In Re PG&E Corporation Securities Litigation
Plaintiff: David C. Weston, Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico, Mid-Jersey Trucking Industry & Local No. 701 Pension Fund, Jon Paul Moretti, York County on Behalf of the County of York Retirement Fund and City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System
Defendant: Jason P. Wells, David S. Thomason, Christopher P. Johns, Dinyar B. Mistry, Anthony F. Earley, Jr., Geisha J. Williams, PG&E Corporation, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Barry Lawson Williams, Barbara L. Rambo, Roger H. Kimmel, CitiGroup Global Merkets, Inc., Lewis Chew, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Pacific Gas and Electric Company, Anne Shen Smith, MFR Securities, Inc., TD Securities (USA) LLC, Richard A. Meserve, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Maryellen C. Herringer, BNY Mellon Capital Markets, LLC, Richard C. Kelly, CIBC World Markets Corp, U. S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., MUFG Securities Americas, Inc., Barclays Capital Inc, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Great Pacific Securities, C. L. King & Associates, Inc., Nickolas Stavropoulos, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Rosendo G. Parra, J. P. Morgan Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Julie M. Kane, Patrick M. Hogan, Forrest E. Miller, Mischler Financial Group, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Fred J. Fowler, Blaylock Van, LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Eric D. Mullins and Mitsubishi UFJ Securities (USA), Inc.
Petitioner: Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System
Interested Party: Ron Williams
Case Number: 5:2018cv03509
Filed: June 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward J Davila
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER Granting #176 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Michael Patrick Canty, Counsel for Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/11/2020. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
February 11, 2020 Filing 177 EXHIBITS re #176 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Michael Patrick Canty ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14166687.) Certificate of Good Standing filed byPublic Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Related document(s) #176 ) (Canty, Michael) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
February 11, 2020 Filing 176 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Michael Patrick Canty ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14166687.) filed by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Canty, Michael) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
January 29, 2020 Filing 175 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE TAKING MOTIONS UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. The Motions to Dismiss (Docket Item Nos. #148 and #155 ) before Judge Edward J. Davila previously noticed for 2/6/2020 at 9:00 AM have been taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civ. L.R. 7-1(b). The 2/6/2020 hearing is VACATED NO APPEARANCE NECESSARY. The Court to issue further Order on the submitted motions. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2020)
January 23, 2020 Filing 174 NOTICE of Appearance by Hadiya Khan Deshmukh (Deshmukh, Hadiya) (Filed on 1/23/2020)
January 15, 2020 Filing 173 REPLY (re #148 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint ) CORRECTED VERSION filed byAnthony F. Earley, Jr., Patrick M. Hogan, Christopher P. Johns, Julie M. Kane, Dinyar B. Mistry, Nickolas Stavropoulos, David S. Thomason, Geisha J. Williams. (Scholes, Steven) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 13, 2020 Filing 172 REPLY (re #155 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint ) Reply in Support of Request for Judicial Notice and Consideration of Documents in Support of Defendant Directors and Underwriters' Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byBNP Paribas Securities Corp., BNY Mellon Capital Markets, LLC, Barclays Capital Inc, Blaylock Van, LLC, C. L. King & Associates, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp, CitiGroup Global Merkets, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Great Pacific Securities, J. P. Morgan Securities LLC, MFR Securities, Inc., MUFG Securities Americas, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mischler Financial Group, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., U. S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., Wells Fargo Securities LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
January 13, 2020 Filing 171 REPLY (re #155 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint ) Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Further Support of Defendant Directors and Underwriters' Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byBNP Paribas Securities Corp., BNY Mellon Capital Markets, LLC, Barclays Capital Inc, Blaylock Van, LLC, C. L. King & Associates, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp, CitiGroup Global Merkets, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Great Pacific Securities, J. P. Morgan Securities LLC, MFR Securities, Inc., MUFG Securities Americas, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mischler Financial Group, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., U. S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., Wells Fargo Securities LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
January 13, 2020 Filing 170 RESPONSE re #162 Response to Officer Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice by Anthony F. Earley, Jr., Patrick M. Hogan, Christopher P. Johns, Julie M. Kane, Dinyar B. Mistry, Nickolas Stavropoulos, David S. Thomason, Geisha J. Williams. (Scholes, Steven) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
January 13, 2020 Filing 169 REPLY (re #148 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint ) filed byAnthony F. Earley, Jr., Patrick M. Hogan, Christopher P. Johns, Julie M. Kane, Dinyar B. Mistry, Nickolas Stavropoulos, David S. Thomason, Geisha J. Williams. (Scholes, Steven) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Order granting #167 Louis Gottlieb's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/8/2020. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2020) Modified on 1/8/2020 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2020 Filing 167 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. Responses due by 1/21/2020. Replies due by 1/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dubbs, Thomas) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
