Inductors, Inc. v. Kemet Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Inductors, Inc.
Defendant: Sumida America Components, Inc., Taiyo Yuden Co., Ltd., Sumida Corporation, TDK Corporation of America, PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA, TDK U.S.A. Corporation, SANYO Electric Co.Ltd., Murata Electronics North America, Inc., Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd., TOKIN Corporation, NEC Corporation, Panasonic Corporation, KEMET Electronics Corporation, Taiyo Yuden (USA) Inc., Kemet Corporation, Okaya Electric America Inc., TDK-EPC Corporation, TOKIN AMERICA, INC., Okaya Electric Industries Co., Ltd., Sumida Electric Co., Ltd., TDK Corporation, Sanyo North America Corporation, Panasonic Electronic Devices Corporation of America, Panasonic Electronic Devices Co. Ltd. and Sanyo Electric Co. Ltd.
Case Number: 5:2018cv02175
Filed: April 11, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Los Angeles
0 Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
1 Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
May 4, 2018 9 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/26/2018, before Judge Davila. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, email address Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (126 in 5:18-cv-00198-EJD) Transcript Order, (127 in 5:18-cv-00198-EJD) Transcript Order, (125 in 5:18-cv-00198-EJD) Transcript Order, (128 in 5:18-cv-00198-EJD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/2/2018. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
April 27, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO CONSOLIDATE; APPOINTING LEAD INTERIM COUNSEL. The Clerk shall administratively close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/27/2018. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
April 26, 2018 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Motion Hearing (In re: 18 and 82 Motion to Consolidate and 21 , 55 , 81 Motion to Appoint Counsel filed in 5:18-cv-00198-EJD Dependable Component Supply Corp. v. Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd., et al.) held on 4/26/2018. The Court takes matters under submission; written order to be issued. Total Time in Court: 9:04 to 10:28 - 1 hour and 24 minutes. Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. For Plaintiff(s): Todd Seaver, Nicomedes Herrera, Lesley Weaver, Matthew Weiler, Steven Williams, Jiamin Chen, Jason Hartley, Bonny Sweeney, V Chai Oliver Prentice, Allan Steyer, Matthew Pearson, Jessica Moy, Michael Lehmann and Joseph Saveri. For Defendant(s): Michelle Chiu, Darrell Prescott, Eliot Adelson, Tammy Tsoumas and Jacob Sorensen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/26/2018)
April 20, 2018 ***Set Deadlines/Hearings per ECF 117 Order: Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/31/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Last day Meet and Confer deadline 5/10/2018. Last day to file ADR Certification and either file stipulation to ADR Process Or Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference 5/10/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2018)
April 19, 2018 6 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/30/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/3/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
April 19, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings pursuant to Order Relating Cases. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
April 19, 2018 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
April 19, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER Granting 108 Administrative Motion Relating Cases in case 5:18-cv-00198-EJD. It is hereby ordered that case 5:18-cv-00198-EJD Dependable Component Supply Corp. v Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. et al. is related to 3:18-cv-02175-JCS Inductors, Inc. v Kemet Corporation and such case shall be reassigned to Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/19/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
April 12, 2018 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/26/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2018)
April 11, 2018 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-12265875.). Filed by Inductors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hartley, Jason) (Filed on 4/11/2018) Modified on 4/19/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inductors, Inc. v. Kemet Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumida America Components, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taiyo Yuden Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumida Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TDK Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PANASONIC CORPORATION OF NORTH AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TDK U.S.A. Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANYO Electric Co.Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murata Electronics North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOKIN Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEMET Electronics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taiyo Yuden (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kemet Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Okaya Electric America Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TDK-EPC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOKIN AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Okaya Electric Industries Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sumida Electric Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TDK Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo North America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Electronic Devices Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Electronic Devices Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo Electric Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inductors, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Scott Hartley
Represented By: Jason Michael Lindner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?