Doe 1 et al v. Nielsen et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 1, John Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4 and Jane Doe 5
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen, L. Francis Cissna, Jennifer B. Higgins, John Sullivan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Department of State
Case Number: 5:2018cv02349
Filed: April 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 261 Order Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Costs to Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 10/31/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 255 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 250 252 Discovery Letter Brief re Amended Protective Order. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Order re Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 10/15/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 249 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting in part and denying in part 218 Motion to Compel Unredacted Document (Sanctions Requested). (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 246 Order Discharging 235 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 10/4/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 235 Order re Defendants' September 20, 2019 Notices; Order to Show Cause re Sanctions for Non-Compliance. Show Cause Response due by 9/27/2019. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/1/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 9/23/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting 179 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 181 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Confidentiality of Govt Employee Names. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Order Setting Deadline for Completion of Jurisdictional Discovery. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 2/27/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Order Requiring Compliance with Court Order. Further Status Report due by 2/25/2019. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 2/22/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 161 Discovery Letter Brief and 162 Defendants' February 13, 2019 Status Report. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Order re Defendants' Jurisdictional Discovery Review and Production. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 2/5/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Order re Defendants' Jurisdictional Discovery Review and Production. Parties to confer by 12/31/2018. Defendants to submit report re schedule for completing remaining production by 12/31/2018. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 12/14/2018. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Order re Schedule for Jurisdictional Discovery by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re 105 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Defendants to begin producing documents immediately and to continue production on a rolling basis. Deadline to complete production of responsive documents: 12/7/2018. Deadline for completion of jurisdictional discovery: 1/7/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER DENYING 117 OPPOSED MOTION TO STAY REMAINING MOTION TO DISMISS DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/17/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi re 100 Discovery Letter Brief. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi re 86 Discovery Letter Brief. Defendants to produce administrative record by 8/3/2018 unless otherwise stipulated. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe 1 et al v. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 1
Represented By: Thomas E Golding
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Belinda S Lee
Represented By: Kathryn Claire Meyer
Represented By: Oliver Rocos
Represented By: Ariel E Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 2
Represented By: Thomas E Golding
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Belinda S Lee
Represented By: Kathryn Claire Meyer
Represented By: Oliver Rocos
Represented By: Ariel E Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 3
Represented By: Thomas E Golding
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Belinda S Lee
Represented By: Kathryn Claire Meyer
Represented By: Oliver Rocos
Represented By: Ariel E Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 4
Represented By: Thomas E Golding
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Belinda S Lee
Represented By: Kathryn Claire Meyer
Represented By: Oliver Rocos
Represented By: Ariel E Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 5
Represented By: Thomas E Golding
Represented By: Mariko Hirose
Represented By: Belinda S Lee
Represented By: Kathryn Claire Meyer
Represented By: Oliver Rocos
Represented By: Ariel E Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Christopher W Hollis
Represented By: Stacey Ilene Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Represented By: Christopher W Hollis
Represented By: Stacey Ilene Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer B. Higgins
Represented By: Christopher W Hollis
Represented By: Stacey Ilene Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Sullivan
Represented By: Christopher W Hollis
Represented By: Stacey Ilene Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Christopher W Hollis
Represented By: Stacey Ilene Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of State
Represented By: Christopher W Hollis
Represented By: Stacey Ilene Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?