December 20, 2019 Filing 166 Certificate of Interested Entities by The Williams Capital Group, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Shank Williams Cisneros, LLC for The Williams Capital Group, L.P.. (Amended) (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 165 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Williams Capital Group, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Shank Williams Cisneros, LLC for The Williams Capital Group, L.P.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 164 Declaration of Louis Gottlieb In Support of Plaintiffs #162 (1) Opposition To Officer Defendants Request For Judicial Notice and (2) Cross Request for Judicial Notice filed by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Gottlieb, Louis) (Filed on 12/10/2019) Modified on 12/11/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2019 Filing 163 Response Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant Directors and Underwriters' Request for Judicial Notice and Consideration of Documents byPublic Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Dubbs, Thomas) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 162 Response Plaintiff's (1) Opposition to Officer Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice and (2) Cross-Request for Judicial Notice byPublic Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Dubbs, Thomas) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 161 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #155 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint ) filed byPublic Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Dubbs, Thomas) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 10, 2019 Filing 160 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #148 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint ) filed byPublic Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Dubbs, Thomas) (Filed on 12/10/2019)
December 6, 2019 ***Set/Reset Deadlines per ECF #159 Order. Responses due by 12/10/2020. Replies due by 1/13/2020. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Order granting #158 Stipulation to Continue Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/6/2019. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 6, 2019 Filing 158 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Busch, Frank) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 157 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Joseph Black (Black, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 156 NOTICE of Appearance by Willow E. Radcliffe (Radcliffe, Willow) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 155 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by BNP Paribas Securities Corp., BNY Mellon Capital Markets, LLC, Barclays Capital Inc, Blaylock Van, LLC, C. L. King & Associates, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp, CitiGroup Global Merkets, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Great Pacific Securities, J. P. Morgan Securities LLC, MFR Securities, Inc., MUFG Securities Americas, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mischler Financial Group, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., U. S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., Wells Fargo Securities LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 12/6/2019. Replies due by 1/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibits 1-19)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 154 EXHIBITS re #150 Request for Judicial Notice, Exhibits 40-43-B filed byAnthony F. Earley, Jr., Patrick M. Hogan, Christopher P. Johns, Julie M. Kane, Dinyar B. Mistry, Nickolas Stavropoulos, David S. Thomason, Geisha J. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 40, #2 Exhibit 41, #3 Exhibit 42, #4 Exhibit 43-A, #5 Exhibit 43-B)(Related document(s) #150 ) (Scholes, Steven) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 153 EXHIBITS re #150 Request for Judicial Notice, Exhibits 22-39 filed byAnthony F. Earley, Jr., Patrick M. Hogan, Christopher P. Johns, Julie M. Kane, Dinyar B. Mistry, Nickolas Stavropoulos, David S. Thomason, Geisha J. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 22, #2 Exhibit 23, #3 Exhibit 24, #4 Exhibit 25, #5 Exhibit 26, #6 Exhibit 27, #7 Exhibit 28, #8 Exhibit 29, #9 Exhibit 30, #10 Exhibit 31, #11 Exhibit 32, #12 Exhibit 33, #13 Exhibit 34, #14 Exhibit 35, #15 Exhibit 36, #16 Exhibit 37, #17 Exhibit 38, #18 Exhibit 39)(Related document(s) #150 ) (Scholes, Steven) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 152 EXHIBITS re #150 Request for Judicial Notice, Exhibits 4-A --21 filed byAnthony F. Earley, Jr., Patrick M. Hogan, Christopher P. Johns, Julie M. Kane, Dinyar B. Mistry, Nickolas Stavropoulos, David S. Thomason, Geisha J. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4-A, #2 Exhibit 4-B, #3 Exhibit 4-C, #4 Exhibit 4-D, #5 Exhibit 4-E, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21)(Related document(s) #150 ) (Scholes, Steven) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 151 EXHIBITS re #150 Request for Judicial Notice, Exhibits 1-3E filed byAnthony F. Earley, Jr., Patrick M. Hogan, Christopher P. Johns, Julie M. Kane, Dinyar B. Mistry, Nickolas Stavropoulos, David S. Thomason, Geisha J. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2-A, #3 Exhibit 2-B, #4 Exhibit 2-C, #5 Exhibit 2-D, #6 Exhibit 3-A, #7 Exhibit 3-B, #8 Exhibit 3-C, #9 Exhibit 3-D, #10 Exhibit 3-E)(Related document(s) #150 ) (Scholes, Steven) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 150 Request for Judicial Notice re #149 Brief, #148 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byAnthony F. Earley, Jr., Patrick M. Hogan, Christopher P. Johns, Julie M. Kane, Dinyar B. Mistry, Nickolas Stavropoulos, David S. Thomason, Geisha J. Williams. (Related document(s) #149 , #148 ) (Scholes, Steven) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 149 Brief re #148 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byAnthony F. Earley, Jr., Patrick M. Hogan, Christopher P. Johns, Julie M. Kane, Dinyar B. Mistry, Nickolas Stavropoulos, David S. Thomason, Geisha J. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Related document(s) #148 ) (Scholes, Steven) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 148 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Anthony F. Earley, Jr., Patrick M. Hogan, Christopher P. Johns, Julie M. Kane, Dinyar B. Mistry, Nickolas Stavropoulos, David S. Thomason, Geisha J. Williams. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 12/6/2019. Replies due by 1/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scholes, Steven) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 147 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Gregory Raymond Jones re: Charles E. Weir (Jones, Gregory) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 146 Certificate of Interested Entities by Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated. Amended L.R. 3-15 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 25, 2019 Filing 145 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated. Amended Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 9/25/2019)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER Granting #141 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Rachel Sparks Bradley, Counsel for Defendant see attached list. