Lazarus et al v. Apple, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Aberman, Sandy Brodsky, Victoria Childs, Stephen Margolis and Benjamin Lazarus
Defendant: Apple Inc
Case Number: 5:2018cv02325
Filed: April 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/11/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2018) Modified on 6/14/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/14/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER requesting proposal re: protocol for common benefit work and expenses. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/18/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/18/2018. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED ACTIONS re Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel AND Consolidate Actions re ECF 99 in 5:18-md-02827-EJD. ORIGINAL ORDER 99 WAS NOT SPREAD TO THE OTHER ACTIONS. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/15/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018) Modified on 5/16/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2018 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward J. Davila: Motion Hearing held on 5/10/2018 re ( 30 in 5:18-md-02827-EJD) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Karen Palmer, Brent Jones, Mark Davis, ( 38 in 5:18-md-02827-EJD) Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by John Solak, ( 35 in 5:18-md-02827-EJD) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Robert Gilson. The Court heard the parties positions regarding the motions. The Court took the matters under submission. Court to issue the order. Attorneys Appearances: SEE ATTACHMENT: Attorney Attendance Sheet. Total Time in Court:10:16am-12:08pm(1Hr.52Mins.) Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/10/2018)
April 27, 2018 Filing 11 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/25/2018, before Judge Edward J. Davila. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (18 in 5:18-md-02827-EJD) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/26/2018. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
April 25, 2018 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward J. Davila: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/25/2018. Counsel will continue to meet and confer regarding the procedure for preservation of evidence. The Court continued to STAY request for injunctive relief until Lead Counsel is appointed. Motion for consolidation AND to Appoint Lead Counsel are due by 5/3/2018. Motions will be limited to 15 pages and no responses shall be filed per agreement of counsel. Motions to Consolidate AND to Appoint Lead Counsel Hearing SPECIAL SET for 5/10/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. The parties agreed to submit to the Court a list of 4 names for a potential discovery referee for the matter. The Court will in turn appoint a discovery referee. The parties agreed and Court ordered that a Consolidated Complaint shall be filed by 7/12/2018. The Court ordered the deadline for a Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/16/2018 by NOON; and SPECIAL SET a Further Case Management Conference for 7/18/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor. Total Time in Court:10:24-10:52am(28 Mins.) Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: See ATTACHMENT Attendance Sheet. Defendant Attorney: See ATTACHMENT Attendance Sheet. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/25/2018)
April 23, 2018 Filing 9 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING TRANSFER/REASSIGNMENT. IF the parties have not already filed a Joint Case Management Statement, then Statement is due by 4/24/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2018)
April 19, 2018 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:17-cv-07485. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 19, 2018 Case transferred to District of Northern District of California. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Marziliano, August)
April 19, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFIED COPY of JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the Northern District of California are transferred to the Northern District of California and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Edward J. Davila for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Marziliano, August)
April 4, 2018 Filing 6 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A and pending outside the Northern District of California are transferred to the Northern District of California and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Edward J. Davila for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Marziliano, August)
January 18, 2018 Filing 5 Copies of documents filed before the JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTI-DISTRICT LITIGATION (Marziliano, August)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 12/27/2017. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 26, 2017 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 26, 2017 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 26, 2017 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 26, 2017 Case assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
December 26, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-10074900 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Benjamin Lazarus, Sandy Brodsky, Stephen Margolis, Jeffrey Aberman, Victoria Childs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Emert, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lazarus et al v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Aberman
Represented By: Melissa Robin Emert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Brodsky
Represented By: Melissa Robin Emert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Childs
Represented By: Melissa Robin Emert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Margolis
Represented By: Melissa Robin Emert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Lazarus
Represented By: Melissa Robin Emert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?