Chinitz v. Ally Bank

Plaintiff: Ronald E. Chinitz
Defendant: Ally Bank
Case Number: 5:2018cv04329
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: Expedited Funds Availability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Ally Bank. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Kelly, Sheri) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
July 18, 2018 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2018 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/1/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ally Bank ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12521497.). Filed byRonald E. Chinitz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelly, Sheri) (Filed on 7/17/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chinitz v. Ally Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald E. Chinitz
Represented By: Sheri L. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?