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/24/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER Granting #140 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for NIcholas Goldin, Counsel for Defendants see attached list. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/24/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER Granting #139 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Paul C. Curnin, Counsel for Defendants per list attached. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/24/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 141 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13733251.) filed by Lewis Chew, Fred J. Fowler, Maryellen C. Herringer, Richard C. Kelly, Roger H. Kimmel, Richard A. Meserve, Forrest E. Miller, Eric D. Mullins, Rosendo G. Parra, Barbara L. Rambo, Anne Shen Smith, Barry Lawson Williams. (Sparks Bradley, Rachel) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 140 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13733232.) filed by Lewis Chew, Fred J. Fowler, Maryellen C. Herringer, Richard C. Kelly, Roger H. Kimmel, Richard A. Meserve, Forrest E. Miller, Eric D. Mullins, Rosendo G. Parra, Barbara L. Rambo, Anne Shen Smith, Barry Lawson Williams. (Goldin, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 139 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13733177.) filed by Lewis Chew, Fred J. Fowler, Maryellen C. Herringer, Richard C. Kelly, Roger H. Kimmel, Richard A. Meserve, Forrest E. Miller, Eric D. Mullins, Rosendo G. Parra, Barbara L. Rambo, Anne Shen Smith, Barry Lawson Williams. (Curnin, Paul) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 138 Certificate of Interested Entities by Barry Lawson Williams (Blake, Stephen) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 137 Certificate of Interested Entities by Anne Shen Smith (Blake, Stephen) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 136 Certificate of Interested Entities by Barbara L. Rambo (Blake, Stephen) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 135 Certificate of Interested Entities by Rosendo G. Parra (Blake, Stephen) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 134 Certificate of Interested Entities by Eric D. Mullins (Blake, Stephen) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 133 Certificate of Interested Entities by Forrest E. Miller (Blake, Stephen) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 132 Certificate of Interested Entities by Richard A. Meserve (Blake, Stephen) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 131 Certificate of Interested Entities by Roger H. Kimmel (Blake, Stephen) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 130 Certificate of Interested Entities by Richard C. Kelly (Blake, Stephen) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 129 Certificate of Interested Entities by Maryellen C. Herringer (Blake, Stephen) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 128 Certificate of Interested Entities by Fred J. Fowler (Blake, Stephen) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 24, 2019 Filing 127 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lewis Chew (Blake, Stephen) (Filed on 9/24/2019)
September 19, 2019 ***Set/Reset Deadlines per ECF #126 Order as to responsive motion to be filed 10/4/2019. Responses due by 12/6/2019. Replies due by 1/10/2020. Motion Hearing set for 2/6/2020 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Judge Edward J. Davila. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Order granting #125 Stipulation as modified. Hearing set for Feb. 6, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/19/2019. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 19, 2019 Filing 125 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule filed by Anthony F. Earley, Jr., Patrick M. Hogan, Christopher P. Johns, Julie M. Kane, Dinyar B. Mistry, Nickolas Stavropoulos, David S. Thomason, Geisha J. Williams. (Weir, Charles) (Filed on 9/19/2019)
September 6, 2019 Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Patrick Blake (Blake, Stephen) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 123 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING. Please take NOTICE that the Case Management Conference scheduled for 8/22/2019 is HEREBY VACATED pursuant to ECF #117 Order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
May 29, 2019 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal Alan Potischman (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 121 THIRD AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against BNP Paribas Securities Corp., BNY Mellon Capital Markets, LLC, Barclays Capital Inc, Blaylock Van, LLC, C. L. King & Associates, Inc., CIBC World Markets Corp, CitiGroup Global Merkets, Inc., Anthony F. Earley, Jr., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Great Pacific Securities, Patrick M. Hogan, J. P. Morgan Securities LLC, Christopher P. Johns, Julie M. Kane, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, MFR Securities, Inc., MUFG Securities Americas, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Mischler Financial Group, Inc., Dinyar B. Mistry, Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Eric D. Mullins, PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company, Rosendo G. Parra, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Anne Shen Smith, Nickolas Stavropoulos, TD Securities (USA) LLC, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., David S. Thomason, U. S. Bancorp Investments, Inc., Wells Fargo Securities LLC, Geisha J. Williams, Barbara L. Rambo, Lewis Chew, Fred J. Fowler, Maryellen C. Herringer, Richard C. Kelly, Roger H. Kimmel, Richard A. Meserve, Forrest E. Miller, Barry Lawson Williams. Filed byPublic Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico, City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System, York County on Behalf of the County of York Retirement Fund, Mid-Jersey Trucking Industry & Local No. 701 Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Certification of Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico, #2 Attachment B - Certification of York County on behalf of the County of York Retirement Fund, #3 Attachment C - Certification of City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System, #4 Attachment D - Certification of Mid-Jersey Trucking Industry & Local No. 701 Pension Fund, #5 Exhibit A - Securities Act Claims)(Dubbs, Thomas) (Filed on 5/28/2019) Modified on 5/29/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER Granting #119 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Aram M. Boghosian, Counsel for Public Employees Retirement Assoc. of New Mexico. