Chinitz v. Intero Real Estate Services
Plaintiff: Ronald Chinitz
Defendant: Intero Real Estate Services
Case Number: 5:2018cv05623
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Intero Real Estate Services.. (Simmonds, Michael) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Intero Real Estate Services identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for Intero Real Estate Services. (Simmonds, Michael) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint byIntero Real Estate Services. (Simmonds, Michael) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint filed by Intero Real Estate Services. (Simmonds, Michael) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald Chinitz. Intero Real Estate Services served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018. (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ronald Chinitz.. (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Intero Real Estate Services. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/27/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Intero Real Estate Services ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12676632.). Filed byRonald Chinitz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 9/13/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chinitz v. Intero Real Estate Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intero Real Estate Services
Represented By: Tomio B Narita
Represented By: Michael Richard Simmonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Chinitz
Represented By: Michael Robert Reese
Represented By: Tanya Susan Koshy
Represented By: George Volney Granade
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?