Velez v. Bruno et al

Plaintiff: Jose Velez
Defendant: Beach Street Co. LLC, Andrew Bruno, Dilip Patel and Sharon Bruno
Case Number: 5:2018cv04221
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2018 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of defendant Dilip Patel ONLY by Jose Velez (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
August 21, 2018 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Beach Street Co. LLC. Service waived by Beach Street Co. LLC waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018) Modified on 8/21/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2018 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jose Velez.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
July 30, 2018 4 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 8/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
July 13, 2018 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order Regarding Case Management in Civil Cases, #2 Standing Order for All Judges)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to Beach Street Co. LLC, Andrew Bruno, Sharon Bruno, Dilip Patel. (Attachments: #1 Sharon Bruno, #2 Dilip Patel, #3 Beach Street Co. LLC)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018)
July 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Damages against Beach Street Co. LLC, Andrew Bruno, Sharon Bruno, Dilip Patel (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt #44611015492.). Filed byJose Velez. Consent/Declination due by 7/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/13/2018: #3 Envelope) (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/16/2018 (bwS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velez v. Bruno et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beach Street Co. LLC
Represented By: Sasha Shahabi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dilip Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?