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/14/2019. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 119 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13341857.) filed by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Boghosian, Aram) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 118 (Text Only) CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/22/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 4, 5th Floor before Hon. Edward J. Davila. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ejdorders. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Amended ORDER to relate action and to consolidate and file third amended consolidated class action complaint. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/7/2019. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2019) Modified on 5/7/2019 (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Order granting #113 Stipulation to consolidate and file third amended consolidated class action compliant. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/7/2019. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Judge Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 5/6/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/3/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 1, 2019 Filing 113 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Dubbs, Thomas) (Filed on 5/1/2019)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #109 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2019)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER RELATING CASES 18-CV-03509 RS and 19-CV-00501 JST. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/18/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 110 RESPONSE re #108 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases by PG&E Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Perrin, Robert) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 109 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney James Leon Ostaszewski, Esq. as counsel of record and for removal from the Court's service list filed by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. Responses due by 3/29/2019. Replies due by 4/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dubbs, Thomas) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 108 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 3:19-cv-00501-JST Blackburn v. Meserve et al. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 8, 2019. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER RE #106 TO CONTINUE THE RESPONSE DATE TO THE SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/8/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 106 STIPULATION to Continue Current February 15, 2019 Response Date to Second Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Anthony F. Earley, Jr., Patrick M. Hogan, Christopher P. Johns, Julie M. Kane, Nickolas Stavropoulos, Geisha J. Williams. (Weir, Charles) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 105 Letter from Thomas A. Dubbs regarding Notice of Pendency of Bankruptcy. (Dubbs, Thomas) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 104 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON APRIL 11, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE by PG&E Corporation of Pendency of Bankruptcy and Automatic Stay of Proceedings (Perrin, Robert) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 102 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. Service waived by Patrick M. Hogan waiver sent on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Dubbs, Thomas) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 101 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. Service waived by Nickolas Stavropoulos waiver sent on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Dubbs, Thomas) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 100 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. Service waived by Julie M. Kane waiver sent on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Dubbs, Thomas) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 8, 2019 Filing 99 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. Service waived by Pacific Gas and Electric Company waiver sent on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Dubbs, Thomas) (Filed on 1/8/2019)
December 21, 2018 Filing 98 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 4/4/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2019 AT 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Vacate Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/21/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 96 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Vacate Case Management Conference and Related Deadlines filed by PG&E Corporation. (Perrin, Robert) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 95 SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS; Jury Trial Demanded against Anthony F. Earley, Jr., Patrick M. Hogan, Christopher P. Johns, Julie M. Kane, PG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company, Nickolas Stavropoulos, Geisha J. Williams. Filed by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Dubbs, Thomas) (Filed on 12/14/2018) Modified on 12/18/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #90 Motion to Relate Cases C 18-3509 RS and C 18-07128 PJH. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 12, 2018 Filing 93 NOTICE of Change of Address by Frank H. Busch (Busch, Frank) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 92 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #90 MOTION to Relate Case Williams v. Earley, et al., No. 3:18-cv-07128 ) filed byRon Williams. (Moest, Robert) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 91 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #90 MOTION to Relate Case Williams v. Earley, et al., No. 3:18-cv-07128 ) filed byPG&E Corporation, Pacific Gas and Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Perrin, Robert) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 90 MOTION to Relate Case Williams v. Earley, et al., No. 3:18-cv-07128 filed by Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Barenbaum, Daniel) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION AND ORDER to amend and lead plaintiff's notice of withdrawal of motion. