Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trust v. Su et al
Plaintiff: Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trust
Defendant: Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., Mark Durcan, Nicholas M. Donofrio, Nora M. Denzel, Lisa T. Su, Bruce L. Claflin, Joseph A. Householder, John E. Caldwell, Devinder Kumar, Michael J. Inglis, Abhi Y. Talwalkar, Ahmed Yahia and John W. Marren
Interested Party: Jacqueline Dolby
Case Number: 5:2018cv03811
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING 16 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT BRUCE L. CLAFLIN. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/15/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #14 STIPULATION TO STAY THE ACTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/10/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
July 16, 2018 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2018 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 13, 2018 For Further Docket Entries See Lead Consolidated Case 5:18-cv-03575 (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings pursuant to Stipulation and Order Consoliding Related Derivate Actions. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RELATING AND CONSOLIDATING CASE NO. 5:18-CV-03575-BLF AND CASE NO. 5:18-CV-03811-NC; GRANTING #8 STIPULATION CONSOLIDATING RELATED DERIVATIVE ACTIONS AND APPOINTING LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/12/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER CONSTRUING #8 STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE DERIVATIVE ACTIONS (CASE NOS. 18-CV-03575-BLF AND 18-CV-03811-NC) AS INCLUDING A MOTION FOR RELATED CASE DETERMINATION PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 3-12(B). Objections, if any, are due on or before July 11, 2018. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/9/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Consolidating Related Derivative Actions and Appointing Lead Counsel for Plaintiffs filed by Jacqueline Dolby. (Wedeking, Steven) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
June 27, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., John E. Caldwell, Bruce L. Claflin, Nora M. Denzel, Nicholas M. Donofrio, Mark Durcan, Joseph A. Householder, Michael J. Inglis, Devinder Kumar, John W. Marren, Lisa T. Su, Abhi Y. Talwalkar, Ahmed Yahia. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2018)
June 27, 2018 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Stephens, Conrad) (Filed on 6/27/2018)
June 27, 2018 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Tru st Missing Attachment A as noted (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2018)
June 27, 2018 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2018)
June 27, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/11/2018. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2018)
June 26, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trust (Stephens, Conrad) (Filed on 6/26/2018)
June 26, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Stephens, Conrad) (Filed on 6/26/2018)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., John E. Caldwell, Bruce L. Claflin, Nora M. Denzel, Nicholas M. Donofrio, Mark Durcan, Joseph A. Householder, Michael J. Inglis, Devinder Kumar, John W. Marren, Lisa T. Su, Abhi Y. Talwalkar, Ahmed Yahia ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12466641.). Filed byVladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stephens, Conrad) (Filed on 6/26/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trust v. Su et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Micro Devices, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Durcan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas M. Donofrio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nora M. Denzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa T. Su
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce L. Claflin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A. Householder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devinder Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Inglis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abhi Y. Talwalkar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahmed Yahia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Marren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vladimir Gusinsky Revocable Trust
Represented By: Conrad Brandon Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Jacqueline Dolby
Represented By: Steven Ray Wedeking, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?