City of Sunrise Firefighters' Pension Fund v. Oracle Corporation et al
Plaintiff: City of Sunrise Firefighters' Pension Fund and Union Asset Management Holding AG
Defendant: Safra A. Catz, Steve Miranda, Lawrence J. Ellison, Ken Bond, Mark Hurd, Thomas Kurian and Oracle Corporation
Case Number: 5:2018cv04844
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
2 Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 REPLY (re #44 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed byKen Bond, Safra A. Catz, Lawrence J. Ellison, Mark Hurd, Thomas Kurian, Steve Miranda, Oracle Corporation. (Eth, Jordan) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #44 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ) filed byUnion Asset Management Holding AG. (Rizio-Hamilton, John) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/25/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ken Bond, Safra A. Catz, Lawrence J. Ellison, Mark Hurd, Thomas Kurian, Steve Miranda, Oracle Corporation Defendants' Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Eth, Jordan) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Declaration of Robert W. May in Support of #44 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed byKen Bond, Safra A. Catz, Lawrence J. Ellison, Mark Hurd, Thomas Kurian, Steve Miranda, Oracle Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21)(Related document(s) #44 ) (Eth, Jordan) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Ken Bond, Safra A. Catz, Lawrence J. Ellison, Mark Hurd, Thomas Kurian, Steve Miranda, Oracle Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 10/17/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 5/31/2019. Replies due by 6/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Eth, Jordan) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related to Chugh, et al. v. Berg, et al.; Case No. 5:19-cv-00764 filed by Ken Bond, Safra A. Catz, Lawrence J. Ellison, Mark Hurd, Thomas Kurian, Steve Miranda, Oracle Corporation. Responses due by 4/22/2019. (Eth, Jordan) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE by City of Sunrise Firefighters' Pension Fund, Union Asset Management Holding AG of Withdrawal of Counsel (Stickney, David) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Daniel Uslaner (Uslaner, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ken Bond, Safra A. Catz, Lawrence J. Ellison, Mark Hurd, Thomas Kurian, Steve Miranda, Oracle Corporation. Filed byUnion Asset Management Holding AG. (Rizio-Hamilton, John) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING #38 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/6/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Mark Lebovitch ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13144065.) filed by Union Asset Management Holding AG. (Lebovitch, Mark) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Julia Tebor Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-7(d) by Julia K. Tebor on behalf of Union Asset Management Holding AG (Tebor, Julia) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING #35 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/11/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Julia K. Tebor ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12990357.) filed by Union Asset Management Holding AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Tebor, Julia) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Abe Alexander Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-7(d) by Abe Alexander on behalf of Union Asset Management Holding AG (Alexander, Abe) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of Counsel John Rizio-Hamilton Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-7(d) by John J. Rizio-Hamilton on behalf of Union Asset Management Holding AG (Rizio-Hamilton, John) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING #30 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/8/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2019)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING #29 STIPULATION RE FILING DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/7/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Abe Alexander ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12976759.) filed by Union Asset Management Holding AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Alexander, Abe) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Initial Scheduling Stipulation and [Proposed] Order filed by Union Asset Management Holding AG. (Rizio-Hamilton, John) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/4/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE by Union Asset Management Holding AG Withdrawal of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Aufses, Kate) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING #24 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/3/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #23 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/3/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Kate W. Aufses ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12965817.) filed by Union Asset Management Holding AG. (Aufses, Kate) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice John Rizio-Hamilton ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12965714.) filed by Union Asset Management Holding AG. (Rizio-Hamilton, John) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #17 UNION ASSET MANAGEMENT HOLDING AG'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF ITS SELECTION OF LEAD COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/21/2018. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ) Notice of Non-Opposition to Union Asset Managment Holding AG's Motion for Appointment As Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Its Selection of Lead Counsel filed byUnion Asset Management Holding AG. (Stickney, David) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Avi Josefson Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-7(d) by David Ronald Stickney on behalf of Union Asset Management Holding AG (Stickney, David) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Mark Lebovitch Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-7(d) by David Ronald Stickney on behalf of Union Asset Management Holding AG (Stickney, David) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Counsel David R. Stickney Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-7(d) by David Ronald Stickney on behalf of Union Asset Management Holding AG (Stickney, David) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Union Asset Management Holding AG. Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 10/23/2018. Replies due by 10/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of David R. Stickney, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Stickney, David) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #9 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANTS RESPONSE DEADLINE PENDING APPOINTMENT OF LEAD PLAINTIFF AND LEAD COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/7/2018. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DEADLINES AND HEARING VACATED. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by City of Sunrise Firefighters' Pension Fund. Service waived by Thomas Kurian waiver sent on 9/4/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Stickney, David) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by City of Sunrise Firefighters' Pension Fund. Service waived by Steve Miranda waiver sent on 9/4/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Stickney, David) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by City of Sunrise Firefighters' Pension Fund. Service waived by Safra A. Catz waiver sent on 9/4/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Stickney, David) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by City of Sunrise Firefighters' Pension Fund. Service waived by Mark Hurd waiver sent on 9/4/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Stickney, David) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by City of Sunrise Firefighters' Pension Fund. Service waived by Lawrence J. Ellison waiver sent on 9/4/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Stickney, David) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by City of Sunrise Firefighters' Pension Fund. Service waived by Ken Bond waiver sent on 9/4/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Stickney, David) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Defendants' Response Deadline Pending Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel and Vacating Initial Case Management Conference filed by Ken Bond, Safra A. Catz, Lawrence J. Ellison, Mark Hurd, Thomas Kurian, Steve Miranda, Oracle Corporation. (Eth, Jordan) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by City of Sunrise Firefighters' Pension Fund. Oracle Corporation served on 8/15/2018, answer due 9/5/2018. (Stickney, David) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Filing Error CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Sunrise Firefighters' Pension Fund re #1 Complaint, (Stickney, David) (Filed on 8/16/2018) Modified on 8/16/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] Please re-file in its entirety. Re-file as Summons Returned Executed. Re: #7 Certificate of Service filed by City of Sunrise Firefighters' Pension Fund (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ken Bond, Safra A. Catz, Lawrence J. Ellison, Mark Hurd, Thomas Kurian, Steve Miranda, Oracle Corporation. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Stickney, David) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2018 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman and Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi is the referral judge. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Stickney, David) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws against Ken Bond, Safra A. Catz, Lawrence J. Ellison, Mark Hurd, Thomas Kurian, Steve Miranda, Oracle Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12584776.). Filed byCity of Sunrise Firefighters' Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stickney, David) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety **Unable to Issue Summons as it was uploaded as a Read-Only Documen t**. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by City of Sunrise Firefighters' Pension Fund (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Sunrise Firefighters' Pension Fund v. Oracle Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safra A. Catz
Represented By: Jordan Eth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Miranda
Represented By: Jordan Eth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence J. Ellison
Represented By: Jordan Eth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Bond
Represented By: Jordan Eth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hurd
Represented By: Jordan Eth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Kurian
Represented By: Jordan Eth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oracle Corporation
Represented By: Jordan Eth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Sunrise Firefighters' Pension Fund
Represented By: David Ronald Stickney
Represented By: Jonathan Daniel Uslaner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Asset Management Holding AG
Represented By: David Ronald Stickney
Represented By: Kate Whitman Aufses
Represented By: John J. Rizio-Hamilton
Represented By: Julia K. Tebor
Represented By: Jonathan Daniel Uslaner
Represented By: Abe Alexander
Represented By: Mark Lebovitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?