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/26/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 21, 2018 Filing 88 STIPULATION to Amend and Lead Plaintiff's Notice of Withdrawal of Motion filed by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Dubbs, Thomas) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 20, 2018 Filing 87 Declaration of Thomas A. Dubbs in Support of #86 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #79 MOTION to Partially Lift the PSLRA Discovery Stay and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byPublic Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Related document(s) #86 ) (Dubbs, Thomas) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 20, 2018 Filing 86 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #79 MOTION to Partially Lift the PSLRA Discovery Stay and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Dubbs, Thomas) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 85 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #79 MOTION to Partially Lift the PSLRA Discovery Stay and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) and Joinder in PG&E's Opposition filed byAnthony F. Earley, Jr., Christopher P. Johns, Geisha J. Williams. (Weir, Charles) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 84 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #79 MOTION to Partially Lift the PSLRA Discovery Stay and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed byPG&E Corporation. (Perrin, Robert) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 83 CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws; Jury Trial Demanded against Anthony F. Earley, Jr., Christopher P. Johns, PG&E Corporation, Geisha J. Williams, Pacific Gas and Electric Company, Nickolas Stavropoulos, Julie M. Kane, Patrick M. Hogan. Filed byPublic Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Dubbs, Thomas) (Filed on 11/9/2018) Modified on 12/5/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #81 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Carol Cecilia Villegas. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 30, 2018 Filing 81 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12804921.) filed by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Villegas, Carol) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 80 Declaration of LOUIS GOTTLIEB in Support of #79 MOTION to Partially Lift the PSLRA Discovery Stay and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byPublic Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #79 ) (Gottlieb, Louis) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 79 MOTION to Partially Lift the PSLRA Discovery Stay and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 11/13/2018. Replies due by 11/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dubbs, Thomas) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #73 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Wendy Tsang. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #72 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to James Leon Ostaszewski. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #71 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Louis Gottlieb. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #70 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Thomas A. Dubbs. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Dubbin on behalf of Plaintiff Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico (Dubbin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 73 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12802185.) filed by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Tsang, Wendy) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 72 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12802169.) filed by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ostaszewski, James) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 71 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12802062.) filed by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Gottlieb, Louis) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 70 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12801991.) filed by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Dubbs, Thomas) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
September 25, 2018 Cases associated: Create association to 3:18-cv-03509-RS. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #68 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to James E. Brandt. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 21, 2018 Filing 68 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12700495.) filed by PG&E Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Brandt, James) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 14, 2018 Filing 67 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference previously set for September 27, 2018 is continued to January 10, 2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by January 3, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #63 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Steven S. Scholes. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Raymond Jones (Jones, Gregory) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 64 Certificate of Interested Entities by Anthony F. Earley, Jr., Christopher P. Johns, Dinyar B. Mistry, David S. Thomason, Jason P. Wells, Geisha J. Williams (Weir, Charles) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 63 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12673718.) filed by Anthony F. Earley, Jr., Christopher P. Johns, Dinyar B. Mistry, David S. Thomason, Jason P. Wells, Geisha J. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Scholes, Steven) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION, APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 61 REPLY (re #29 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) Reply in Support of its Unopposed Motion for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel filed byPublic Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
August 29, 2018 Filing 60 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/29/2018)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE #54 to Relate Cases 18-03509 RS, 18-03545 RS, 18-04698 PJH. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/29/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018) Modified on 8/29/2018 (cl, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2018 Filing 58 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion of Paul Herbst to Consolidate Related Actions, For Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Counsel (Dkt. No. 17) (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 28, 2018 Filing 57 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2018. