Johnson v. Columbini Sr. et al

Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Ajay Pal Singh and Richard V. Columbini Sr.
Case Number: 5:2018cv04813
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2018 13 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 18, 2018 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Ajay Pal Singh served on 9/8/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 12, 2018 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Richard V. Columbini Sr. (Morin, Richard) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 12, 2018 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Richard V. Columbini Sr... (Morin, Richard) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 12, 2018 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byRichard V. Columbini Sr.. (Morin, Richard) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 12, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J Morin (Morin, Richard) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
August 17, 2018 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Johnson.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 9, 2018 6 Summons Issued as to Richard V. Columbini Sr., Ajay Pal Singh. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 9, 2018 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 9, 2018 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/23/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 9, 2018 3 Proposed Summons. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 9, 2018 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Johnson re #1 Complaint, (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT For Damages And Injunctive Relief For Violations Of: Americans With Disabilities Act; Unruh Civil Rights Act against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12580323.). Filed byScott Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 8/9/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Columbini Sr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ajay Pal Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard V. Columbini Sr.
Represented By: Richard J Morin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?