October 26, 2022 |
Filing
467
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. *This order DENIES docket nos. 461 , 462 , and 463 .*(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
|
September 12, 2022 |
Filing
460
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 457 Motion to Relate Case to Drevaleva v. McDonough, 4:22-cv-887-JST. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
|
August 9, 2021 |
Filing
450
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on August 9, 2021. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2021)
|
June 14, 2021 |
Filing
409
ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 406 Administrative Motion for Leave to Amend, 407 Administrative Motion to Clarify Obligations, and 408 Motion for More Definite Statement. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2021)
|
May 12, 2021 |
Filing
386
ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero finding as moot 373 Administrative Motion to Allow Service on Counsel; denying 371 374 376 379 384 various motions. Defendants shall file their answer to the complaint no later than June 4, 2021. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
|
May 11, 2021 |
Filing
380
Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 369 Administrative Motion to Disqualify. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2021)
|
April 5, 2021 |
Filing
349
Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 347 Administrative Motion to Disqualify Counsel and prohibiting any further motions before the April 30, 2021 case management conference. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2021)
|
March 23, 2021 |
Filing
333
ORDER REGARDING 320 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR REASSIGNMENT. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/23/2021. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
|
February 1, 2021 |
Filing
305
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 3:18-cv-03748-WHA Drevaleva v. U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs et al and 4:21-cv-00684-DMR Drevaleva v. Hayo, et al. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/1/21. (ig COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
|
January 25, 2021 |
Filing
304
Order granting application to proceed in forma pauperis (dkt. 2) in case 21-cv-00500; sua sponte referral to determine whether case 21-cv-00500 is related to case 18-cv-03748. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on January 25, 2021. (jcslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2021)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
|
October 11, 2019 |
Filing
200
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 19-cv-6127-DMR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/11/2019. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019)
|
September 3, 2019 |
Filing
193
ORDER DENYING 174 175 192 MOTIONS FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, TO CHANGE VENUE, AND TO VACATE JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2019)
|
August 14, 2019 |
Filing
180
ORDER RE IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS ON APPEAL (re 179 ). Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/14/2019. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2019)
|
August 5, 2019 |
Filing
171
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO VACATE by Judge William Alsup [denying 155 Motion to Vacate]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2019) Modified on 8/5/2019 (whasec, COURT STAFF).
|
July 11, 2019 |
Filing
155
JUDGMENT in favor of defendants United States Department of Veterans Affairs and Robert Wilkie, Secretary, United States Department of Veterans Affairs, and against plaintiff. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/11/2019. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
|
May 30, 2019 |
Filing
149
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/30/2019. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
|
May 21, 2019 |
Filing
141
Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases 3:19-cv-02665-LB and 3:18-cv-03748-WHA. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 05/21/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2019)
|
May 9, 2019 |
Filing
138
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY re 102 Affidavit filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/9/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
|
February 25, 2019 |
Filing
129
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR JUDICIAL RECUSAL, FOR JUDICIAL RECUSAL, AND REFERRING MOTION TO DISQUALIFY TO ANOTHER DISTRICT JUDGE FOR DECISION [re 124 MOTION to Amend/Correct for Severance filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva, 96 Fir st MOTION to Stay the Libel, the IIED, and the Constitutional causes of action filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva, 99 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva, 126 ADMIN ISTRATIVE MOTION Certify my case to Chief Justice of the 9th Circuit or to appoint a Master 42 U.S. Code §2000e5(f)(4)-(5) filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva, 86 First MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration filed by Tatyana Evgenievna Drevaleva]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/25/2019. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
|
January 3, 2019 |
Filing
98
OMNIBUS ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO CERTIFY ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY REVIEW (re 76 77 84 ), FOR RECONSIDERATION (re 78 ), AND FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (re 81 82 ) AND VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
|
December 4, 2018 |
Filing
71
ORDER DENYING 65 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF REVOCATION OF IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS ON APPEAL. Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
|
December 3, 2018 |
Filing
69
ORDER GRANTING 34 MOTION TO DISMISS AND DENYING 38 39 MOTIONS TO STRIKE AND FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
|
November 26, 2018 |
Filing
63
ORDER REVOKING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS ON APPEAL (re 58 ). Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/26/2018. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
|
November 19, 2018 |
Filing
57
ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S INQUIRIES. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/19/2018. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
|
November 14, 2018 |
Filing
56
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge William Alsup [denying 55 Motion for Leave to File]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
|
November 2, 2018 |
Filing
51
ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Judge William Alsup [denying 42 Motion for Leave to File]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
|