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 9/20/2018 has been continued to 9/27/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 28, 2018 Filing 56 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #45 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases . Motions Hearing previously set for 9/20/2018 has been continued to 9/27/2018 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 27, 2018 Filing 55 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #29 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) Memorandum of Law in Further Support of the Motion of Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel; and in Opposition to Competing Motions, filed byPublic Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 22, 2018 Filing 54 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Relate Cases filed by PG&E Corporation. (Perrin, Robert) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 53 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion by Ali Vafai for (i) Consolidation of Related Cases; (ii) Appointment as Lead Plaintiff; and (iii) Approval of His Selection of Lead Counsel (Abadou, Ramzi) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 52 Statement of Non-Opposition re #25 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #38 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; MPA In Support Thereof, #17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #45 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #29 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byEdward Borges. (Related document(s) #25 , #38 , #17 , #45 , #29 ) (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 20, 2018 Filing 51 Statement of Non-Opposition re #38 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; MPA In Support Thereof filed byLos Angeles Fire and Police Pensions. (Related document(s) #38 ) (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER RELATING CASES 18-03509 RS and 18-03545 VC. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/14/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #16 Stipulation to relate cases 18-03509 RS and 18-03545 VC. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 48 Certificate of Interested Entities by Richard E. and Sandra L Volpi Trust July 4 2012, Richard Volpi, Volpi Family Trust July 30 2002 re #45 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #45 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel by Jennifer Pafiti on behalf of Richard E. and Sandra L Volpi Trust July 4 2012, Richard Volpi, Volpi Family Trust July 30 2002 (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 46 Declaration of Jennifer Pafiti in Support of #45 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byRichard E. and Sandra L Volpi Trust July 4 2012, Richard Volpi, Volpi Family Trust July 30 2002. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Press Release, #2 Exhibit B - Cerfications, #3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume)(Related document(s) #45 ) (Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Richard Volpi, Volpi Family Trust July 30 2002, Richard E. and Sandra L Volpi Trust July 4 2012. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 8/27/2018. Replies due by 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pafiti, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 44 Certificate of Interested Entities by Los Angeles Fire and Police Pensions re #38 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; MPA In Support Thereof (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #38 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; MPA In Support Thereof Certification of Danielle Smith Purs. to L.R. 3-7(d) by Reed R. Kathrein on behalf of Los Angeles Fire and Police Pensions (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #38 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; MPA In Support Thereof Certification of Reed R. Kathrein Purs. to L.R. 3-7(d) by Reed R. Kathrein on behalf of Los Angeles Fire and Police Pensions (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #38 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; MPA In Support Thereof Certification of Michael W. Stocker Purs. to L.R. 3-7(d) by Reed R. Kathrein on behalf of Los Angeles Fire and Police Pensions (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #38 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; MPA In Support Thereof Certification of Times Wang Purs. to L.R. 3-7(d) by Reed R. Kathrein on behalf of Los Angeles Fire and Police Pensions (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #38 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; MPA In Support Thereof Certification of Julie G. Reiser Purs. to L.R. 3-7(d) by Reed R. Kathrein on behalf of Los Angeles Fire and Police Pensions (Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 38 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; MPA In Support Thereof filed by Los Angeles Fire and Police Pensions. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 8/27/2018. Replies due by 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Julie G. Reiser In Support of Los Angeles Fire and Police Pensions' Motion to Consolidate Cases, Appoint LP and Selection of Counsel, #2 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, #3 Exhibit B - Certification, #4 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #5 Exhibit D - Cohen Milstein Resume, #6 Exhibit E - Hagens Berman Resume, #7 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kathrein, Reed) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #29 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ; Certification of Wendy Tsang by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #29 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ; Certification of Francis P. McConville by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #29 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ; Certification of Louis Gottlieb by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #29 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ; Certification of Frank Busch by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #29 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ; Certification of Thomas A. Dubbs by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #29 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ; Certification of James M. Wagstaffe by James Matthew Wagstaffe on behalf of Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 31 Certificate of Interested Entities by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico re #29 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 30 Declaration of James M. Wagstaffe in Support of #29 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed byPublic Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Exhibit B - Loss Analysis, #3 Exhibit C - Notice, #4 Exhibit D - Labaton Sucharow Firm Resume, #5 Exhibit E - Biography of James M. Wagstaffe)(Related document(s) #29 ) (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 8/27/2018. Replies due by 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 28 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ali Vafai re #25 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , #26 Declaration in Support, (Abadou, Ramzi) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Ramzi Abadou on behalf of Ali Vafai (Abadou, Ramzi) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 26 Declaration of Ramzi Abadou in Support of #25 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed byAli Vafai. