Linsley, Esq (Linsley, Kristin) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 4, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Seth Lipshutz (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 4, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Michael Lutz (Lutz, Brian) (Filed on 4/4/2018)
April 2, 2018 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for June 26, 2018, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by June 19, 2018. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/2/18. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
April 2, 2018 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2018)
March 30, 2018 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jeremiah F. Hallisey.. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Denying 4 Administrative Motion Consider whether cases related. It is hereby ordered that case 5:18-cv-01725-EJD and 3:18-cv-01792-SK are NOT related. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/30/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 28, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Defendants Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, Susan D. Desmond-Hellmann, Facebook, Inc., Reed Hastings, Jan Koum, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Peter A. Thiel & Mark Zuckerberg. (tnS) (Filed on 3/28/2018)
March 27, 2018 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 3/27/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2018 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (tnS) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 4 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULES 3-12 AND 7-11 filed by Jeremiah F Hallisey. Responses due by 3/27/2018. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 23, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/6/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 22, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
March 22, 2018 Filing 1 Shareholder Derivative Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-12212169). Filed by Jeremiah F. Hallisey. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 3/22/2018) Modified on 3/23/2018 (tnS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hallisey v. Zuckerberg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah F. Hallisey
Represented By: Stephanie Biehl
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Mark Cotton Molumphy
Represented By: Gina Stassi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Zuckerberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl K. Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc L. Andreessen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter A. Thiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erskine B. Bowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan D. Desmond-Hellmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Koum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Paul J. Collins
Represented By: Kristin A. Linsley, Esq.
Represented By: Joshua Seth Lipshutz
Represented By: Brian Michael Lutz
Represented By: Orin Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: James Karon
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Mulligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?