Strobl v. Jenkins et al

Petitioner: Tiffany Ann Strobl
Respondent: Jenkins and Bureau of Prisons
Case Number: 5:2018cv04613
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
0 Judge: PSLC CLA
1 Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
2 Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 9/4/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
August 31, 2018 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a United States District Judge because one or more of the parties has requested reassignment to a United States District Judge or has not consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge.You will be informed by separate notice of the District Judge to whom this case is reassigned. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 8/31/2018 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 29, 2018 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge; by Tiffany Ann Strobl. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018)
August 29, 2018 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 34611136226. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018)
August 29, 2018 5 Letter 08/24/18; from Tiffany Ann Strobl re Filing Fee. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2018: #2 Receipt) (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2018 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge ; (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 31, 2018 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 9/7/2018. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 31, 2018 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS; by Tiffany Ann Strobl. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 31, 2018 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ; (NO PROCESS); (IFP PENDING). Filed byTiffany Ann Strobl. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strobl v. Jenkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tiffany Ann Strobl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?