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Ali Vafai, #2 Exhibit B - Loss Chart, #3 Exhibit C - Globe Newswire Publication, #4 Exhibit D - KSF Firm Resume)(Related document(s) #25 ) (Abadou, Ramzi) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Ali Vafai. Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 8/27/2018. Replies due by 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Abadou, Ramzi) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Shannon L. Hopkins Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Rosemary M. Rivas on behalf of Edward Borges (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Rosemary M. Rivas on behalf of Edward Borges (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities by Edward Borges (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Edward Borges. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 8/27/2018. Replies due by 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Rosemary M. Rivas and Exhibits A-D, #3 Proposed Order)(Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Paul Herbst (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Laurence M. Rosen on behalf of Paul Herbst (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 18 Declaration of Laurence M. Rosen in Support of #17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byPaul Herbst. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) #17 ) (Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Paul Herbst. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Responses due by 8/27/2018. Replies due by 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosen, Laurence) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Relate Cases filed by David C. Weston. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #14 Stipulation extending time to respond to complaint. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by PG&E Corporation. (Perrin, Robert) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by PG&E Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Pacific Gas & Electric Company for PG&E Corporation. (Perrin, Robert) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PG&E Corporation (Perrin, Robert) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Reiss on behalf of PG&E Corporation (Reiss, Michael) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 19, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Ward Perrin on behalf of PG&E Corporation (Perrin, Robert) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 18, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Edward Weir (Weir, Charles) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 10, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David C. Weston. All Defendants. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
June 18, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by David C. Weston of Publication of PSLRA Notice Per L.R. 23-1(a) (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 6/18/2018)
June 15, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Anthony F. Earley, Jr., Christopher P. Johns, Dinyar B. Mistry, PG&E Corporation, David S. Thomason, Jason P. Wells, Geisha J. Williams. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2018)
June 15, 2018 Filing 5 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER SEC CLASS ACTION This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras SEC Class Action Notice due by 7/3/2018. Case Management Statement due by 9/13/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2018)
June 13, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
June 12, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by David C. Weston (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 6/12/2018)
June 12, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 6/12/2018)
June 12, 2018 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Violation of Federal Securities Law; Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-12430442.). Filed by David C. Weston. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rivas, Rosemary) (Filed on 6/12/2018) Modified on 6/15/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re PG&E Corporation Securities Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason P. Wells
Represented By: Charles Edward Weir
Represented By: Gregory Raymond Jones
Represented By: Steven Samuel Scholes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David S. Thomason
Represented By: Charles Edward Weir
Represented By: Gregory Raymond Jones
Represented By: Steven Samuel Scholes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher P. Johns
Represented By: Charles Edward Weir
Represented By: Gregory Raymond Jones
Represented By: Steven Samuel Scholes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dinyar B. Mistry
Represented By: Charles Edward Weir
Represented By: Gregory Raymond Jones
Represented By: Steven Samuel Scholes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony F. Earley, Jr.
Represented By: Charles Edward Weir
Represented By: Gregory Raymond Jones
Represented By: Steven Samuel Scholes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geisha J. Williams
Represented By: Charles Edward Weir
Represented By: Gregory Raymond Jones
Represented By: Steven Samuel Scholes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PG&E Corporation
Represented By: Robert Ward Perrin
Represented By: Michael J. Reiss
Represented By: James E. Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lebenthal & Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Lawson Williams
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Blake
Represented By: Nicholas Stoloff Goldin
Represented By: Paul C. Curnin
Represented By: Rachel Serenity Sparks Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara L. Rambo
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Blake
Represented By: Paul C. Curnin
Represented By: Rachel Serenity Sparks Bradley
Represented By: Nicholas Stoloff Goldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger H. Kimmel
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Blake
Represented By: Paul C. Curnin
Represented By: Rachel Serenity Sparks Bradley
Represented By: Nicholas Stoloff Goldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiGroup Global Merkets, Inc.
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Dana M. Seshens
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Chew
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Blake
Represented By: Nicholas Stoloff Goldin
Represented By: Paul C. Curnin
Represented By: Rachel Serenity Sparks Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Williams Capital Group, L.P.
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Dana M. Seshens
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Gas and Electric Company
Represented By: Robert Ward Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Shen Smith
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Blake
Represented By: Paul C. Curnin
Represented By: Rachel Serenity Sparks Bradley
Represented By: Nicholas Stoloff Goldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MFR Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Dana M. Seshens
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Dana M. Seshens
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. Meserve
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Blake
Represented By: Paul C. Curnin
Represented By: Rachel Serenity Sparks Bradley
Represented By: Nicholas Stoloff Goldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Dana M. Seshens
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMBC Nikko Securities America, Inc.
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Dana M. Seshens
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryellen C. Herringer
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Blake
Represented By: Paul C. Curnin
Represented By: Rachel Serenity Sparks Bradley
Represented By: Nicholas Stoloff Goldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNY Mellon Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Dana M. Seshens
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard C. Kelly
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Blake
Represented By: Paul C. Curnin
Represented By: Rachel Serenity Sparks Bradley
Represented By: Nicholas Stoloff Goldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIBC World Markets Corp
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Dana M. Seshens
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. S. Bancorp Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Dana M. Seshens
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUFG Securities Americas, Inc.
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Dana M. Seshens
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Dana M. Seshens
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Securities LLC
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Dana M. Seshens
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Dana M. Seshens
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Pacific Securities
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Dana M. Seshens
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. L. King & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Dana M. Seshens
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nickolas Stavropoulos
Represented By: Charles Edward Weir
Represented By: Gregory Raymond Jones
Represented By: Steven Samuel Scholes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas Securities Corp.
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Dana M. Seshens
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Dana M. Seshens
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosendo G. Parra
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Blake
Represented By: Paul C. Curnin
Represented By: Rachel Serenity Sparks Bradley
Represented By: Nicholas Stoloff Goldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Dana M. Seshens
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Dana M. Seshens
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie M. Kane
Represented By: Charles Edward Weir
Represented By: Gregory Raymond Jones
Represented By: Steven Samuel Scholes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick M. Hogan
Represented By: Charles Edward Weir
Represented By: Gregory Raymond Jones
Represented By: Steven Samuel Scholes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forrest E. Miller
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Blake
Represented By: Paul C. Curnin
Represented By: Rachel Serenity Sparks Bradley
Represented By: Nicholas Stoloff Goldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mischler Financial Group, Inc.
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Dana M. Seshens
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mizuho Securities USA LLC
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Dana M. Seshens
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred J. Fowler
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Blake
Represented By: Paul C. Curnin
Represented By: Rachel Serenity Sparks Bradley
Represented By: Nicholas Stoloff Goldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaylock Van, LLC
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Dana M. Seshens
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Dana M. Seshens
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric D. Mullins
Represented By: Stephen Patrick Blake
Represented By: Paul C. Curnin
Represented By: Rachel Serenity Sparks Bradley
Represented By: Nicholas Stoloff Goldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi UFJ Securities (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Dana M. Seshens
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Craig Cagney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David C. Weston
Represented By: Rosemary M. Rivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Public Employees Retirement Association of New Mexico
Represented By: Wendy Tsang
Represented By: James Leon Ostaszewski
Represented By: Louis J Gottlieb
Represented By: Carol C. Villegas
Represented By: Thomas A. Dubbs
Represented By: Frank H. Busch
Represented By: Jeffrey Dubbin
Represented By: Aram M Boghosian
Represented By: Michael P. Canty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-Jersey Trucking Industry & Local No. 701 Pension Fund
Represented By: Darren Jay Robbins
Represented By: Willow E. Radcliffe
Represented By: Kenneth Joseph Black
Represented By: Brian Edward Cochran
Represented By: Hadiya Khan Deshmukh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Paul Moretti
Represented By: J. Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Patrick Vincent Dahlstrom
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Represented By: Jennifer Pafiti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: York County on Behalf of the County of York Retirement Fund
Represented By: Darren Jay Robbins
Represented By: Willow E. Radcliffe
Represented By: Kenneth Joseph Black
Represented By: Brian Edward Cochran
Represented By: Hadiya Khan Deshmukh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Warren Police and Fire Retirement System
Represented By: Darren Jay Robbins
Represented By: Willow E. Radcliffe
Represented By: Kenneth Joseph Black
Represented By: Brian Edward Cochran
Represented By: Hadiya Khan Deshmukh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Ron Williams
Represented By: Robert Charles Moest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Oklahoma Firefighters Pension and Retirement System
Represented By: Daniel E. Barenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?